This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/22/2023 at 01:55:09 (UTC).

Trustees of the Pavers and Road Builders District Council Welfare, Pension, and Annuity Funds et al v. Perfetto Enterprises Co., Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/25/2022 Trustees of the Pavers and Road Builders District Council Welfare, Pension, and Annuity Funds filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Perfetto Enterprises Co , Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Marcia M. Henry and Diane Gujarati. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-05052

  • Filing Date:

    08/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Marcia M. Henry

Presiding Judge

Diane Gujarati

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Trustees of the Pavers and Road Builders District Council Welfare, Pension, and Annuity Funds

Trustees of the Pavers District Council Apprenticeship, Skill Improvement and Training Fund

Trustees of the Local 1010 Apprenticeship, Skill Improvement and Training Fund

Defendant

Perfetto Enterprises Co., Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Charles R. Virginia

Adrianna R Grancio

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 08/26/2022)

#3

(#3) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 08/26/2022)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Perfetto Enterprises Co., Inc.. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 08/26/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Charles R. Virginia on behalf of Trustees of the Local 1010 Apprenticeship, Skill Improvement and Training Fund, Trustees of the Pavers District Council Apprenticeship, Skill Improvement and Training Fund, Trustees of the Pavers and Road Builders District Council Welfare, Pension, and Annuity Funds (aty to be noticed) (Virginia, Charles) (Entered: 08/26/2022)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Trustees of the Pavers and Road Builders District Council Welfare, Pension, and Annuity Funds, Trustees of the Local 1010 Apprenticeship, Skill Improvement and Training Fund, Trustees of the Pavers District Council Apprenticeship, Skill Improvement and Training Fund. Perfetto Enterprises Co., Inc. served on 8/26/2022, answer due 9/16/2022. (Grancio, Adrianna) (Entered: 08/30/2022)

#8

(#8) Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT It appearing from the docket maintained in this action that defendant Perfetto Enterprises Co., Inc. has failed to appear or otherwise defend this action, the default of defendant Perfetto Enterprises Co., Inc. is hereby noted pursuant to Rule 55a of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Poveda, J.) (Entered: 09/23/2022)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Perfetto Enterprises Co., Inc. filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-15880328 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Trustees of the Pavers and Road Builders District Council Welfare, Pension, and Annuity Funds, Trustees of the Local 1010 Apprenticeship, Skill Improvement and Training Fund, Trustees of the Pavers District Council Apprenticeship, Skill Improvement and Training Fund. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Grancio, Adrianna) (Entered: 08/25/2022)

1 #1

Proposed Summons

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#7

(#7) Request for Certificate of Default by Trustees of the Local 1010 Apprenticeship, Skill Improvement and Training Fund, Trustees of the Pavers District Council Apprenticeship, Skill Improvement and Training Fund, Trustees of the Pavers and Road Builders District Council Welfare, Pension, and Annuity Funds (Attachments: #1 Affirmation of Adrianna Grancio in support of Certificate, #2 Proposed Default Certificate) (Grancio, Adrianna) (Entered: 09/19/2022)

7 #1

Affirmation of Adrianna Grancio in support of Certificate

7 #2

Proposed Default Certificate

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT It appearing from the docket maintained in this action that defendant Perfetto Enterprises Co., Inc. has failed to appear or otherwise defend this action, the default of defendant Perfetto Enterprises Co., Inc. is hereby noted pursuant to Rule 55a of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Poveda, J.) (Entered: 09/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Request for Certificate of Default by Trustees of the Local 1010 Apprenticeship, Skill Improvement and Training Fund, Trustees of the Pavers District Council Apprenticeship, Skill Improvement and Training Fund, Trustees of the Pavers and Road Builders District Council Welfare, Pension, and Annuity Funds (Attachments: #1 Affirmation of Adrianna Grancio in support of Certificate, #2 Proposed Default Certificate) (Grancio, Adrianna) (Entered: 09/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Trustees of the Pavers and Road Builders District Council Welfare, Pension, and Annuity Funds, Trustees of the Local 1010 Apprenticeship, Skill Improvement and Training Fund, Trustees of the Pavers District Council Apprenticeship, Skill Improvement and Training Fund. Perfetto Enterprises Co., Inc. served on 8/26/2022, answer due 9/16/2022. (Grancio, Adrianna) (Entered: 08/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Charles R. Virginia on behalf of Trustees of the Local 1010 Apprenticeship, Skill Improvement and Training Fund, Trustees of the Pavers District Council Apprenticeship, Skill Improvement and Training Fund, Trustees of the Pavers and Road Builders District Council Welfare, Pension, and Annuity Funds (aty to be noticed) (Virginia, Charles) (Entered: 08/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Perfetto Enterprises Co., Inc.. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 08/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 08/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 08/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Diane Gujarati and Magistrate Judge Marcia M. Henry. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 08/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Perfetto Enterprises Co., Inc. filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-15880328 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Trustees of the Pavers and Road Builders District Council Welfare, Pension, and Annuity Funds, Trustees of the Local 1010 Apprenticeship, Skill Improvement and Training Fund, Trustees of the Pavers District Council Apprenticeship, Skill Improvement and Training Fund. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Grancio, Adrianna) (Entered: 08/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less