This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/23/2023 at 15:05:12 (UTC).

Trustees of the Pavers District Council Apprenticeship, Skill Improvement and Training Fund et al v. Unicorn Construction Enterprises, Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/23/2022 Trustees of the Pavers District Council Apprenticeship, Skill Improvement and Training Fund filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Unicorn Construction Enterprises, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Sanket J. Bulsara and Eric R. Komitee. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-07836

  • Filing Date:

    12/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Sanket J. Bulsara

Presiding Judge

Eric R. Komitee

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Trustees of the Pavers District Council Apprenticeship, Skill Improvement and Training Fund

Trustees of the Local 1010 Apprenticeship, Skill Improvement and Training Fund

Trustees of the Pavers and Road Builders District Council Welfare, Pension, Annuity Funds

Defendant

Unicorn Construction Enterprises, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Charles R. Virginia

Adrianna R Grancio

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Charles R. Virginia on behalf of Trustees of the Local 1010 Apprenticeship, Skill Improvement and Training Fund, Trustees of the Pavers District Council Apprenticeship, Skill Improvement and Training Fund, Trustees of the Pavers and Road Builders District Council Welfare, Pension, Annuity Funds (aty to be noticed) (Virginia, Charles) (Entered: 12/23/2022)

#3

(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (KD) (Entered: 12/28/2022)

#4

(#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (KD) (Entered: 12/28/2022)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Unicorn Construction Enterprises, Inc.. (KD) (Entered: 12/28/2022)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Trustees of the Pavers and Road Builders District Council Welfare, Pension, Annuity Funds, Trustees of the Pavers District Council Apprenticeship, Skill Improvement and Training Fund, Trustees of the Local 1010 Apprenticeship, Skill Improvement and Training Fund. Unicorn Construction Enterprises, Inc. served on 12/28/2022, answer due 1/18/2023. (Grancio, Adrianna) (Entered: 12/28/2022)

#7

(#7) SCHEDULING ORDER: A telephonic initial conference will be held at 2:30 P.M. on 03/24/2023 before Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. The parties are directed to call the toll-free number 877-336-1274; access code is 6534420. Counsel are directed to complete the attached Rule 26(f) Report and electronically file same with the Court no later than 03/22/2023. Should the parties wish to adopt a plan for discovery different from the structure in the Rule 26(f) Report, they may do so only if they file a letter explaining why such a plan is appropriate in this case. Upon receipt of this email counsel shall confirm with each other of the date and time of this telephonic initial conference. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 1/3/2023. (EM) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

#8

(#8) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Trustees of the Local 1010 Apprenticeship, Skill Improvement and Training Fund, Trustees of the Pavers District Council Apprenticeship, Skill Improvement and Training Fund, Trustees of the Pavers and Road Builders District Council Welfare, Pension, Annuity Funds re #7 Scheduling Order,,, upon Defendant, Unicorn Construction Enterprises, Inc. (Grancio, Adrianna) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

#10

(#10) Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT It appearing from the docket maintained in this action that defendant Unicorn Construction Enterprises, Inc. has failed to appear or otherwise defend this action, the default of defendant Unicorn Construction Enterprises, Inc. is hereby noted pursuant to Rule 55a of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (JP) (Entered: 01/26/2023)

#11

(#11) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Trustees of the Local 1010 Apprenticeship, Skill Improvement and Training Fund, Trustees of the Pavers District Council Apprenticeship, Skill Improvement and Training Fund, Trustees of the Pavers and Road Builders District Council Welfare, Pension, Annuity Funds re Terminate Deadlines and Hearings upon Defendant, Unicorn Construction Enterprises, Inc. (Grancio, Adrianna) (Entered: 01/27/2023)

#12

(#12) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint (Dkt. No. 1), Summons (Dkt. No. 5), and Affidavit of Service of the Summons and Complaint on Unicorn Construction Enterprises, Inc. (Dkt. No. 6) served on Defendant, Unicorn Construction Enterprises, Inc. on February 8, 2023, filed by Trustees of the Local 1010 Apprenticeship, Skill Improvement and Training Fund, Trustees of the Pavers District Council Apprenticeship, Skill Improvement and Training Fund, Trustees of the Pavers and Road Builders District Council Welfare, Pension, Annuity Funds. (Grancio, Adrianna) (Entered: 02/09/2023)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Unicorn Construction Enterprises, Inc. filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-16256593 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Trustees of the Pavers and Road Builders District Council Welfare, Pension, Annuity Funds, Trustees of the Pavers District Council Apprenticeship, Skill Improvement and Training Fund, Trustees of the Local 1010 Apprenticeship, Skill Improvement and Training Fund. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Grancio, Adrianna) (Entered: 12/23/2022)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Proposed Summons

#9

(#9) Request for Certificate of Default by Trustees of the Local 1010 Apprenticeship, Skill Improvement and Training Fund, Trustees of the Pavers District Council Apprenticeship, Skill Improvement and Training Fund, Trustees of the Pavers and Road Builders District Council Welfare, Pension, Annuity Funds (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Adrianna R. Grancio in Support, #2 Proposed Default Certificate) (Grancio, Adrianna) (Entered: 01/20/2023)

9 #1

Declaration of Adrianna R. Grancio in Support

9 #2

Proposed Default Certificate

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint (Dkt. No. 1), Summons (Dkt. No. 5), and Affidavit of Service of the Summons and Complaint on Unicorn Construction Enterprises, Inc. (Dkt. No. 6) served on Defendant, Unicorn Construction Enterprises, Inc. on February 8, 2023, filed by Trustees of the Local 1010 Apprenticeship, Skill Improvement and Training Fund, Trustees of the Pavers District Council Apprenticeship, Skill Improvement and Training Fund, Trustees of the Pavers and Road Builders District Council Welfare, Pension, Annuity Funds. (Grancio, Adrianna) (Entered: 02/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Trustees of the Local 1010 Apprenticeship, Skill Improvement and Training Fund, Trustees of the Pavers District Council Apprenticeship, Skill Improvement and Training Fund, Trustees of the Pavers and Road Builders District Council Welfare, Pension, Annuity Funds re Terminate Deadlines and Hearings upon Defendant, Unicorn Construction Enterprises, Inc. (Grancio, Adrianna) (Entered: 01/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketORDER: The initial conference scheduled for 3/24/2023 is adjourned sine die. Plaintiffs shall file a motion for default judgment by 3/28/2023. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 1/27/2023. (IS) (Entered: 01/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT It appearing from the docket maintained in this action that defendant Unicorn Construction Enterprises, Inc. has failed to appear or otherwise defend this action, the default of defendant Unicorn Construction Enterprises, Inc. is hereby noted pursuant to Rule 55a of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (JP) (Entered: 01/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Request for Certificate of Default by Trustees of the Local 1010 Apprenticeship, Skill Improvement and Training Fund, Trustees of the Pavers District Council Apprenticeship, Skill Improvement and Training Fund, Trustees of the Pavers and Road Builders District Council Welfare, Pension, Annuity Funds (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Adrianna R. Grancio in Support, #2 Proposed Default Certificate) (Grancio, Adrianna) (Entered: 01/20/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Trustees of the Local 1010 Apprenticeship, Skill Improvement and Training Fund, Trustees of the Pavers District Council Apprenticeship, Skill Improvement and Training Fund, Trustees of the Pavers and Road Builders District Council Welfare, Pension, Annuity Funds re #7 Scheduling Order,,, upon Defendant, Unicorn Construction Enterprises, Inc. (Grancio, Adrianna) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SCHEDULING ORDER: A telephonic initial conference will be held at 2:30 P.M. on 03/24/2023 before Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. The parties are directed to call the toll-free number 877-336-1274; access code is 6534420. Counsel are directed to complete the attached Rule 26(f) Report and electronically file same with the Court no later than 03/22/2023. Should the parties wish to adopt a plan for discovery different from the structure in the Rule 26(f) Report, they may do so only if they file a letter explaining why such a plan is appropriate in this case. Upon receipt of this email counsel shall confirm with each other of the date and time of this telephonic initial conference. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 1/3/2023. (EM) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Trustees of the Pavers and Road Builders District Council Welfare, Pension, Annuity Funds, Trustees of the Pavers District Council Apprenticeship, Skill Improvement and Training Fund, Trustees of the Local 1010 Apprenticeship, Skill Improvement and Training Fund. Unicorn Construction Enterprises, Inc. served on 12/28/2022, answer due 1/18/2023. (Grancio, Adrianna) (Entered: 12/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Unicorn Construction Enterprises, Inc.. (KD) (Entered: 12/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (KD) (Entered: 12/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (KD) (Entered: 12/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Eric R. Komitee and Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (KD) (Entered: 12/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Charles R. Virginia on behalf of Trustees of the Local 1010 Apprenticeship, Skill Improvement and Training Fund, Trustees of the Pavers District Council Apprenticeship, Skill Improvement and Training Fund, Trustees of the Pavers and Road Builders District Council Welfare, Pension, Annuity Funds (aty to be noticed) (Virginia, Charles) (Entered: 12/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Unicorn Construction Enterprises, Inc. filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-16256593 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Trustees of the Pavers and Road Builders District Council Welfare, Pension, Annuity Funds, Trustees of the Pavers District Council Apprenticeship, Skill Improvement and Training Fund, Trustees of the Local 1010 Apprenticeship, Skill Improvement and Training Fund. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Grancio, Adrianna) (Entered: 12/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less