This case was last updated from PACER on 08/21/2020 at 11:42:29 (UTC).

Tsataros v. Eli Lilly and Company

Case Summary

On 06/22/2020 Tsataros filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Eli Lilly and Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Brian J. Davis and Joel B. Toomey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00636

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Brian J. Davis

Referral Judge

Joel B. Toomey

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Heather Tsataros

Defendant

Eli Lilly and Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gregory R. Schmitz

Attorney at Morgan & Morgan, PA

20 N Orange Ave, Suite 1600

Orlando, FL 32801

Defendant Attorneys

Dawn Siler-Nixon

Attorney at Ford & Harrison, LLP

101 E Kennedy Blvd Ste 900

Tampa, FL 33602-5133

Laura Alrutz

Attorney at Ford & Harrison, LLP

225 Water St., Suite 710

Jacksonville, FL 32202

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Eli Lilly and Company. (Alrutz, Laura) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey. (Entered: 08/20/2020)

#6

(#6) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by Eli Lilly and Company. (Siler-Nixon, Dawn) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Dawn Siler-Nixon on behalf of Eli Lilly and Company (Siler-Nixon, Dawn) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

4 #2

Consent Letter and Form

4 #1

Case Management Report Form

#4

(#4) NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 6/25/2020. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Report Form, #2 Consent Letter and Form)(CKS) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS issued as to Eli Lilly and Company. (AEJ) (Entered: 06/23/2020)

1 #2

Proposed Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Eli Lilly and Company with Jury Demand (Filing Fee $400, Receipt # 113A-16967897) filed by Heather Tsataros. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Schmitz, Gregory) Modified on 6/22/2020 to correct docket text (SJB). (Entered: 06/22/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Eli Lilly and Company. (Alrutz, Laura) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey. (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ENDORSED ORDER granting #6 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant shall have up to and including August 20, 2020 to respond to #1 the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey on 7/20/2020. (RLS) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by Eli Lilly and Company. (Siler-Nixon, Dawn) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Dawn Siler-Nixon on behalf of Eli Lilly and Company (Siler-Nixon, Dawn) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 6/25/2020. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Report Form, #2 Consent Letter and Form)(CKS) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS issued as to Eli Lilly and Company. (AEJ) (Entered: 06/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Brian J. Davis and Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey. New case number: 3:20-cv-636-J-39JBT. (SJB) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Eli Lilly and Company with Jury Demand (Filing Fee $400, Receipt # 113A-16967897) filed by Heather Tsataros. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Schmitz, Gregory) Modified on 6/22/2020 to correct docket text (SJB). (Entered: 06/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less