This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2019 at 09:47:00 (UTC).

Tsybikov v. Dovgal et al

Case Summary

On 05/17/2019 Tsybikov filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Dovgal. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Harry D. Leinenweber. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-03334

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Harry D. Leinenweber

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ayur Tsybikov

Defendants

Oleksandr Dovgal

DVL Express Inc.

Alina Kim

Altex Logistics Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Julia Bikbova

Attorney at Bikbova Law

666 Dundee Road Suite 1604

Northbrook, IL 60062

Defendant Attorneys

Jamie L. Ross

Attorney at Kalcheim Haber, LLP

134 N. Lasalle Street, Suite 2100

Chicago, IL 60602

Cara Mia Gaziano

Attorney at Kalcheim Haber Llc

134 North Lasalle Street, Suite 2100

Chicago, IL 60091

Michael A. Haber

Attorney at Kalcheim Haber, LLP

134 N La Salle St Ste 2100

Chicago, IL 60602-1124

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure STATEMENT by Altex Logistics Inc., DVL Express Inc. (Ross, Jamie) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

9 #2

Certificate of Service

#6

(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Altex Logistics Inc., DVL Express Inc., Oleksandr Dovgal, Alina Kim by Cara Mia Gaziano (Gaziano, Cara) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Altex Logistics Inc., DVL Express Inc., Oleksandr Dovgal, Alina Kim by Michael A. Haber (Haber, Michael) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

#8

(#8) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Status hearing set for 7/18/19 at 9:00 AM.Mailed notice(maf) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

9 #1

Notice of Filing

#7

(#7) appearance by Ayur Tsybikov (Bikbova, Julia) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit A

#2

(#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Altex Logistics Inc., DVL Express Inc., Oleksandr Dovgal, Alina Kim by Jamie L. Ross (Ross, Jamie) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

#1

(#1) NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, IL, case number (2019 CH 01814) filed by Altex Logistics Inc., DVL Express Inc., Oleksandr Dovgal, Alina Kim Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15837649. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Ross, Jamie) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

#9

(#9) AMENDED complaint by Ayur Tsybikov against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing, #2 Certificate of Service)(Bikbova, Julia) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

#4

(#4) MAILED notice of removal letter to Julia Bikbova (las, ) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #4

Exhibit C

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) AMENDED complaint by Ayur Tsybikov against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing, #2 Certificate of Service)(Bikbova, Julia) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Status hearing set for 7/18/19 at 9:00 AM.Mailed notice(maf) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) appearance by Ayur Tsybikov (Bikbova, Julia) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Altex Logistics Inc., DVL Express Inc., Oleksandr Dovgal, Alina Kim by Cara Mia Gaziano (Gaziano, Cara) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Altex Logistics Inc., DVL Express Inc., Oleksandr Dovgal, Alina Kim by Michael A. Haber (Haber, Michael) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MAILED notice of removal letter to Julia Bikbova (las, ) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Corporate Disclosure STATEMENT by Altex Logistics Inc., DVL Express Inc. (Ross, Jamie) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Altex Logistics Inc., DVL Express Inc., Oleksandr Dovgal, Alina Kim by Jamie L. Ross (Ross, Jamie) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. Case assignment: Random assignment. (yt) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, IL, case number (2019 CH 01814) filed by Altex Logistics Inc., DVL Express Inc., Oleksandr Dovgal, Alina Kim Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15837649. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Ross, Jamie) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.