This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/14/2020 at 08:52:16 (UTC).

Tschida v. Thompson

Case Summary

On 10/15/2020 Tschida filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Thompson. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Utah District. The Judge overseeing this case is Bruce S. Jenkins. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00133

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Bruce S. Jenkins

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Blaine Tschida

Defendant

Anthony Thompson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Brent J. Matthews

Attorney at MATTHEWS LAW GROUP

189 S State Street #232

Clearfield, UT 84015

Defendant Attorneys

Peter H. Christensen

Attorney at STRONG & HANNI

102 S 200 E Ste 800

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Marshall J. Hendrickson

Attorney at STRONG & HANNI

102 S 200 E Ste 800

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

2 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet

2 #2

Exhibit Exhibit 1

2 #3

Exhibit Exhibit 2

#3

#4

#6

#8

#9

#10

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Plaintiff's Certificate of Service by Blaine Tschida (Matthews, Brent) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SCHEDULING ORDER:Expert Discovery due by 8/1/2021. Motions due by 8/16/2021. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/29/2021. Pretrial Conference set for 10/8/2021 at 10:00 AM in Rm 7.200 before Judge Bruce S. Jenkins. See Order for further details. Signed by Judge Bruce S. Jenkins on 11/19/20. (jrj) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STATUS REPORT Modified Scheduling Order by Blaine Tschida. (Matthews, Brent) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • Docket(#7) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Bruce S. Jenkins: Telephone Status Report and Scheduling Conference held on 11/6/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/8/2021 at 10:00 AM in Rm 7.200 before Judge Bruce S. Jenkins. Approved minute entry to follow pending Judge Jenkins' approval. Attorney for Plaintiff: Brent J. Matthews, Attorney for Defendant: Ian Quiel. Court Reporter: Becky Janke.(kpf) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) REPORT OF ATTORNEY PLANNING MEETING. (Hendrickson, Marshall) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC HEARING: Status Report and Scheduling Conference set for 11/6/2020 at 01:15 PM before Judge Bruce S. Jenkins. TELECONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS:Please plan to participate on a landline rather than a cell phone if possible. Also avoid the use of a speaker phone. During the call, announce your name each time you speak and pause regularly during any statements to allow the judge to maintain control. Mute your phone when you are not speaking. As a participant, the conference instructions are as follows: 1. Dial 888-684-88522. Enter Access Code 62703563. Enter the conference as a participant by pressing #key. If the call has not been activated by the Court, you will be placed on hold. 4. Once the call is activated you will be prompted to enter the participant security code 1106202 followed by the # key. You will now be entered into the conference. If you have any questions before the hearing begins please do not hesitate to contact chambers at 801-524-6507. If you are having issues during the hearing, you can email the courtroom deputy at Kim_Forsgren@utd.uscourts.gov. This hearing will be conducted telephonically. Members of the public, including media, are not able to attend in the courtroom and should contact the case manager at kathleen_smith@utd.uscourts.gov for information to obtain electronic access to the hearing. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the court. (kms) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Defendant Thompson's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Anthony Thompson.(Hendrickson, Marshall) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Defendant Anthony Thompson and Plaintiff Blaine Tschida. (dw) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Box Elder County, case number 200100054, (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AUTDC-3758584) filed by Anthony Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2) Assigned to Judge Bruce S. Jenkins (Hendrickson, Marshall) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Bruce S. Jenkins. Defendant Anthony Thompson is directed to E-File the Notice of Removal and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (dw) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Peter H Christensen

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Marshall J. Hendrickson