This case was last updated from PACER on 09/12/2020 at 12:28:57 (UTC).

TSAKOS, INC. v. THE HANOVER INSURANCE GROUP, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 07/14/2020 TSAKOS, INC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against THE HANOVER INSURANCE GROUP, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Esther Salas and Cathy L. Waldor. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-08889

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Esther Salas

Referral Judge

Cathy L. Waldor

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TSAKOS, INC.

Defendants

HANOVER INSURANCE GROUP, INC.

CITIZENS INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA

THE HANOVER INSURANCE GROUP, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JAMES E. CECCHI

Attorney at CARELLA BYRNE CECCHI OLSTEIN BRODY & AGNELLO, P.C.

5 Becker Farm Road

Roseland, NJ 07068

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by TSAKOS, INC.. CITIZENS INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA waiver sent on 8/3/2020, answer due 10/2/2020; THE HANOVER INSURANCE GROUP, INC. waiver sent on 8/3/2020, answer due 10/2/2020. (TAYLOR, LINDSEY) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to CITIZENS INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA, THE HANOVER INSURANCE GROUP, INC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jc, ) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against CITIZENS INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA, HANOVER INSURANCE GROUP, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-11072782) with JURY DEMAND, filed by TSAKOS, INC d/b/a HANOVER MANOR.(CECCHI, JAMES) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by TSAKOS, INC.. CITIZENS INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA waiver sent on 8/3/2020, answer due 10/2/2020; THE HANOVER INSURANCE GROUP, INC. waiver sent on 8/3/2020, answer due 10/2/2020. (TAYLOR, LINDSEY) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to CITIZENS INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA, THE HANOVER INSURANCE GROUP, INC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jc, ) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Esther Salas and Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor. (jr) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against CITIZENS INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA, HANOVER INSURANCE GROUP, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-11072782) with JURY DEMAND, filed by TSAKOS, INC d/b/a HANOVER MANOR.(CECCHI, JAMES) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less