This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 07:54:04 (UTC).

T.T. v. Jefferson County Board of Education

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 T T filed a Civil Right - Education Discrimination lawsuit against Jefferson County Board of Education. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Gray M Borden. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-01965

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Education Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alabama Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gray M Borden

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

T.T.

Defendant

Jefferson County Board of Education

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Andrew Seth Ladores

Attorney at LADORES LAW FIRM, LLC

5809 Feldspar Way

Hoover, AL 35244

Defendant Attorneys

Carl E Johnson, Jr

Attorney at BISHOP COLVIN JOHNSON & KENT LLP

1910 First Avenue North

Birmingham, AL 35203

Andrew Ethan Rudloff

Attorney at BISHOP COLVIN JOHNSON & KENT

1910 First Avenue North

Birmingham, AL 35203

 

Court Documents

1 #5

Exhibit E

#9

(#9) ORDER REGARDING COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 26. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 12/30/19. (MRR, ) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Ethan Rudloff on behalf of Jefferson County Board of Education (Rudloff, Andrew) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #4

Exhibit D

#6

(#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Jefferson County Board of Education.(Johnson, Carl) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Jefferson County Board of Education, filed by T.T.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(MRR, )- Exhibits Sealed pursuant to Order Doc 5 on 12/12/2019 (MRR, ). (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#5

(#5) ORDER- For good cause, it is ORDERED that the parties' Joint Motion for Leave to File Administrative Record Under Seal and to Place Identified Complaint Attachments Under Seal (Doc. #4 ) is GRANTED; The parties may file the complete record of the underlying state administrative proceedings under seal, and the Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to place Documents 1-1, 1-2, 1-3, 1-4, and 1-5 under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 12/12/19. (MRR, ) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

#8

(#8) ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than February 13, 2020. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a district judge without further order after February 13, 2020. A telephone status conference is hereby SET for 10:30 a.m. on January 22, 2020. The parties are DIRECTED to call 888-636-3807 to access the telephone conference. The access code is 3676046. The telephone conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 12/30/19. (MRR, ) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Acceptance of Service filed by Jefferson County Board of Education. (Johnson, Carl) Modified text on 12/12/2019 (MRR, ). (Entered: 12/11/2019)

1 #2

Exhibit B

#2

(#2) NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, ) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#4

(#4) Joint MOTION for Leave to File Administrative Record Under Seal and to Place Identified Complaint Attachments Under Seal by Jefferson County Board of Education; T.T. (Johnson, Carl) Modified text and added filer on 12/12/2019 (MRR, ). (Entered: 12/11/2019)

1 #1

Exhibit A

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden: Telephone Status Conference held on 1/24/2020. (ASL) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • Docket(#12) TEXT ORDER Telephone Status Conference RESET for Friday, 1/24/2020 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden; parties are directed to dial 888-636-3807 and use access code 3676046 to participate. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on January 22, 2020. (ASL) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • Docket(#11) TEXT ORDER the telephone status conference scheduled for 10:30 AM on January 22, 2020 is RESET for Thursday, January 23, 2020 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden. The parties are DIRECTED to call 888-636-3807 and use access code 3676046 to participate. The telephone conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on January 22, 2020. (ASL) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE to remind parties of consent conference scheduled at 10:30 AM on Wednesday, January 22, 2020; if all parties submit an executed consent form, either consenting or declining magistrate judge jurisdiction, the conference will be canceled (ASL) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER REGARDING COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 26. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 12/30/19. (MRR, ) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than February 13, 2020. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a district judge without further order after February 13, 2020. A telephone status conference is hereby SET for 10:30 a.m. on January 22, 2020. The parties are DIRECTED to call 888-636-3807 to access the telephone conference. The access code is 3676046. The telephone conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 12/30/19. (MRR, ) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Ethan Rudloff on behalf of Jefferson County Board of Education (Rudloff, Andrew) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Jefferson County Board of Education.(Johnson, Carl) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER- For good cause, it is ORDERED that the parties' Joint Motion for Leave to File Administrative Record Under Seal and to Place Identified Complaint Attachments Under Seal (Doc. #4 ) is GRANTED; The parties may file the complete record of the underlying state administrative proceedings under seal, and the Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to place Documents 1-1, 1-2, 1-3, 1-4, and 1-5 under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 12/12/19. (MRR, ) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Joint MOTION for Leave to File Administrative Record Under Seal and to Place Identified Complaint Attachments Under Seal by Jefferson County Board of Education; T.T. (Johnson, Carl) Modified text and added filer on 12/12/2019 (MRR, ). (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Acceptance of Service filed by Jefferson County Board of Education. (Johnson, Carl) Modified text on 12/12/2019 (MRR, ). (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFiling Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3490605 (B4601102527). related document #1 COMPLAINT against Jefferson County Board of Education, filed by T.T.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(MRR, ). (Ladores, Andrew) Modified on 12/5/2019 (MRR, ). (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, ) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Jefferson County Board of Education, filed by T.T.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(MRR, )- Exhibits Sealed pursuant to Order Doc 5 on 12/12/2019 (MRR, ). (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.