This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/19/2021 at 09:19:25 (UTC).

Trustees of the Operating Engineers' Trust Funds v. Wayne's Enterprises, Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/20/2021 Trustees of the Operating Engineers' Trust Funds filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Wayne's Enterprises, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Hawaii District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is WES REBER PORTER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00352

  • Filing Date:

    08/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WES REBER PORTER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Trustees of the Operating Engineers' Trust Funds

Hawaii Operating Engineers Annuity Trust Fund

Operating Engineers and Participating Employers Pre Apprentice, Apprentice and Journeyman Affirmative Action Training Fund for Hawaii

Defendant

Wayne's Enterprises, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jerry P.S. Chang

Attorney at Weinberg Roger & Rosenfeld

220 South King St Ste 901

Honolulu, HI 96813

Ashley K Ikeda

Attorney at Weinberg Roger & Rosenfeld

220 South King St Ste 901

Honolulu, HI 96813

 

Court Documents

#9

#8

RESTRICTED

#7

6 #1

Consent Form

#6

5 #2

AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons

5 #1

AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons

#5

4 #1

Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosures

#4

#2

1 #4

[Proposed] Summons

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2021
  • Docket(#10) EO: The Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is CONTINUED from 10/18/2021 to 11/23/2021 at 8:45am before Magistrate Judge Wes Reber Porter via AT&T Connect Audio Conference at 1-888-278-0296 / Access Code: 8224751. Plaintiffs shall notify Defendant. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(jp) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Trustees of the Operating Engineers' Trust Funds. Wayne's Enterprises, Inc. served on 9/10/2021. (Ikeda, Ashley) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Consent Election Form (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to Wayne's Enterprises, Inc. (jo) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. YOU MUST COMPLETE AND FILE THE ATTACHED ELECTION FORM. Each party must indicate consent or decline to consent by completing the attached Election Form and returning it to the Clerk's Office no later than twenty-one 21 days after entry of appearance.In the event a dispositive motion is filed prior to the date on which the submission of the Election Form is required, the parties must return the completed Election Form within seven (7) calendar days after the motion is filed. FILING INSTRUCTIONS: After completing the form, ALL registered CM/ECF participants are now required to e-file this document. Use the event Consent Election Form , found under Civil Events; Other Filings; Consent Election Form. All other parties MUST file the form by mail, or in person, at the Clerks Office: U.S. District Court, 300 Ala Moana Blvd Room C-338 Honolulu, HI 96850, Attention: Consent Clerk. The form can be found on the court's website http://www.hid.uscourts.gov ATTACH THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (jo) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (jo) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 09:00 AM on 10/18/2021 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 8/23/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosures) ATTACH THE ORDER SETTING RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (jo) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil Case Number CV 21-00352 WRP on all further pleadings. (jo) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet by Trustees of the Operating Engineers' Trust Funds. (Ikeda, Ashley) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Complaint for Specific Performance, Assumpsit and Damages against Wayne's Enterprises, Inc., a Hawaii corporation ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0975-2568505.), filed by Trustees of the Operating Engineers' Trust Funds. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 [Proposed] Summons)(Ikeda, Ashley) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Hawaii Operating Engineers Annuity Trust Fund is a litigant

Latest cases where Trustees Of The Operating Engineers' Trust Fund(Pension Trust Fund) is a litigant

Latest cases where OPERATING ENGINEERS AND PARTICIPATING EMPLOYERS PRE-APPRENTICE AND JOURNEYMAN AFFIRMATIVE ACTION TRAINING FUND is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ashley K Ikeda