Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 11/09/2019 at 07:36:42 (UTC).

Tubbs v. Navy Federal Credit Union Foundation et al

Case Summary

On 09/10/2019 Tubbs filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Navy Federal Credit Union Foundation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are David J. Hale and Colin H. Lindsay. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00639

  • Filing Date:

    09/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kentucky Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David J. Hale

Referral Judge

Colin H. Lindsay

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jason Tubbs

Defendants

Equifax Information Services, LLC

Trans Union, LLC

Navy Federal Credit Union Foundation

Experian Information Solutions, Inc.

Navy Federal Credit Union

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David W. Hemminger

Attorney at Hemminger Law Office, PSC

331 Townepark Circle, Suite 100-C

Louisville, KY 40243

Defendant Attorneys

Sandra D. Jansen

Attorney at Schuckit & Associates, PC

4545 Northwestern Drive

Zionsville, IN 46077

Christopher L. Thacker

Attorney at Billings Law Firm, PLLC

145 Constitution Street

Lexington, KY 40507

Rheanne D. Falkner

Attorney at Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP - Louisville

325 W. Main Street, Suite 1810

Louisville, KY 40202

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 10/26/2019. Tubb's claims against Navy Federal Credit Union are DISMISSED without prejudice. Tubbs and Navy Federal Credit Union shall file an agreed order of dismissal with prejudice within thirty (30) days of entry of this Order. The Court will entertain a motion to reinstate Tubbss claims against Navy Federal Credit Union within thirty (30) days of entry of this Order in the event the settlement is not consummated. This Order does not affect Tubbss claims against any other defendant. cc: Counsel (AME) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

#14

(#14) ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 10/23/2019. The Consent Motion (DN #12 ) is GRANTED IN PART, and the Clerk is directed to change the case caption to reflect that the proper name of the Defendant is Navy Federal Credit Union. The Consent Motion (DN #12 ) is DENIED IN PART as moot regarding the requested extension given the recently-filed Notice of Settlement (DN #13 ). cc: Counsel (MEJ) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Settlement by Jason Tubbs (Hemminger, David) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

12 #1

Proposed Order Joint Consent Motion and Extension

#12

(#12) Agreed MOTION to Amend/Correct and Extend Time for Defendant Navy Federal Credit Union to file its Answer or Other Response to Plaintiff's Verified Complaint #1 Complaint, Caption by Defendant Navy Federal Credit Union Foundation (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Joint Consent Motion and Extension) (Falkner, Rheanne) Modified on 10/11/2019 to clarify title of document (MEJ). (Entered: 10/10/2019)

#11

(#11) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Thacker, Christopher) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

#10

(#10) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Thacker, Christopher) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

#9

(#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, And Affirmative Defenses by Trans Union, LLC. (Jansen, Sandra) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Rheanne D. Falkner on behalf of Navy Federal Credit Union Foundation (Falkner, Rheanne) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

#7

(#7) SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE as to Navy Federal Credit Union Foundation COMPLETED on 10/1/2019. (AME) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

#6

(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent TransUnion, Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group, Inc. for Trans Union, LLC. by Trans Union, LLC. (Jansen, Sandra) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Sandra D. Jansen on behalf of Trans Union, LLC (Jansen, Sandra) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

3 #3

Summons

3 #2

Summons

3 #1

Summons

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Navy Federal Credit Union Foundation, Trans Union, LLC. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons) (AME) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

1 #1

Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Navy Federal Credit Union Foundation, Trans Union, LLC (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-2940330), filed by Jason Tubbs. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (AME) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 10/26/2019. Tubb's claims against Navy Federal Credit Union are DISMISSED without prejudice. Tubbs and Navy Federal Credit Union shall file an agreed order of dismissal with prejudice within thirty (30) days of entry of this Order. The Court will entertain a motion to reinstate Tubbss claims against Navy Federal Credit Union within thirty (30) days of entry of this Order in the event the settlement is not consummated. This Order does not affect Tubbss claims against any other defendant. cc: Counsel (AME) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 10/23/2019. The Consent Motion (DN #12 ) is GRANTED IN PART, and the Clerk is directed to change the case caption to reflect that the proper name of the Defendant is Navy Federal Credit Union. The Consent Motion (DN #12 ) is DENIED IN PART as moot regarding the requested extension given the recently-filed Notice of Settlement (DN #13 ). cc: Counsel (MEJ) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTICE of Settlement by Jason Tubbs (Hemminger, David) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Agreed MOTION to Amend/Correct and Extend Time for Defendant Navy Federal Credit Union to file its Answer or Other Response to Plaintiff's Verified Complaint #1 Complaint, Caption by Defendant Navy Federal Credit Union Foundation (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Joint Consent Motion and Extension) (Falkner, Rheanne) Modified on 10/11/2019 to clarify title of document (MEJ). (Entered: 10/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Thacker, Christopher) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Thacker, Christopher) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, And Affirmative Defenses by Trans Union, LLC. (Jansen, Sandra) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Rheanne D. Falkner on behalf of Navy Federal Credit Union Foundation (Falkner, Rheanne) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE as to Navy Federal Credit Union Foundation COMPLETED on 10/1/2019. (AME) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent TransUnion, Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group, Inc. for Trans Union, LLC. by Trans Union, LLC. (Jansen, Sandra) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Sandra D. Jansen on behalf of Trans Union, LLC (Jansen, Sandra) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • (#4) TEXT ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 9/11/2019; Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is hereby referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay, for resolution of all litigation planning issues, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Judge Lindsay is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc:counsel (NWT) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Navy Federal Credit Union Foundation, Trans Union, LLC. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons) (AME) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge David J. Hale. (AME) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Navy Federal Credit Union Foundation, Trans Union, LLC (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-2940330), filed by Jason Tubbs. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (AME) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Experian Information Solutions, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Trans Union Corp is a litigant

Latest cases where Navy Federal Credit Union Long Term Disability Plan is a litigant

Latest cases where Equifax Information Services LLC is a litigant