This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/22/2023 at 01:54:53 (UTC).

Trustees of the Pavers and Road Builders District Council Welfare, Pension, and Annuity Funds et al v. Cape Mount Heavy Construction & Associates, LLC

Case Summary

On 08/25/2022 Trustees of the Pavers and Road Builders District Council Welfare, Pension, and Annuity Funds filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Cape Mount Heavy Construction Associates, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Kiyo A. Matsumoto and James R. Cho. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-05050

  • Filing Date:

    08/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kiyo A. Matsumoto

Referral Judge

James R. Cho

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Trustees of the Pavers and Road Builders District Council Welfare, Pension, and Annuity Funds

The Trustees of the Local 1010 Apprenticeship, Skill Improvement and Training Fund

Defendant

Cape Mount Heavy Construction & Associates, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Charles R. Virginia

Adrianna R Grancio

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Cape Mount Heavy Construction & Associates, LLC. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 08/26/2022)

#3

(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 08/26/2022)

#4

(#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 08/26/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Charles R. Virginia on behalf of The Trustees of the Local 1010 Apprenticeship, Skill Improvement and Training Fund, Trustees of the Pavers and Road Builders District Council Welfare, Pension, and Annuity Funds (aty to be noticed) (Virginia, Charles) (Entered: 08/26/2022)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Trustees of the Pavers and Road Builders District Council Welfare, Pension, and Annuity Funds, The Trustees of the Local 1010 Apprenticeship, Skill Improvement and Training Fund. Cape Mount Heavy Construction & Associates, LLC served on 8/26/2022, answer due 9/16/2022. (Grancio, Adrianna) (Entered: 08/30/2022)

#8

(#8) Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT It appearing from the docket maintained in this action that defendant Cape Mount Heavy Construction & Associates, LLC has failed to appear or otherwise defend this action, the default of defendant Cape Mount Heavy Construction & Associates, LLC is hereby noted pursuant to Rule 55a of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Poveda, J.) (Entered: 09/23/2022)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Cape Mount Heavy Construction & Associates, LLC filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-15880128 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Trustees of the Pavers and Road Builders District Council Welfare, Pension, and Annuity Funds, The Trustees of the Local 1010 Apprenticeship, Skill Improvement and Training Fund. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Grancio, Adrianna) (Entered: 08/25/2022)

1 #1

Proposed Summons

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#7

(#7) Request for Certificate of Default by The Trustees of the Local 1010 Apprenticeship, Skill Improvement and Training Fund, Trustees of the Pavers and Road Builders District Council Welfare, Pension, and Annuity Funds (Attachments: #1 Affirmation of Adrianna Grancio in support of Certificate, #2 Proposed Default Certificate) (Grancio, Adrianna) (Entered: 09/19/2022)

7 #1

Affirmation of Adrianna Grancio in support of Certificate

7 #2

Proposed Default Certificate

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT It appearing from the docket maintained in this action that defendant Cape Mount Heavy Construction & Associates, LLC has failed to appear or otherwise defend this action, the default of defendant Cape Mount Heavy Construction & Associates, LLC is hereby noted pursuant to Rule 55a of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Poveda, J.) (Entered: 09/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Request for Certificate of Default by The Trustees of the Local 1010 Apprenticeship, Skill Improvement and Training Fund, Trustees of the Pavers and Road Builders District Council Welfare, Pension, and Annuity Funds (Attachments: #1 Affirmation of Adrianna Grancio in support of Certificate, #2 Proposed Default Certificate) (Grancio, Adrianna) (Entered: 09/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Trustees of the Pavers and Road Builders District Council Welfare, Pension, and Annuity Funds, The Trustees of the Local 1010 Apprenticeship, Skill Improvement and Training Fund. Cape Mount Heavy Construction & Associates, LLC served on 8/26/2022, answer due 9/16/2022. (Grancio, Adrianna) (Entered: 08/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Charles R. Virginia on behalf of The Trustees of the Local 1010 Apprenticeship, Skill Improvement and Training Fund, Trustees of the Pavers and Road Builders District Council Welfare, Pension, and Annuity Funds (aty to be noticed) (Virginia, Charles) (Entered: 08/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 08/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 08/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Cape Mount Heavy Construction & Associates, LLC. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 08/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto and Magistrate Judge James R. Cho. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 08/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Cape Mount Heavy Construction & Associates, LLC filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-15880128 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Trustees of the Pavers and Road Builders District Council Welfare, Pension, and Annuity Funds, The Trustees of the Local 1010 Apprenticeship, Skill Improvement and Training Fund. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Grancio, Adrianna) (Entered: 08/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less