This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 07:38:35 (UTC).

Trustees of Michigan BAC Health Care Fund et al v. Tekton Enterprises LLC

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Trustees of Michigan BAC Health Care Fund filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Tekton Enterprises LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Ray Kent and Paul L. Maloney. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01026

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michigan Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Ray Kent

Presiding Judge

Paul L. Maloney

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Trustees of International Masonry Institute

International Union of Bricklayers and Allied Craftworkers

Trustees of Michigan BAC Health Care Fund

Trustees of Michigan BAC Pension Fund

Local 2 International Union of Bricklayers and Allied Craftworkers, AFL-CIO

Trustees of Michigan BAC Apprenticeship & Training Fund

Trustees of Bricklayers & Trowel Trades International Pension Fund

Defendant

Tekton Enterprises LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Lauren E. Crummel

Attorney at Legghio & Israel PC

306 S Washington Ave., Ste. 600

Royal Oak, MI 48067

Christopher P. Legghio

Attorney at Martens Ice Klass Legghio & Israel PC

306 S Washington Ave., Ste. 600

Royal Oak, MI 48067-3837

Megan B. Boelstler

Attorney at Legghio & Israel PC

306 S Washington Ave., Ste. 600

Royal Oak, MI 48067

Defendant Attorney

John Joseph Rolecki

Attorney at Varnum LLP

333 Bridge St., Nw, P.O. Box 352

Grand Rapids, MI 49501

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Index Exhibit Index

#9

(#9) STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER to Set Aside Default by defendant Tekton Enterprises LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Rolecki, John) (Entered: 01/20/2020)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Tekton Enterprises LLC (ems) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#8

(#8) (SET ASIDE) DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Tekton Enterprises LLC (ems) Modified text per Order #10 on 1/24/2020 (ems). (Entered: 01/08/2020)

1 #7

Exhibit 6 - BAC FBFs' Collection Policy

#7

(#7) APPLICATION for entry of default as to Tekton Enterprises LLC (Crummel, Lauren) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

#2

(#2) PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Crummel, Lauren) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

1 #6

Exhibit 5 - Tekton Forbearance Agreement

1 #9

Exhibit 8 - Sept 13, 2019 Tekton Letter Re FA Breach

#3

(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Trustees of International Masonry Institute, Trustees of Michigan BAC Apprenticeship & Training Fund, International Union of Bricklayers and Allied Craftworkers, Trustees of Michigan BAC Pension Fund, Local 2 International Union of Bricklayers and Allied Craftworkers, AFL-CIO, Trustees of Michigan BAC Health Care Fund, Trustees of Bricklayers & Trowel Trades International Pension Fund (Crummel, Lauren) Modified text on 12/6/2019 (ems). (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS returned executed; Tekton Enterprises LLC served on 12/17/2019, answer due 1/7/2020 (Legghio, Christopher) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney (ems) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#10

(#10) ORDER approving STIPULATION to set aside default #9 ; response to complaint due 2/7/2020; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

1 #5

Exhibit 4 - BAC FBFs' Trust Agreements and Amendments

1 #8

Exhibit 7 - Tekton Corporate Business Record

1 #4

Exhibit 3 - Tekton CBA Signature Page

1 #2

Exhibit 1 - 2014-2017 CBA

9 #1

Proposed Order

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER approving STIPULATION to set aside default #9 ; response to complaint due 2/7/2020; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER to Set Aside Default by defendant Tekton Enterprises LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Rolecki, John) (Entered: 01/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2020
  • Docket(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of John Joseph Rolecki on behalf of defendant Tekton Enterprises LLC (Rolecki, John) (Entered: 01/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • Docket(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of John Joseph Rolecki on behalf of defendant Tekton Enterprises LLC (Rolecki, John) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) (SET ASIDE) DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Tekton Enterprises LLC (ems) Modified text per Order #10 on 1/24/2020 (ems). (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) APPLICATION for entry of default as to Tekton Enterprises LLC (Crummel, Lauren) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS returned executed; Tekton Enterprises LLC served on 12/17/2019, answer due 1/7/2020 (Legghio, Christopher) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Tekton Enterprises LLC (ems) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney (ems) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Trustees of International Masonry Institute, Trustees of Michigan BAC Apprenticeship & Training Fund, International Union of Bricklayers and Allied Craftworkers, Trustees of Michigan BAC Pension Fund, Local 2 International Union of Bricklayers and Allied Craftworkers, AFL-CIO, Trustees of Michigan BAC Health Care Fund, Trustees of Bricklayers & Trowel Trades International Pension Fund (Crummel, Lauren) Modified text on 12/6/2019 (ems). (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Crummel, Lauren) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • Docket(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Megan B. Boelstler on behalf of plaintiffs Trustees of International Masonry Institute, Trustees of Michigan BAC Apprenticeship & Training Fund, International Union of Bricklayers and Allied Craftworkers, Trustees of Michigan BAC Pension Fund, Local 2 International Union of Bricklayers and Allied Craftworkers, AFL-CIO, Trustees of Michigan BAC Health Care Fund, Trustees of Bricklayers & Trowel Trades International Pension Fund (Boelstler, Megan) Modified text on 12/6/2019 (ems). (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • Docket(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Christopher P. Legghio on behalf of plaintiffs Trustees of International Masonry Institute, Trustees of Michigan BAC Apprenticeship & Training Fund, International Union of Bricklayers and Allied Craftworkers, Trustees of Michigan BAC Pension Fund, Local 2 International Union of Bricklayers and Allied Craftworkers, AFL-CIO, Trustees of Michigan BAC Health Care Fund, Trustees of Bricklayers & Trowel Trades International Pension Fund (Legghio, Christopher) Modified text on 12/6/2019 (ems). (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiffs Trustees of International Masonry Institute, Trustees of Michigan BAC Apprenticeship & Training Fund, International Union of Bricklayers and Allied Craftworkers, Trustees of Michigan BAC Pension Fund, Local 2 International Union of Bricklayers and Allied Craftworkers, AFL-CIO, Trustees of Michigan BAC Health Care Fund, Trustees of Bricklayers & Trowel Trades International Pension Fund in the amount of $400, receipt number AMIWDC-4680137 (Crummel, Lauren) Modified text on 12/6/2019 (ems). (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Tekton Enterprises LLC filed by Trustees of International Masonry Institute, Trustees of Michigan BAC Apprenticeship & Training Fund, International Union of Bricklayers and Allied Craftworkers, Trustees of Michigan BAC Pension Fund, Local 2 International Union of Bricklayers and Allied Craftworkers, AFL-CIO, Trustees of Michigan BAC Health Care Fund, Trustees of Bricklayers & Trowel Trades International Pension Fund (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - 2014-2017 CBA, #3 Exhibit 2 - 2017-2020 CBA, #4 Exhibit 3 - Tekton CBA Signature Page, #5 Exhibit 4 - BAC FBFs' Trust Agreements and Amendments, #6 Exhibit 5 - Tekton Forbearance Agreement, #7 Exhibit 6 - BAC FBFs' Collection Policy, #8 Exhibit 7 - Tekton Corporate Business Record, #9 Exhibit 8 - Sept 13, 2019 Tekton Letter Re FA Breach) (Crummel, Lauren) Modified text on 12/6/2019 (ems). (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.