This case was last updated from PACER on 11/08/2019 at 07:09:18 (UTC).

Tucciarone v. United Airlines, Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/09/2019 a Labor - Family & Medical Leave case was filed by Tucciarone against United Airlines, Inc in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-06045

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Family & Medical Leave

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John J. Tharp, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Matthew Tucciarone

Defendant

United Airlines, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Abby Dritz Salzer

Attorney at Spielberger Law Group

111 W. Jackson, #1700

Chicago, IL 60604

Gary James Martoccio

Attorney at Spielberger Law Group

111 W. Jackson, Suite 1700

Chicago, IL 60604

Defendant Attorneys

Jill Susan Vorobiev

Attorney at Reed Smith LLP

10 South Wacker Drive, 40Th Floor

Chicago, IL 60606

Courtney Marie Ofosu

Attorney at Reed Smith LLP

10 South Wacker Dr., 40Th Floor

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Salzer, Abby) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Matthew Tucciarone by Gary James Martoccio (Martoccio, Gary) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

#9

(#9) ANSWER to Complaint by United Airlines, Inc.(Vorobiev, Jill) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) , filed by Plaintiff Matthew Tucciarone. (Salzer, Abby) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

#8

(#8) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by United Airlines, Inc. (Vorobiev, Jill) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (ek, ) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

#6

(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant United Airlines, Inc. by Jill Susan Vorobiev (Vorobiev, Jill) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

#7

(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant United Airlines, Inc. by Courtney Marie Ofosu (Ofosu, Courtney) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Matthew Tucciarone; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16218838.(Salzer, Abby) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) , filed by Defendant United Airlines, Inc.. (Vorobiev, Jill) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Matthew Tucciarone by Abby Dritz Salzer (Salzer, Abby) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) , filed by Defendant United Airlines, Inc.. (Vorobiev, Jill) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) , filed by Plaintiff Matthew Tucciarone. (Salzer, Abby) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ANSWER to Complaint by United Airlines, Inc.(Vorobiev, Jill) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by United Airlines, Inc. (Vorobiev, Jill) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant United Airlines, Inc. by Courtney Marie Ofosu (Ofosu, Courtney) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant United Airlines, Inc. by Jill Susan Vorobiev (Vorobiev, Jill) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (ek, ) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Case assignment: Random assignment. (td, ) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Matthew Tucciarone by Gary James Martoccio (Martoccio, Gary) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Matthew Tucciarone by Abby Dritz Salzer (Salzer, Abby) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Salzer, Abby) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by Matthew Tucciarone; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16218838.(Salzer, Abby) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.