This case was last updated from PACER on 12/24/2020 at 08:18:39 (UTC).

TRUSTEES OF TEAMSTERS HEALTH & WELFARE FUND OF PHILADELPHIA & VICINITY v. MOULTON LADDER & SCAFFOLDING, LLC

Case Summary

On 10/25/2020 TRUSTEES OF TEAMSTERS HEALTH WELFARE FUND OF PHILADELPHIA VICINITY filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against MOULTON LADDER SCAFFOLDING, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Karen M. Williams and Noel L. Hillman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-14938

  • Filing Date:

    10/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Karen M. Williams

Presiding Judge

Noel L. Hillman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TRUSTEES OF TEAMSTERS HEALTH & WELFARE FUND OF PHILADELPHIA & VICINITY

Defendant

MOULTON LADDER & SCAFFOLDING, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

R. MATTHEW PETTIGREW, JR.

Attorney at MARKOWITZ & RICHMAN

123 South Broad Street, Suite 2020

Philadelphia, PA 19109

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by TRUSTEES OF TEAMSTERS HEALTH & WELFARE FUND OF PHILADELPHIA & VICINITY. MOULTON LADDER & SCAFFOLDING, LLC served on 11/13/2020, answer due 12/4/2020. (PETTIGREW, R.) (Entered: 12/13/2020)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to MOULTON LADDER & SCAFFOLDING, LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (pr, ) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by TRUSTEES OF TEAMSTERS HEALTH & WELFARE FUND OF PHILADELPHIA & VICINITY. (PETTIGREW, R.) (Entered: 10/25/2020)

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against MOULTON LADDER & SCAFFOLDING, LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-11554314), filed by TRUSTEES OF TEAMSTERS HEALTH & WELFARE FUND OF PHILADELPHIA & VICINITY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(PETTIGREW, R.) (Entered: 10/25/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by TRUSTEES OF TEAMSTERS HEALTH & WELFARE FUND OF PHILADELPHIA & VICINITY. MOULTON LADDER & SCAFFOLDING, LLC served on 11/13/2020, answer due 12/4/2020. (PETTIGREW, R.) (Entered: 12/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to MOULTON LADDER & SCAFFOLDING, LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (pr, ) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketJudge Noel L. Hillman and Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams added. (dd, ) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by TRUSTEES OF TEAMSTERS HEALTH & WELFARE FUND OF PHILADELPHIA & VICINITY. (PETTIGREW, R.) (Entered: 10/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against MOULTON LADDER & SCAFFOLDING, LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-11554314), filed by TRUSTEES OF TEAMSTERS HEALTH & WELFARE FUND OF PHILADELPHIA & VICINITY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(PETTIGREW, R.) (Entered: 10/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less