This case was last updated from PACER on 09/06/2019 at 07:56:08 (UTC).

Trustees of the 4th District IBEW Health Fund et al v. City Electric Company

Case Summary

On 07/08/2019 Trustees of the 4th District IBEW Health Fund filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against City Electric Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, West Virginia Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is John T. Copenhaver, Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00502

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Virginia Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John T. Copenhaver, Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

National Electrical Benefit Fund

International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local 466 Pension Plan

International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local 466

National Electrical Annuity Plan

West Virginia-Ohio Valley Supplemental Health Fund

Trustees of the 4th District IBEW Health Fund

Defendant

City Electric Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John F. Dascoli

2442 Kanawha Boulevard East

Charleston, WV 25311

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 8/8/2019 as to City Electric Company. Certified Mail Number: 92148901125134100002565791. (ts)

#3

(#3) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to City Electric Company, re: #1 Complaint,. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (lca)

#2

(#2) STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (lca)

1 #13

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #12

Proposed Summons

1 #11

Attachment 11

1 #10

Attachment 10

1 #9

Attachment 9

1 #8

Attachment 8

1 #7

Attachment 7

1 #6

Attachment 6

1 #5

Attachment 5

1 #4

Attachment 4

1 #3

Attachment 3

1 #2

Attachment 2

1 #1

Attachment 1

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7310888. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2, #3 Attachment 3, #4 Attachment 4, #5 Attachment 5, #6 Attachment 6, #7 Attachment 7, #8 Attachment 8, #9 Attachment 9, #10 Attachment 10, #11 Attachment 11, #12 Proposed Summons, #13 Civil Cover Sheet) (lca) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 8/8/2019 as to City Electric Company. Certified Mail Number: 92148901125134100002565791. (ts)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to City Electric Company, re: #1 Complaint,. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (lca)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (lca)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7310888. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2, #3 Attachment 3, #4 Attachment 4, #5 Attachment 5, #6 Attachment 6, #7 Attachment 7, #8 Attachment 8, #9 Attachment 9, #10 Attachment 10, #11 Attachment 11, #12 Proposed Summons, #13 Civil Cover Sheet) (lca) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.