This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/13/2021 at 10:58:38 (UTC).

Trustees of the Hawaii Laborers' Trust Funds v. Paradise Landscape Maintenance

Case Summary

On 02/12/2021 Trustees of the Hawaii Laborers' Trust Funds filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Paradise Landscape Maintenance. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Hawaii District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT and WES REBER PORTER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00089

  • Filing Date:

    02/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT

Referral Judge

WES REBER PORTER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Vacation & Holiday Fund

Annuity Fund

Laborers' and Employers' Cooperation and Education Trust Fund (LECET)

Apprenticeship and Training Fund

Pension Fund

Trustees of the Hawaii Laborers' Trust Funds

Health & Welfare Fund

Defendant

Paradise Landscape Maintenance

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jerry P.S. Chang

Attorney at Weinberg Roger & Rosenfeld

220 South King St Ste 901

Honolulu, HI 96813

Ashley K Ikeda

Attorney at Weinberg Roger & Rosenfeld

220 South King St Ste 901, 528-8880, Fax: 528-8881

Honolulu, HI 96813

 

Court Documents

#13

#12

11 #5

Certificate of Service

11 #4

[Proposed] Default Judgment

11 #3

Statement of Amounts Due

11 #2

Declaration of Troy Tonini

11 #1

Declaration of Ashley K. Ikeda

#11

#9

8 #2

[Proposed] Order

8 #1

Declaration of Ashley K. Ikeda

#8

#7

6 #2

AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons

6 #1

AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons

#6

5 #1

Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosures

#5

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) AMENDED DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK Against Defendant Paradise Landscape Maintenance, a Hawaii corporation, re ECF No. #11 Amendment to ECF #12 (jo) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK Against Defendant Paradise Landscape Maintenance, a Hawaii corporation, re ECF No. #11 (jo) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) REQUEST Default Judgment by Trustees of the Hawaii Laborers' Trust Funds. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ashley K. Ikeda, #2 Declaration of Troy Tonini, #3 Statement of Amounts Due, #4 [Proposed] Default Judgment, #5 Certificate of Service)(Ikeda, Ashley) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • Docket(#10) EO: Based on the Entry of Default, the Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 4/12/2021 is VACATED. Plaintiffs shall file the appropriate motion for default judgment no later than 5/12/2021. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(jp) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Paradise Landscape Maintenance pursuant to ECF #8 (jo) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Request for Entry of Default by Trustees of the Hawaii Laborers' Trust Funds. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ashley K. Ikeda, #2 [Proposed] Order)(Ikeda, Ashley) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Trustees of the Hawaii Laborers' Trust Funds. All Defendants. Paradise Landscape Maintenance served on 2/14/2021 (Ikeda, Ashley) Modified on 2/23/2021 (jo) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notie to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons)(emt, ) (Entered: 02/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 4/12/2021 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 2/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosures) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, ) (Entered: 02/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Paradise Landscape Maintenance. (emt, ) (Entered: 02/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 21-00089 JMS-WRP on all further pleadings. (emt, ) (Entered: 02/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet by Trustees of the Hawaii Laborers' Trust Funds. (Ikeda, Ashley) (Entered: 02/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Complaint for Specific Performance, Assumpsit and Damages against Paradise Landscape Maintenance ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0975-2484781.), filed by Trustees of the Hawaii Laborers' Trust Funds. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 [Proposed] Summons)(Ikeda, Ashley) (Entered: 02/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Vacation & Holiday Trust Fund is a litigant

Latest cases where Laborers' and Employers' Cooperation and Education Trust Fund (LECET) is a litigant