This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/19/2021 at 08:29:58 (UTC).

Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund et al v. Earth Construction Corp.

Case Summary

On 02/18/2021 Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund filed a Labor - National Labor Relations Act lawsuit against Earth Construction Corp. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is John P. Cronan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01443

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - National Labor Relations Act

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John P. Cronan

 

Party Details

Petitioners

The New York City District Council of Carpenters

Trustees Of The New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund

Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund

The Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York

Respondent

Earth Construction Corp.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Marlie P. Blaise

Attorney at Virginia & Ambinder, LLP

40 Broad Street, 7Th Floor

New York, NY 10004

Nicole Marimon

Attorney at Virginia & Ambinder, LLP

40 Broad Street, 7Th Floor

New York, NY 10004

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) ORDER: Petitioners filed a Petition to Confirm an Arbitration Award in this action on February 18, 2021. (Dkt. 1.) Respondent was served on February 26, 2021, making its answer due by March 19, 2021. (Dkt. 8.) To date, Respondent has not appeared in this action nor answered the Petition. Petitioners are ordered to request a Clerks Certificate of Default or a status letter updating the Court on the status of this case by April 21, 2021. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 4/15/2021) (js) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration,, served. Earth Construction Corp. served on 2/26/2021, answer due 3/19/2021. Service was accepted by Nancy Dougherty, an authorized person in the Corporation Division of the Department of State. Document filed by Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund ; The New York City District Council of Carpenters; The Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York; Trustees Of The New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund..(Blaise, Marlie) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

#7

(#7) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Earth Construction Corp...(jgo) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nicole Marimon on behalf of The Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York, The New York City District Council of Carpenters, Trustees Of The New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund, Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund..(Marimon, Nicole) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

#5

(#5) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration,, . Document filed by The Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York, The New York City District Council of Carpenters, Trustees Of The New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund, Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund..(Blaise, Marlie) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

#4

(#4) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by The Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York, The New York City District Council of Carpenters, Trustees Of The New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund, Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund..(Blaise, Marlie) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

#3

(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Earth Construction Corp., re: #1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration,,. Document filed by The Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York, The New York City District Council of Carpenters, Trustees Of The New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund, Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund..(Blaise, Marlie) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

1 #10

Proposed Judgment

1 #9

History Bill

1 #8

Arbitration Award

1 #7

Notice of Hearing

1 #6

Collection Policy

1 #5

Resignation Notice

1 #4

2016 Extension Agreement

1 #3

2015 MOU

1 #2

2011-2015 CBA

1 #1

Membership Letter

#1

(#1) PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-23988512).Document filed by Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund, The New York City District Council of Carpenters, The Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York, Trustees Of The New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund. (Attachments: #1 Membership Letter, #2 2011-2015 CBA, #3 2015 MOU, #4 2016 Extension Agreement, #5 Resignation Notice, #6 Collection Policy, #7 Notice of Hearing, #8 Arbitration Award, #9 History Bill, #10 Proposed Judgment).(Blaise, Marlie) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER: Petitioners filed a Petition to Confirm an Arbitration Award in this action on February 18, 2021. (Dkt. 1.) Respondent was served on February 26, 2021, making its answer due by March 19, 2021. (Dkt. 8.) To date, Respondent has not appeared in this action nor answered the Petition. Petitioners are ordered to request a Clerks Certificate of Default or a status letter updating the Court on the status of this case by April 21, 2021. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 4/15/2021) (js) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration,, served. Earth Construction Corp. served on 2/26/2021, answer due 3/19/2021. Service was accepted by Nancy Dougherty, an authorized person in the Corporation Division of the Department of State. Document filed by Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund ; The New York City District Council of Carpenters; The Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York; Trustees Of The New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund..(Blaise, Marlie) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Earth Construction Corp...(jgo) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (jgo) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John P. Cronan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nicole Marimon on behalf of The Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York, The New York City District Council of Carpenters, Trustees Of The New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund, Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund..(Marimon, Nicole) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration,, . Document filed by The Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York, The New York City District Council of Carpenters, Trustees Of The New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund, Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund..(Blaise, Marlie) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by The Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York, The New York City District Council of Carpenters, Trustees Of The New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund, Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund..(Blaise, Marlie) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Earth Construction Corp., re: #1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration,,. Document filed by The Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York, The New York City District Council of Carpenters, Trustees Of The New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund, Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund..(Blaise, Marlie) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Blaise, Marlie) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-23988512).Document filed by Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund, The New York City District Council of Carpenters, The Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York, Trustees Of The New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund. (Attachments: #1 Membership Letter, #2 2011-2015 CBA, #3 2015 MOU, #4 2016 Extension Agreement, #5 Resignation Notice, #6 Collection Policy, #7 Notice of Hearing, #8 Arbitration Award, #9 History Bill, #10 Proposed Judgment).(Blaise, Marlie) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less