This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2019 at 09:52:05 (UTC).

Tucci v. Ward et al

Case Summary

On 05/17/2019 Tucci filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Ward. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Holly A Brady and Susan L Collins. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00217

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Holly A Brady

Referral Judge

Susan L Collins

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jeffery Tucci

Marion, IN 46952

Defendants

Cheif of Police

Jeffrey Todd

Mathen O'Banion

Corey Ward

Reggie Nevels

Mark Spitzer

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) ORDER re #1 Pro Se Complaint. The Court DIRECTS the clerk to write this cause number on a blank Prisoner Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis AO 240 (Rev. 7/10) (INND Rev. 8/16) and send it to Jeffrey Tucci. The Court GRANTS Jeffrey Tucci until 06/21/2019 to either pay the filing fee or file an in forma pauperis motion accompanied by his trust fund ledgers for the past six months and CAUTIONS Jeffrey Tucci that, if he does not respond by the deadline, this case may be dismissed without further notice. Signed by Judge Holly A Brady on 05/21/2019. (Copy mailed as directed in Order) (jat) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

#5

(#5) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed as to Jeffrey Tucci on 7/5/2019 re #4 Clerks Judgment, #3 Order Dismissing Case. (ksp) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

#4

(#4) CLERK'S ENTRY OF JUDGMENT. (cc: copy mailed to pro se party via certified mail, receipt no. 7018 0360 0001 4183 8408) (ksp) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

#1

(#1) PRO SE COMPLAINT with 0 copies of summons forms and 0 copies of USM-285 forms and with Jury Demand against Cheif of Police, Reggie Nevels, Mathen O'Banion, Mark Spitzer, Jeffrey Todd, Corey Ward, filed by Jeffery Tucci.(bas) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

#3

(#3) ORDER: The Court DISMISSES this case pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915A; WAIVES the initial partial filing fee; ORDERS Plaintiff Jeffery Tucci, IDOC # UNKNOWN, Grant County Jail #23603, to pay (and the facility having custody to automatically remit) to the Clerk 20% of the money received for each calendar month during which $10.00 or more is received, until the $400.00 filing fee is paid in full; DIRECTS the Clerk to create a ledger for receipt of these funds; and DIRECTS the Clerk to send a copy of this Order to each facility where Plaintiff is housed until the filing fee has been paid in full. Signed by Judge Holly A Brady on 7/1/19. (Copy mailed to pro se party via certified mail, receipt no. 7018 0360 0001 4183 8408 and Sheriff, Grant Co. Jail)(ksp) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed as to Jeffrey Tucci on 7/5/2019 re #4 Clerks Judgment, #3 Order Dismissing Case. (ksp) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CLERK'S ENTRY OF JUDGMENT. (cc: copy mailed to pro se party via certified mail, receipt no. 7018 0360 0001 4183 8408) (ksp) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER: The Court DISMISSES this case pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915A; WAIVES the initial partial filing fee; ORDERS Plaintiff Jeffery Tucci, IDOC # UNKNOWN, Grant County Jail #23603, to pay (and the facility having custody to automatically remit) to the Clerk 20% of the money received for each calendar month during which $10.00 or more is received, until the $400.00 filing fee is paid in full; DIRECTS the Clerk to create a ledger for receipt of these funds; and DIRECTS the Clerk to send a copy of this Order to each facility where Plaintiff is housed until the filing fee has been paid in full. Signed by Judge Holly A Brady on 7/1/19. (Copy mailed to pro se party via certified mail, receipt no. 7018 0360 0001 4183 8408 and Sheriff, Grant Co. Jail)(ksp) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER re #1 Pro Se Complaint. The Court DIRECTS the clerk to write this cause number on a blank Prisoner Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis AO 240 (Rev. 7/10) (INND Rev. 8/16) and send it to Jeffrey Tucci. The Court GRANTS Jeffrey Tucci until 06/21/2019 to either pay the filing fee or file an in forma pauperis motion accompanied by his trust fund ledgers for the past six months and CAUTIONS Jeffrey Tucci that, if he does not respond by the deadline, this case may be dismissed without further notice. Signed by Judge Holly A Brady on 05/21/2019. (Copy mailed as directed in Order) (jat) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PRO SE COMPLAINT with 0 copies of summons forms and 0 copies of USM-285 forms and with Jury Demand against Cheif of Police, Reggie Nevels, Mathen O'Banion, Mark Spitzer, Jeffrey Todd, Corey Ward, filed by Jeffery Tucci.(bas) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.