This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/12/2022 at 10:17:30 (UTC).

Trustees of the Hawaii Laborers' Trust Funds v. Advantage Landscape Hawaii Inc.

Case Summary

On 01/11/2022 Trustees of the Hawaii Laborers' Trust Funds filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Advantage Landscape Hawaii Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Hawaii District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are JILL A. OTAKE and WES REBER PORTER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00019

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JILL A. OTAKE

Referral Judge

WES REBER PORTER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Trustees of the Hawaii Laborers' Trust Funds

Pension Fund

Health & Welfare Fund

Annuity Fund

Laborers' and Employers' Cooperation and Education Trust Fund (LECET)

Apprenticeship and Training Fund

Vacation & Holiday Fund

Defendant

Advantage Landscape Hawaii Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ashley K Ikeda

Attorney at Weinberg Roger & Rosenfeld

220 South King St Ste 901

Honolulu, HI 96813

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) NOTICE by Trustees of the Hawaii Laborers' Trust Funds Notice of Disaffiliation and Withdrawal of Jerry P.S. Chang as Counsel for Plaintiffs Trustees of the Hawaii Laborers' Trust Funds Trustees of the Hawaii Laborers' Trust Funds. (Ikeda, Ashley) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

#13

(#13) DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK Against Defendant Advantage Landscape Hawaii Inc., a Hawaii corporation. (eta) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

#12

(#12) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Annuity Fund, Apprenticeship and Training Fund, Health & Welfare Fund, Laborers' and Employers' Cooperation and Education Trust Fund (LECET), Pension Fund, Trustees of the Hawaii Laborers' Trust Funds, Vacation & Holiday Fund re #11 Request, (Ikeda, Ashley) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

11 #4

[Proposed] Default Judgment

11 #3

Statement of Amounts Due

11 #2

Declaration of Troy Tonini

11 #1

Declaration of Ashley K. Ikeda

11 #11

Main Document

#10

(#10) ENTRY OF DEFAULT Against Defendant Advantage Landscape Hawaii Inc., a Hawaii corporation re ECF No. #9 . (eta) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

9 #3

[Proposed] Entry of Default

9 #2

Exhibit A

9 #1

Declaration of Ashley K. Ikeda

9 #9

Main Document

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Trustees of the Hawaii Laborers' Trust Funds. Advantage Landscape Hawaii Inc. served on 1/12/2022. (Ikeda, Ashley) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

6 #2

AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons

6 #1

AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons

6 #6

Main Document

5 #1

Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosures

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE by Trustees of the Hawaii Laborers' Trust Funds Notice of Disaffiliation and Withdrawal of Jerry P.S. Chang as Counsel for Plaintiffs Trustees of the Hawaii Laborers' Trust Funds Trustees of the Hawaii Laborers' Trust Funds. (Ikeda, Ashley) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of #13 DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK has been served by First Class Mail to Advantage Landscape Hawaii, Inc. c/o Barry McNamara, President and Lily Galapon, at 6650 Hawaii Kai Drive, Suite 230, Honolulu, HI 96825 on February 7, 2022. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (eta) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK Against Defendant Advantage Landscape Hawaii Inc., a Hawaii corporation. (eta) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Annuity Fund, Apprenticeship and Training Fund, Health & Welfare Fund, Laborers' and Employers' Cooperation and Education Trust Fund (LECET), Pension Fund, Trustees of the Hawaii Laborers' Trust Funds, Vacation & Holiday Fund re #11 Request, (Ikeda, Ashley) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) REQUEST Entry of Default Judgment by Annuity Fund, Apprenticeship and Training Fund, Health & Welfare Fund, Laborers' and Employers' Cooperation and Education Trust Fund (LECET), Pension Fund, Trustees of the Hawaii Laborers' Trust Funds, Vacation & Holiday Fund. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ashley K. Ikeda, #2 Declaration of Troy Tonini, #3 Statement of Amounts Due, #4 [Proposed] Default Judgment)(Ikeda, Ashley) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ENTRY OF DEFAULT Against Defendant Advantage Landscape Hawaii Inc., a Hawaii corporation re ECF No. #9 . (eta) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Request for Entry of Default by Trustees of the Hawaii Laborers' Trust Funds. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ashley K. Ikeda, #2 Exhibit A, #3 [Proposed] Entry of Default)(Ikeda, Ashley) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Trustees of the Hawaii Laborers' Trust Funds. Advantage Landscape Hawaii Inc. served on 1/12/2022. (Ikeda, Ashley) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • Docket(#7) EO: The parties are directed to review the General Civil Case Procedures Before Judge Otake posted on the court's website and are expected to comply with the most recent version that is posted. (JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE)(shm) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons)(eta) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 3/8/2022 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 1/11/2022. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosures) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (eta) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Advantage Landscape Hawaii Inc. (eta) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 22-00019 JAO-WRP on all further pleadings. (eta) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet by Trustees of the Hawaii Laborers' Trust Funds. (Ikeda, Ashley) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Complaint for Specific Performance, Assumpsit and Damages against Advantage Landscape Hawaii Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AHIDC-2629031.), filed by Trustees of the Hawaii Laborers' Trust Funds. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 [Proposed] Summons)(Ikeda, Ashley) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Laborers' and Employers' Cooperation and Education Trust Fund (LECET) is a litigant

Latest cases where Trustees of the Hawaii Laborers' Trust Funds is a litigant