This case was last updated from PACER on 11/21/2020 at 09:34:35 (UTC).

Trzuskoski v. Saul

Case Summary

On 09/22/2020 Trzuskoski filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Saul. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Connecticut District. The Judge overseeing this case is Vanessa L. Bryant. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-01431

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Connecticut District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Vanessa L. Bryant

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Commissioner of Social Security

Douglas Trzuskoski

Defendant

Andrew M. Saul

Interested Party

Social Security Administration

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Charles E. Binder

Attorney at Law Office Charles E. Binder and Harry J. Binder

485 Madison Ave. Suite 501

New York, NY 10022

Defendant Attorney

Nicol Fitzhugh

Attorney at SSA-Office of the General Counsel

601 E. 12Th St., Room 965

Kansas City, MO 64106

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 10/23/2020. (Shafer, J.) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

6 #1

Consent Form

#6

(#6) REMINDER: Standing Order on Social Security Appeals Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 10/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Anastasio, F.) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

(#4) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 09/22/2020.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

#3

(#3) STANDING SCHEDULING ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 09/22/2020.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

2 #1

Consent Form

#2

(#2) STANDING ORDER ON SOCIAL SECURITY APPEALS Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 09/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until January 22, 2021 to File the Certified Administrative Record by Andrew M. Saul. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration in Support)(Fitzhugh, Nicol) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 10/23/2020. (Shafer, J.) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • Docket(#7) ORDER OF TRANSFER. Absent consent to a Magistrate Judge, the case is reassigned to Judge Vanessa L. Bryant for all further proceedings. Signed by Clerk on 10/23/2020.(Anastasio, F.) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) REMINDER: Standing Order on Social Security Appeals Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 10/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Anastasio, F.) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Nicol Fitzhugh on behalf of Andrew M. Saul (Fitzhugh, Nicol) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketAnswer deadline updated for Andrew M. Saul to 11/23/2020. (Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 09/22/2020.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STANDING SCHEDULING ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 09/22/2020.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) STANDING ORDER ON SOCIAL SECURITY APPEALS Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 09/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketJudge Stefan R. Underhill and Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam added. (Nuzzi, Tiffany) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketRequest for Clerk to issue summons as to Andrew M. Saul. (Binder, Charles) Modified on 9/23/2020 to correct named defendant (Anastasio, F.). (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Andrew M. Saul ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-6112169.), filed by Douglas Trzuskoski. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Binder, Charles) Modified on 9/23/2020 to correct named defendant (Anastasio, F.). (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less