This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/10/2021 at 08:33:31 (UTC).

Trustees of the New York City District Council of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund et al v. Advanced Construction Equipment Corp., et al

Case Summary

On 10/11/2021 Trustees of the New York City District Council of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Advanced Construction Equipment Corp . This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is John P. Cronan. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-08377

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John P. Cronan

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Trustees of the New York City District Council of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund

Trustees of the New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund

The Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York

Defendants

Advanced Construction Equipment Corp.,

S&N Builders, Inc.

Spring Roc LLC.

Zarco Contracting, Inc.

BQE Industries, Inc.

M.S.T. General Contracting Restoration, Inc.

The Landmark Group, Inc.

Army Construction, Inc.

North American Specialty Insurance Company

John Doe Nos. 1-11

Spring Roc LL

The Landmark Group

Army Construction, LLC

Spring Roc LLC

Advanced Construction Equipment Corp.

The Landmark Group Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Nicole Marimon

Attorney at Virginia & Ambinder, LLP

40 Broad Street, 7Th Floor

New York, NY 10004

 

Court Documents

#40

(#40) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) Advanced Construction Equipment Corp., Army Construction, LLC, BQE Industries, Inc., John Doe Nos. 1-11, M.S.T. General Contracting Restoration, Inc., North American Specialty Insurance Company, S&N Builders, Inc., Spring Roc LLC, The Landmark Group Inc., Zarco Contracting, Inc.. Document filed by The Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York, Trustees of the New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund, Trustees of the New York City District Council of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Marimon, Nicole) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

#39

(#39) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,, served. S&N Builders, Inc. served on 11/12/2021, answer due 12/3/2021. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky, an authorized person in the corporation division of the department of state. Document filed by The Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York; Trustees of the New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund; Trustees of the New York City District Council of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund..(Marimon, Nicole) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

#38

(#38) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,, served. Advanced Construction Equipment Corp. served on 11/12/2021, answer due 12/3/2021. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky, an authorized person in the corporation division of the department of state. Document filed by The Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York; Trustees of the New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund; Trustees of the New York City District Council of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund..(Marimon, Nicole) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

#37

(#37) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,, served. Zarco Contracting, Inc. served on 11/12/2021, answer due 12/3/2021. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky, an authorized person in the corporation division of the department of state. Document filed by The Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York; Trustees of the New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund; Trustees of the New York City District Council of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund..(Marimon, Nicole) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

#36

(#36) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,, served. Spring Roc LLC served on 11/12/2021, answer due 12/3/2021. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky, an authorized person in the corporation division of the department of state. Document filed by The Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York; Trustees of the New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund; Trustees of the New York City District Council of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund..(Marimon, Nicole) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

#35

(#35) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,, served. The Landmark Group Inc. served on 11/10/2021, answer due 12/1/2021. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky, an authorized person in the corporation division of the department of state. Document filed by The Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York; Trustees of the New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund; Trustees of the New York City District Council of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund..(Marimon, Nicole) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

#34

(#34) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,, served. Army Construction, LLC served on 11/10/2021, answer due 12/1/2021. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky, an authorized person in the corporation division of the department of state. Document filed by The Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York; Trustees of the New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund; Trustees of the New York City District Council of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund..(Marimon, Nicole) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

#33

(#33) ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to S&N Builders, Inc...(pc) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

#32

(#32) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Advanced Construction Equipment Corp...(pc) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

#31

(#31) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to S&N Builders, Inc., re: #19 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by The Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York, Trustees of the New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund, Trustees of the New York City District Council of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund..(Marimon, Nicole) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

#30

No Description Available

#29

No Description Available

#28

No Description Available

#27

No Description Available

#26

No Description Available

#25

No Description Available

#24

No Description Available

#23

No Description Available

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) Advanced Construction Equipment Corp., Army Construction, LLC, BQE Industries, Inc., John Doe Nos. 1-11, M.S.T. General Contracting Restoration, Inc., North American Specialty Insurance Company, S&N Builders, Inc., Spring Roc LLC, The Landmark Group Inc., Zarco Contracting, Inc.. Document filed by The Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York, Trustees of the New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund, Trustees of the New York City District Council of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Marimon, Nicole) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,, served. S&N Builders, Inc. served on 11/12/2021, answer due 12/3/2021. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky, an authorized person in the corporation division of the department of state. Document filed by The Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York; Trustees of the New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund; Trustees of the New York City District Council of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund..(Marimon, Nicole) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,, served. Advanced Construction Equipment Corp. served on 11/12/2021, answer due 12/3/2021. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky, an authorized person in the corporation division of the department of state. Document filed by The Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York; Trustees of the New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund; Trustees of the New York City District Council of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund..(Marimon, Nicole) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,, served. Zarco Contracting, Inc. served on 11/12/2021, answer due 12/3/2021. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky, an authorized person in the corporation division of the department of state. Document filed by The Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York; Trustees of the New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund; Trustees of the New York City District Council of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund..(Marimon, Nicole) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,, served. Spring Roc LLC served on 11/12/2021, answer due 12/3/2021. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky, an authorized person in the corporation division of the department of state. Document filed by The Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York; Trustees of the New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund; Trustees of the New York City District Council of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund..(Marimon, Nicole) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,, served. The Landmark Group Inc. served on 11/10/2021, answer due 12/1/2021. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky, an authorized person in the corporation division of the department of state. Document filed by The Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York; Trustees of the New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund; Trustees of the New York City District Council of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund..(Marimon, Nicole) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,, served. Army Construction, LLC served on 11/10/2021, answer due 12/1/2021. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky, an authorized person in the corporation division of the department of state. Document filed by The Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York; Trustees of the New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund; Trustees of the New York City District Council of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund..(Marimon, Nicole) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to S&N Builders, Inc...(pc) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Advanced Construction Equipment Corp...(pc) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to S&N Builders, Inc., re: #19 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by The Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York, Trustees of the New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund, Trustees of the New York City District Council of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund..(Marimon, Nicole) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint, against Advanced Construction Equipment Corp,, Army Construction, LLC, BQE Industries, Inc., John Doe Nos. 1-11, M.S.T. General Contracting Restoration, Inc., North American Specialty Insurance Company, S&N Builders, Inc., The Landmark Group., Zarco Contracting, Inc..Document filed by The Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York, Trustees of the New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund, Trustees of the New York City District Council of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund. Related document: #1 Complaint.(Marimon, Nicole) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Nicole Marimon to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; party name must match pleading caption. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (vf) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (vf) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John P. Cronan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Nicole Marimon. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Spring Roc LLC.; John Doe Nos. 1-11. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted; party name entered incorrectly. (vf) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by The Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York, Trustees of the New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund, Trustees of the New York City District Council of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund..(Marimon, Nicole) (Entered: 10/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT - SUMMONS REQUEST - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Advanced Construction Equipment Corp., S&N Builders, Inc., Spring Roc LLC., Zarco Contracting, Inc., BQE Industries, Inc., M.S.T. General Contracting Restoration, Inc., The Landmark Group, Inc., Army Construction, Inc., and North American Specialty Insurance Company, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by The Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York, Trustees of the New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund, Trustees of the New York City District Council of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund..(Marimon, Nicole) Modified on 10/12/2021 (vf). (Entered: 10/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Marimon, Nicole) (Entered: 10/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Advanced Construction Equipment Corp.,, Army Construction, Inc., BQE Industries, Inc., John Doe Nos. 1-11, M.S.T. General Contracting Restoration, Inc., North American Specialty Insurance Company, S&N Builders, Inc., Spring Roc LLC., The Landmark Group, Inc., Zarco Contracting, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25177331)Document filed by The Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York, Trustees of the New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund, Trustees of the New York City District Council of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund..(Marimon, Nicole) (Entered: 10/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York is a litigant

Latest cases where North American Company for Life and Health Insurance is a litigant