This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/08/2021 at 08:34:28 (UTC).

Trustees of the Hawaii Laborers' Trust Funds v. Advantage Landscape Hawaii Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/09/2021 Trustees of the Hawaii Laborers' Trust Funds filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Advantage Landscape Hawaii Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Hawaii District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are ROM TRADER and ALAN C. KAY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00263

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Referral Judge

ROM TRADER

Presiding Judge

ALAN C. KAY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Vacation & Holiday Fund

Annuity Fund

Laborers' and Employers' Cooperation and Education Trust Fund (LECET)

Apprenticeship and Training Fund

Pension Fund

Trustees of the Hawaii Laborers' Trust Funds

Health & Welfare Fund

Defendant

Advantage Landscape Hawaii Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ashley K Ikeda

Attorney at Weinberg Roger & Rosenfeld

220 South King St Ste 901

Honolulu, HI 96813

Jerry P.S. Chang

Attorney at Weinberg Roger & Rosenfeld

220 South King St Ste 901

Honolulu, HI 96813

 

Court Documents

#10

#9

8 #3

[Proposed] Default Judgment by Clerk Against Advantage Landscape Hawaii Inc., a

8 #2

Exhibit A to Declaration of Ashley K. Ikeda

8 #1

Declaration of Ashley K. Ikeda

#8

#7

6 #2

AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons

6 #1

AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons

#6

5 #1

Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosures

#5

#4

#2

1 #2

[Proposed] Summons

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Scheduling Conference Statement . (Ikeda, Ashley) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Advantage Landscape Hawaii Inc. pursuant to ECF #8 . (jni) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION Request for Entry of Default Judgment as to Defendant Advantage Landscape Hawaii Inc., a Hawaii corporation Ashley K Ikeda appearing for Plaintiffs Annuity Fund, Apprenticeship and Training Fund, Health & Welfare Fund, Laborers' and Employers' Cooperation and Education Trust Fund (LECET), Pension Fund, Trustees of the Hawaii Laborers' Trust Funds, Vacation & Holiday Fund (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ashley K. Ikeda, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Ashley K. Ikeda, #3 [Proposed] Default Judgment by Clerk Against Advantage Landscape Hawaii Inc., a Hawaii corporation)(Ikeda, Ashley) Docket Text Modified on 7/8/2021 (jni) Docket Text Modified on 7/9/2021 (jni) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Trustees of the Hawaii Laborers' Trust Funds. Advantage Landscape Hawaii Inc. served on 6/15/2021. (Ikeda, Ashley) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons)(emt, ) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 8/9/2021 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 6/9/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosures) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, ) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Advantage Landscape Hawaii Inc. (emt, ) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 21-00263 ACK-RT on all further pleadings. (emt, ) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet by Trustees of the Hawaii Laborers' Trust Funds. (Ikeda, Ashley) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Complaint for Specific Performance, Assumpsit and Damages against Advantage Landscape Hawaii Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0975-2537272.), filed by Trustees of the Hawaii Laborers' Trust Funds. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 [Proposed] Summons)(Ikeda, Ashley) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Trustees of the Hawaii Laborers' Trust Funds is a litigant

Latest cases where Laborers' and Employers' Cooperation and Education Trust Fund (LECET) is a litigant