This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/29/2021 at 06:40:09 (UTC).

Trustmark Health Benefits, Inc. v. St. Luke's Health System Corporation, et al

Case Summary

On 07/30/2021 Trustmark Health Benefits, Inc filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against St Luke's Health System Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Lee H Rosenthal. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-02477

  • Filing Date:

    07/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lee H Rosenthal

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Trustmark Health Benefits, Inc.

CoreSource, Inc.

Defendants

ST. LUKES HEALTH SYSTEM CORPORATION d/b/a St. Lukes The Woodlands Hospital

St. Luke's Health System Corporation doing business as St. Luke's The Woodlands Hospital

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Andrew G Jubinsky

Attorney at Figari Davenport et al

901 Main, Ste 3400

Dallas, TX 75202

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

3 #1

Attachments

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Case terminated on 8/19/2021 (Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(gkelner, 4) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Dismissal as to St. Luke's Health System Corporation by Trustmark Health Benefits, Inc., filed. (Jubinsky, Andrew) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to St. Luke's Health System Corporation served on 8/12/2021, answer due 9/2/2021, filed.(Jubinsky, Andrew) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER on Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action.(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to St. Luke's Health System Corporation. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(JacquelineMata, 4) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER Scheduling Rule 16 Conference With the Court and Setting Out the Requirements for Initial Pretrial Work. Initial Conference set for 10/29/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11B before Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal. (Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) (Attachments: #1 Attachments) Parties notified.(ClaudiaGutierrezadi, 4) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Request for Issuance of Summons as to ST. LUKES HEALTH SYSTEM CORPORATION, filed.(Jubinsky, Andrew) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against ST. LUKES HEALTH SYSTEM CORPORATION (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-26826400) filed by Trustmark Health Benefits, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Jubinsky, Andrew) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CORESOURCE (a wholly owned Subsidiary of Trustmark: is a litigant

Latest cases where ST LUKE'S HEALTH SYSTEM CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew G. Jubinsky