This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/07/2022 at 07:28:51 (UTC).

Trustees of the Hawaii Laborers' Trust Funds v. Advantage Landscape Hawaii Inc.

Case Summary

On 11/08/2021 Trustees of the Hawaii Laborers' Trust Funds filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Advantage Landscape Hawaii Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Hawaii District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI and KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00439

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI

Referral Judge

KENNETH J. MANSFIELD

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Trustees of the Hawaii Laborers' Trust Funds

Pension Fund

Health & Welfare Fund

Annuity Fund

Laborers' and Employers' Cooperation and Education Trust Fund (LECET)

Apprenticeship and Training Fund

Vacation & Holiday Fund by its Trustees

Vacation & Holiday Fund

Defendant

Advantage Landscape Hawaii Inc.

Garnishee

Bank of Hawaii

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ashley K Ikeda

Attorney at Weinberg Roger & Rosenfeld

220 South King St Ste 901

Honolulu, HI 96813

Jerry P.S. Chang

Attorney at Weinberg Roger & Rosenfeld

220 South King St Ste 901

Honolulu, HI 96813

 

Court Documents

21 #1

Exhibit A

21 #21

Main Document

#20

(#20) ORDER re #18 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 1/5/2022. (eta) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

#19

(#19) GARNISHEE ORDER (BANK OF HAWAII) - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 1/3/2022. (eta) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

18 #4

Exhibit A

18 #3

[Proposed] Garnishee Summons

18 #2

[Proposed] Order

18 #1

Declaration of Ashley K. Ikeda

18 #18

Main Document

5 #2

Waiver of the Service of Summons

5 #1

Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons

#5

(#5) CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet - Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Attachments: #1 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons, #2 Waiver of the Service of Summons)(jni) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

4 #1

Memo Re: Corporate Disclosures

#4

(#4) Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:30AM on 1/3/2022 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 11/8/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memo Re: Corporate Disclosures) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(jni) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet by Trustees of the Hawaii Laborers' Trust Funds. (Ikeda, Ashley) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

1 #2

[Proposed] Summons

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Complaint for Specific Performance, Assumpsit and Damages against Advantage Landscape Hawaii Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0975-2603097.), filed by Trustees of the Hawaii Laborers' Trust Funds. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 [Proposed] Summons)(Ikeda, Ashley) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

39 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) GARNISHEE SUMMONS ISSUED. ( Garnishee Summons Return Date Hearing set for 2/24/2022 09:45 AM in Telephonic Hearing before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Participants Dial: 877-848-7030, Access Code: 2123668.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (eta) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER re #18 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 1/5/2022. (eta) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) GARNISHEE ORDER (BANK OF HAWAII) - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 1/3/2022. (eta) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MOTION Ex Parte Motion for Issuance of Garnishee Summons After Judgment Ashley K Ikeda appearing for Plaintiff Trustees of the Hawaii Laborers' Trust Funds (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ashley K. Ikeda, #2 [Proposed] Order, #3 [Proposed] Garnishee Summons, #4 Exhibit A)(Ikeda, Ashley) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) EO: In light of the #16 Answer to Writ of Garnishment by Bank of Hawaii, the Garnishee Summons Return Date currently set for February 17, 2022 is hereby VACATED. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ANSWER and Disclosure of Bank of Hawaii; Certificate of Service - by Bank of Hawaii (jo) (Entered: 12/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #14 Order,, Set Hearings, Return of Service - Bank of Hawaii Acknowledgement filed by Trustees of the Hawaii Laborers' Trust Funds. (Ikeda, Ashley) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) GARNISHEE SUMMONS ISSUED. ( Garnishee Summons Return Date Hearing set for 2/17/2022 09:45 AM in Telephonic Hearing before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD.) Participants Dial: 877-848-7030, Access Code: 2123668 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (eta) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER re #12 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 12/28/2021. (eta) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION Ex Parte Motion for Issuance of Garnishee Summons After Judgment Ashley K Ikeda appearing for Plaintiff Trustees of the Hawaii Laborers' Trust Funds (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ashley K. Ikeda, #2 [Proposed] Order, #3 [Proposed] Garnishee Summons, #4 Exhibit A)(Ikeda, Ashley) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) REQUEST Entry of Default Judgment By Clerk Against Defendant Advantage Landscape Hawaii Inc., a Hawaii corporation by Trustees of the Hawaii Laborers' Trust Funds. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ashley K. Ikeda, #2 Declaration of Troy Tonini, #3 Statement of Amounts Due, #4 [Proposed] Default Judgment, #5 Certificate of Service)(Ikeda, Ashley) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ENTRY OF DEFAULT Against Defendant Advantage Landscape Hawaii Inc., a Hawaii corporation, re ECF No. #8 . (eta) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Request for Entry of Default Against Defendant Advantage Landscape Hawaii Inc., a Hawaii corporation by Trustees of the Hawaii Laborers' Trust Funds. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ashley K. Ikeda, #2 Exhibit A, #3 [Proposed] Entry of Default)(Ikeda, Ashley) Modified on 12/3/2021 (eta). (Entered: 12/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Trustees of the Hawaii Laborers' Trust Funds. Advantage Landscape Hawaii Inc. served on 11/9/2021. (Ikeda, Ashley) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Advantage Landscape Hawaii Inc. (jni) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet - Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Attachments: #1 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons, #2 Waiver of the Service of Summons)(jni) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:30AM on 1/3/2022 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 11/8/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memo Re: Corporate Disclosures) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(jni) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 21-00439 LEK-KJM on all further pleadings. (jni) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet by Trustees of the Hawaii Laborers' Trust Funds. (Ikeda, Ashley) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Complaint for Specific Performance, Assumpsit and Damages against Advantage Landscape Hawaii Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0975-2603097.), filed by Trustees of the Hawaii Laborers' Trust Funds. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 [Proposed] Summons)(Ikeda, Ashley) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bank of Hawaii is a litigant

Latest cases where Vacation & Holiday Trust Fund is a litigant

Latest cases where Pension Fund is a litigant

Latest cases where Laborers' and Employers' Cooperation and Education Trust Fund (LECET) is a litigant