This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/24/2021 at 09:23:07 (UTC).

Trustees of the Hawaii Laborers' Trust Funds v. Maui Traffic Control Services, LLC, a Hawaii Limited Liability Company

Case Summary

On 07/26/2021 Trustees of the Hawaii Laborers' Trust Funds filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Maui Traffic Control Services, LLC, a Hawaii Limited Liability Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Hawaii District. The Judges overseeing this case are DERRICK K. WATSON and KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00320

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DERRICK K. WATSON

Referral Judge

KENNETH J. MANSFIELD

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Trustees of the Hawaii Laborers' Trust Funds

Health & Welfare Fund

Vacation & Holiday Fund

Defendant

Maui Traffic Control Services, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jerry P.S. Chang

Attorney at Weinberg Roger & Rosenfeld

220 South King St Ste 901

Honolulu, HI 96813

Ashley K Ikeda

Attorney at Weinberg Roger & Rosenfeld

220 South King St Ste 901

Honolulu, HI 96813

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

[Proposed] Summons

#2

#4

4 #1

Memo Re: Corporate Disclosures

#5

5 #1

Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons

5 #2

Waiver of the Service of Summons

#6

#7

#8

#10

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF DISMISSAL OF COMPLAINT, FILED ON JULY 26, 2021 [DOCUMENT NO. #1 ]; ORDER by Health & Welfare Fund, Trustees of the Hawaii Laborers' Trust Funds, Vacation & Holiday Fund Health & Welfare Fund, Trustees of the Hawaii Laborers' Trust Funds, Vacation & Holiday Fund - Signed by JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 9/13/2021. (emt, ) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) EO: Pursuant to Plaintiffs' #8 letter request, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference previously set for 09/20/2021 IS CONTINUED TO 10/28/2021. Scheduling conference statements are due by 10/21/2021. Until further notice, for all hearings before Magistrate Judge Kenneth J. Mansfield, parties are to participate via telephone through our AT&T Service. Call-in information for this conference is below. Parties must connect to the conference at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the hearing.Dial in number is 1-877-848-7030Access Code is 2123668(MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(mansfield2) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Letter addressed to Magistrate Judge Kenneth J. Mansfield from Ashley K. Ikeda, Esq. and Jerry P. S. Chang, Esq., Re: Request to reschedule Rule 16 Scheduling Conference, dated August 27, 2021. (emt, ) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Trustees of the Hawaii Laborers' Trust Funds, Vacation & Holiday Fund, Health & Welfare Fund. Maui Traffic Control Services, LLC served on 7/30/2021. (Ikeda, Ashley) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Maui Traffic Control Services, LLC. (jni) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet - Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Attachments: #1 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons, #2 Waiver of the Service of Summons)(jni) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:30AM on 9/20/2021 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 7/26/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memo Re: Corporate Disclosures) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(jni) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 21-00320 DKW-KJM on all further pleadings.(jni) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet by Trustees of the Hawaii Laborers' Trust Funds. (Ikeda, Ashley) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Complaint for Specific Performance, Assumpsit and Damages against Maui Traffic Control Services, LLC, a Hawaii Limited Liability Company ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0975-2557102.), filed by Trustees of the Hawaii Laborers' Trust Funds. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 [Proposed] Summons)(Ikeda, Ashley) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Vacation & Holiday Trust Fund is a litigant

Latest cases where Trustees of the Hawaii Laborers' Trust Funds is a litigant

Latest cases where Health & Welfare Fund is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ashley K Ikeda