This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/22/2023 at 01:59:44 (UTC).

Trustees of the Pavers and Road Builders District Council Welfare, Pension, and Annuity Funds et al v. VREX Construction Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 08/26/2022 Trustees of the Pavers and Road Builders District Council Welfare, Pension, and Annuity Funds filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against VREX Construction Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Ann M Donnelly and Roanne L. Mann. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-05100

  • Filing Date:

    08/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ann M Donnelly

Referral Judge

Roanne L. Mann

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Trustees of the Pavers and Road Builders District Council Welfare, Pension, and Annuity Funds

The Trustees of the Local 1010 Apprenticeship, Skill Improvement, and Training Fund

Defendants

VREX Construction Inc.

United States Fire Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Charles R. Virginia

Adrianna R Grancio

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Charles R. Virginia on behalf of The Trustees of the Local 1010 Apprenticeship, Skill Improvement, and Training Fund, Trustees of the Pavers and Road Builders District Council Welfare, Pension, and Annuity Funds (aty to be noticed) (Virginia, Charles) (Entered: 08/26/2022)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 08/29/2022)

#4

(#4) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 08/29/2022)

#5

(#5) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 08/29/2022)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Trustees of the Pavers and Road Builders District Council Welfare, Pension, and Annuity Funds, The Trustees of the Local 1010 Apprenticeship, Skill Improvement, and Training Fund. VREX Construction Inc. served on 9/1/2022, answer due 9/22/2022. (Virginia, Charles) (Entered: 09/09/2022)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Trustees of the Pavers and Road Builders District Council Welfare, Pension, and Annuity Funds, The Trustees of the Local 1010 Apprenticeship, Skill Improvement, and Training Fund. United States Fire Insurance Company served on 9/13/2022, answer due 10/4/2022. (Grancio, Adrianna) (Entered: 09/19/2022)

#9

(#9) Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT It appearing from the docket maintained in this action that defendant VREX Construction Inc. has failed to appear or otherwise defend this action, the default of defendant VREX Construction Inc. is hereby noted pursuant to Rule 55a of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (JP) (Entered: 10/03/2022)

#10

(#10) STIPULATION and Order Extending United States Fire Insurance Company's Time to Respond to the Complaint by United States Fire Insurance Company (Bondy, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/13/2022)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against United States Fire Insurance Company, VREX Construction Inc. filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-15883613 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Trustees of the Pavers and Road Builders District Council Welfare, Pension, and Annuity Funds, The Trustees of the Local 1010 Apprenticeship, Skill Improvement, and Training Fund. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Grancio, Adrianna) (Entered: 08/26/2022)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Proposed Summons

#8

(#8) Request for Certificate of Default by The Trustees of the Local 1010 Apprenticeship, Skill Improvement, and Training Fund, Trustees of the Pavers and Road Builders District Council Welfare, Pension, and Annuity Funds (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Adrianna R. Grancio in Support, #2 Proposed Default Certificate) (Grancio, Adrianna) (Entered: 09/26/2022)

8 #1

Declaration of Adrianna R. Grancio in Support

8 #2

Proposed Default Certificate

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketORDER DE #10: Application granted. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 10/14/2022. (LK) (Entered: 10/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STIPULATION and Order Extending United States Fire Insurance Company's Time to Respond to the Complaint by United States Fire Insurance Company (Bondy, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT It appearing from the docket maintained in this action that defendant VREX Construction Inc. has failed to appear or otherwise defend this action, the default of defendant VREX Construction Inc. is hereby noted pursuant to Rule 55a of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (JP) (Entered: 10/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Request for Certificate of Default by The Trustees of the Local 1010 Apprenticeship, Skill Improvement, and Training Fund, Trustees of the Pavers and Road Builders District Council Welfare, Pension, and Annuity Funds (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Adrianna R. Grancio in Support, #2 Proposed Default Certificate) (Grancio, Adrianna) (Entered: 09/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Trustees of the Pavers and Road Builders District Council Welfare, Pension, and Annuity Funds, The Trustees of the Local 1010 Apprenticeship, Skill Improvement, and Training Fund. United States Fire Insurance Company served on 9/13/2022, answer due 10/4/2022. (Grancio, Adrianna) (Entered: 09/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Trustees of the Pavers and Road Builders District Council Welfare, Pension, and Annuity Funds, The Trustees of the Local 1010 Apprenticeship, Skill Improvement, and Training Fund. VREX Construction Inc. served on 9/1/2022, answer due 9/22/2022. (Virginia, Charles) (Entered: 09/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 08/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 08/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 08/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Ann M Donnelly and Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 08/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Charles R. Virginia on behalf of The Trustees of the Local 1010 Apprenticeship, Skill Improvement, and Training Fund, Trustees of the Pavers and Road Builders District Council Welfare, Pension, and Annuity Funds (aty to be noticed) (Virginia, Charles) (Entered: 08/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against United States Fire Insurance Company, VREX Construction Inc. filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-15883613 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Trustees of the Pavers and Road Builders District Council Welfare, Pension, and Annuity Funds, The Trustees of the Local 1010 Apprenticeship, Skill Improvement, and Training Fund. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Grancio, Adrianna) (Entered: 08/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less