This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/10/2023 at 09:40:33 (UTC).

Trustees of the Pavers and Road Builders District Council Welfare, Pension, and Annuity Funds et al v. Bedford Landscape Contractors, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 01/09/2023 Trustees of the Pavers and Road Builders District Council Welfare, Pension, and Annuity Funds filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Bedford Landscape Contractors, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Hector Gonzalez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-00118

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Hector Gonzalez

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Trustees of the Pavers and Road Builders District Council Welfare, Pension, and Annuity Funds

The Trustees of the Local 1010 Apprenticeship, Skill Improvement, and Training Fund

Defendants

Bedford Landscape Contractors, LLC

Hudson Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Adrianna R Grancio

Attorney at Virginia & Ambinder, LLP

40 Broad Street, 7Th Floor

New York, NY 10004

Charles R. Virginia

Attorney at Virginia & Ambinder LLP

40 Broad Street, 7Th Floor

New York, NY 10004

Defendant Attorney

Seth David Rosmarin

Attorney at Westermann Sheehy Keenan Samaan & Aydelott, LLP

333 Earle Ovington Blvd, Suite 702

Uniondale, NY 11553

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by The Trustees of the Local 1010 Apprenticeship, Skill Improvement, and Training Fund, Trustees of the Pavers and Road Builders District Council Welfare, Pension, and Annuity Funds re Order,,,,, upon Defendant, Bedford Landscape Contractors, LLC (Grancio, Adrianna) (Entered: 02/28/2023)

#16

(#16) ORDER: The Court adopts the parties' proposed case management plan, see ECF No. #11 , as the Court's scheduling order required by Rule 16(b), with the adjustments reflected in the accompanying order. Ordered by Judge Hector Gonzalez on 2/28/2023. (BH) (Entered: 02/28/2023)

#15

(#15) First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Hudson Insurance Company. (Rosmarin, Seth) (Entered: 02/28/2023)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Seth David Rosmarin on behalf of Hudson Insurance Company (aty to be noticed) (Rosmarin, Seth) (Entered: 02/28/2023)

#13

(#13) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by The Trustees of the Local 1010 Apprenticeship, Skill Improvement, and Training Fund, Trustees of the Pavers and Road Builders District Council Welfare, Pension, and Annuity Funds re #11 Proposed Scheduling Order, #12 Letter, upon Defendant, Bedford Landscape Contractors, LLC (Grancio, Adrianna) (Entered: 02/27/2023)

#12

(#12) Letter detailing the instant action pursuant to your Honors January 12, 2023 Order by The Trustees of the Local 1010 Apprenticeship, Skill Improvement, and Training Fund, Trustees of the Pavers and Road Builders District Council Welfare, Pension, and Annuity Funds (Grancio, Adrianna) (Entered: 02/27/2023)

#11

(#13) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by The Trustees of the Local 1010 Apprenticeship, Skill Improvement, and Training Fund, Trustees of the Pavers and Road Builders District Council Welfare, Pension, and Annuity Funds re #11 Proposed Scheduling Order, #12 Letter, upon Defendant, Bedford Landscape Contractors, LLC (Grancio, Adrianna) (Entered: 02/27/2023)

#10

ORDER: Plaintiffs served a copy of their complaint and a summons on Defendant Bedford Landscape Contractors, LLC on January 10, 2023, via the New York Secretary of State, See ECF No. #6 . On February 9, 2023, Plaintiffs sent the summons and complaint by mail to Defendant's last known business address and to an email address that Plaintiffs believe that Defendant uses. See ECF No. #10 . Defendant Bedford Landscape Contractors, LLC has not entered an appearance, filed an answer, or otherwise responded to Plaintiffs' complaint, and its time to respond to Plaintiffs' complaint has expired.Plaintiffs shall request a certificate of default from the Clerk of Court with respect to Defendant Bedford Landscape Contractors, LLC on or before March 14, 2023, pursuant to Rule 55(a), if Defendant has not appeared as of that date. If any representative of Defendant Bedford Landscape Contractors, LLC has contacted Plaintiffs' counsel since Plaintiffs' complaint was filed, Plaintiffs shall inform that person of this order as soon as reasonably possible and shall do so in writing if possible. Plaintiffs shall also send a copy of this order, as soon as reasonably possible, to the email address associated with Defendant Bedford Landscape Contractors, LLC that Plaintiffs used to send Defendant a courtesy copy of the summons and complaint. Ordered by Judge Hector Gonzalez on 2/28/2023. (BH) (Entered: 02/28/2023)

#8

(#8) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by The Trustees of the Local 1010 Apprenticeship, Skill Improvement, and Training Fund, Trustees of the Pavers and Road Builders District Council Welfare, Pension, and Annuity Funds re #7 Scheduling Order, upon Defendants, Bedford Landscape Contractors, LLC and Hudson Insurance Company (Grancio, Adrianna) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

#7

(#8) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by The Trustees of the Local 1010 Apprenticeship, Skill Improvement, and Training Fund, Trustees of the Pavers and Road Builders District Council Welfare, Pension, and Annuity Funds re #7 Scheduling Order, upon Defendants, Bedford Landscape Contractors, LLC and Hudson Insurance Company (Grancio, Adrianna) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

#6

ORDER: Plaintiffs served a copy of their complaint and a summons on Defendant Bedford Landscape Contractors, LLC on January 10, 2023, via the New York Secretary of State, See ECF No. #6 . On February 9, 2023, Plaintiffs sent the summons and complaint by mail to Defendant's last known business address and to an email address that Plaintiffs believe that Defendant uses. See ECF No. #10 . Defendant Bedford Landscape Contractors, LLC has not entered an appearance, filed an answer, or otherwise responded to Plaintiffs' complaint, and its time to respond to Plaintiffs' complaint has expired.Plaintiffs shall request a certificate of default from the Clerk of Court with respect to Defendant Bedford Landscape Contractors, LLC on or before March 14, 2023, pursuant to Rule 55(a), if Defendant has not appeared as of that date. If any representative of Defendant Bedford Landscape Contractors, LLC has contacted Plaintiffs' counsel since Plaintiffs' complaint was filed, Plaintiffs shall inform that person of this order as soon as reasonably possible and shall do so in writing if possible. Plaintiffs shall also send a copy of this order, as soon as reasonably possible, to the email address associated with Defendant Bedford Landscape Contractors, LLC that Plaintiffs used to send Defendant a courtesy copy of the summons and complaint. Ordered by Judge Hector Gonzalez on 2/28/2023. (BH) (Entered: 02/28/2023)

1 #2

Proposed Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Bedford Landscape Contractors, LLC, Hudson Insurance Company filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-16289019 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Trustees of the Pavers and Road Builders District Council Welfare, Pension, and Annuity Funds, The Trustees of the Local 1010 Apprenticeship, Skill Improvement, and Training Fund. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Grancio, Adrianna) (Entered: 01/09/2023)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Bedford Landscape Contractors, LLC, Hudson Insurance Company. (KD) (Entered: 01/09/2023)

#4

(#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (KD) (Entered: 01/09/2023)

#3

(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (KD) (Entered: 01/09/2023)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Charles R. Virginia on behalf of The Trustees of the Local 1010 Apprenticeship, Skill Improvement, and Training Fund, Trustees of the Pavers and Road Builders District Council Welfare, Pension, and Annuity Funds (aty to be noticed) (Virginia, Charles) (Entered: 01/09/2023)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketORDER. A Settlement Conference is set for 4/12/2023 at 2:30 PM in person in Courtroom 13A South before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. Counsel and parties with full settlement authority are required to participate. On or before 4/5/2023, counsel are to send the parties' ex parte settlement conference letters via email to Scanlon_Chambers@nyed.uscourts.gov in accordance with this Court's Individual Rules. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 3/3/2023. (JR) (Entered: 03/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by The Trustees of the Local 1010 Apprenticeship, Skill Improvement, and Training Fund, Trustees of the Pavers and Road Builders District Council Welfare, Pension, and Annuity Funds re Order,,,,, upon Defendant, Bedford Landscape Contractors, LLC (Grancio, Adrianna) (Entered: 02/28/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER: In response to the parties' proposed case management plan requesting a settlement conference, see ECF No. #11 , the Court respectfully refers this case, for settlement purposes only, to Magistrate Judge Scanlon to conduct a settlement conference on a date agreed upon with Judge Scanlon.The parties must diligently pursue their discovery obligations concurrently with their settlement efforts, in accordance with the deadlines in the Court's scheduling order, see ECF No. #16 . The Court will not extend the current deadline for fact discovery unless the parties demonstrate good cause, and the fact that the parties have been pursuing settlement negotiations will not by itself constitute good cause. Ordered by Judge Hector Gonzalez on 2/28/2023. (BH) (Entered: 02/28/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER: Defendant Hudson Insurance Company shall file an answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' complaint on or before March 14, 2023, as agreed by Defendant and Plaintiffs in their stipulation. See ECF No. #15 . Ordered by Judge Hector Gonzalez on 2/28/2023. (BH) (Entered: 02/28/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER: Plaintiffs served a copy of their complaint and a summons on Defendant Bedford Landscape Contractors, LLC on January 10, 2023, via the New York Secretary of State, See ECF No. #6 . On February 9, 2023, Plaintiffs sent the summons and complaint by mail to Defendant's last known business address and to an email address that Plaintiffs believe that Defendant uses. See ECF No. #10 . Defendant Bedford Landscape Contractors, LLC has not entered an appearance, filed an answer, or otherwise responded to Plaintiffs' complaint, and its time to respond to Plaintiffs' complaint has expired.Plaintiffs shall request a certificate of default from the Clerk of Court with respect to Defendant Bedford Landscape Contractors, LLC on or before March 14, 2023, pursuant to Rule 55(a), if Defendant has not appeared as of that date. If any representative of Defendant Bedford Landscape Contractors, LLC has contacted Plaintiffs' counsel since Plaintiffs' complaint was filed, Plaintiffs shall inform that person of this order as soon as reasonably possible and shall do so in writing if possible. Plaintiffs shall also send a copy of this order, as soon as reasonably possible, to the email address associated with Defendant Bedford Landscape Contractors, LLC that Plaintiffs used to send Defendant a courtesy copy of the summons and complaint. Ordered by Judge Hector Gonzalez on 2/28/2023. (BH) (Entered: 02/28/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER: The Court adopts the parties' proposed case management plan, see ECF No. #11 , as the Court's scheduling order required by Rule 16(b), with the adjustments reflected in the accompanying order. Ordered by Judge Hector Gonzalez on 2/28/2023. (BH) (Entered: 02/28/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Hudson Insurance Company. (Rosmarin, Seth) (Entered: 02/28/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Seth David Rosmarin on behalf of Hudson Insurance Company (aty to be noticed) (Rosmarin, Seth) (Entered: 02/28/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by The Trustees of the Local 1010 Apprenticeship, Skill Improvement, and Training Fund, Trustees of the Pavers and Road Builders District Council Welfare, Pension, and Annuity Funds re #11 Proposed Scheduling Order, #12 Letter, upon Defendant, Bedford Landscape Contractors, LLC (Grancio, Adrianna) (Entered: 02/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Letter detailing the instant action pursuant to your Honors January 12, 2023 Order by The Trustees of the Local 1010 Apprenticeship, Skill Improvement, and Training Fund, Trustees of the Pavers and Road Builders District Council Welfare, Pension, and Annuity Funds (Grancio, Adrianna) (Entered: 02/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Trustees of the Pavers and Road Builders District Council Welfare, Pension, and Annuity Funds, The Trustees of the Local 1010 Apprenticeship, Skill Improvement, and Training Fund. Hudson Insurance Company served on 1/17/2023, answer due 2/7/2023. (Grancio, Adrianna) (Entered: 01/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by The Trustees of the Local 1010 Apprenticeship, Skill Improvement, and Training Fund, Trustees of the Pavers and Road Builders District Council Welfare, Pension, and Annuity Funds re #7 Scheduling Order, upon Defendants, Bedford Landscape Contractors, LLC and Hudson Insurance Company (Grancio, Adrianna) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SCHEDULING ORDER: Counsel for all parties are directed to file on the docket a joint letter describing the case and a completed civil case management plan by February 27, 2023, as further described in the attached mandatory requirements. Requests for adjournment of the deadline for these submissions will be considered only if made in writing and otherwise in accordance with Section I.D of the Court's Individual Practices. Ordered by Judge Hector Gonzalez on 1/12/2023. (BH) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Trustees of the Pavers and Road Builders District Council Welfare, Pension, and Annuity Funds, The Trustees of the Local 1010 Apprenticeship, Skill Improvement, and Training Fund. Bedford Landscape Contractors, LLC served on 1/10/2023, answer due 1/31/2023. (Grancio, Adrianna) (Entered: 01/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Bedford Landscape Contractors, LLC, Hudson Insurance Company. (KD) (Entered: 01/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (KD) (Entered: 01/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (KD) (Entered: 01/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Hector Gonzalez. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (KD) (Entered: 01/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Charles R. Virginia on behalf of The Trustees of the Local 1010 Apprenticeship, Skill Improvement, and Training Fund, Trustees of the Pavers and Road Builders District Council Welfare, Pension, and Annuity Funds (aty to be noticed) (Virginia, Charles) (Entered: 01/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Bedford Landscape Contractors, LLC, Hudson Insurance Company filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-16289019 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Trustees of the Pavers and Road Builders District Council Welfare, Pension, and Annuity Funds, The Trustees of the Local 1010 Apprenticeship, Skill Improvement, and Training Fund. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Grancio, Adrianna) (Entered: 01/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less