This case was last updated from PACER on 07/05/2019 at 08:02:23 (UTC).

U.S. Bank, N.A. v. Grant

Case Summary

On 05/06/2019 U S Bank, N A filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Grant. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Connecticut District. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael P. Shea and Alvin W. Thompson. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00685

  • Filing Date:

    05/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Connecticut District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Michael P. Shea

Alvin W. Thompson

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

U.S. Bank N.A. Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust

U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.

Defendant

Andrew D. Grant

Wethersfield, CT 06109

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

William R. Dziedzic

Attorney at Bendett & McHugh PC-CT

160 Farmington Ave

Farmington, CT 06032

 

Court Documents

#24

(#24) ORDER: For the reasons set forth in the attached document, Plaintiff's Motion for Remand of Improperly Removed Case (ECF No. #8 ) is hereby GRANTED. This case is hereby remanded to Connecticut Superior Court, Judicial District of New Britain at New Britain. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 6/12/2019. (Jerjian, O.) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

23 #2

Transcript Requests

23 #1

State Court docket sheet

#23

(#23) Motions to be Heard by the U.S. District Court by Andrew D. Grant. Responses due by 7/1/2019 (Attachments: #1 State Court docket sheet, #2 Transcript Requests)(Agati, Kathryn) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

#22

(#22) MOTION for Extension of Time until 30 days for delivering the case files by Andrew D. Grant. (Agati, Kathryn) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

#20

(#20) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. *Andrew D. Grant* *P.O. Box 27-1678* *West Hartford, CT 06127*. (Agati, Kathryn) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

#19

(#25) ORDER: The Motion for the Federal Court to Notice the Superior Court of New Britain, Connecticut to Cease and Desist with all Court Activities Pertaining to my Case Docket Number HHBCV186041375 (ECF No. #19 ) is hereby DENIED. See ECF No. #24 . It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 6/12/2019. (Jerjian, O.) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

8 #1

Memorandum in Support Motion to Remand

#8

(#24) ORDER: For the reasons set forth in the attached document, Plaintiff's Motion for Remand of Improperly Removed Case (ECF No. #8 ) is hereby GRANTED. This case is hereby remanded to Connecticut Superior Court, Judicial District of New Britain at New Britain. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 6/12/2019. (Jerjian, O.) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

9 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#5

(#5) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 05/06/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana) (Entered: 05/08/2019)

#4

(#4) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 05/06/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana) (Entered: 05/08/2019)

#3

(#3) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 7/5/2019. Discovery due by 11/5/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 12/10/2019. Signed by Clerk on 05/06/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana) (Entered: 05/08/2019)

2 #1

attachment

#2

(#10) EXHIBIT A by Andrew D. Grant re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Murphy, Tatihana) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

1 #2

Supplement

1 #1

State Complaint

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Andrew D. Grant from State of Connecticut Superior Court, J.D. of New Britain, case number HHBCV186041375., filed by Andrew D. Grant. (Attachments: #1 State Complaint, #2 Supplement)(Murphy, Tatihana) (Entered: 05/08/2019)

57 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2019
  • Case remanded to State Court Judicial District of New Britain. (Ferguson, L.) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Ferguson, L.) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) ORDER: The Motion to be Heard by the U.S. District Court (ECF No. #23 ) is hereby DENIED. See ECF No. #24 . It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 6/12/2019. (Jerjian, O.) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) ORDER: The Motion for Extension of Time until 30 days for delivering the case files (ECF No. #22 ) is hereby DENIED. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 6/12/2019. (Jerjian, O.) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) ORDER: The Motion for the Federal Court to Notice the Superior Court of New Britain, Connecticut to Cease and Desist with all Court Activities Pertaining to my Case Docket Number HHBCV186041375 (ECF No. #19 ) is hereby DENIED. See ECF No. #24 . It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 6/12/2019. (Jerjian, O.) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) ORDER: For the reasons set forth in the attached document, Plaintiff's Motion for Remand of Improperly Removed Case (ECF No. #8 ) is hereby GRANTED. This case is hereby remanded to Connecticut Superior Court, Judicial District of New Britain at New Britain. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 6/12/2019. (Jerjian, O.) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) Motions to be Heard by the U.S. District Court by Andrew D. Grant. Responses due by 7/1/2019 (Attachments: #1 State Court docket sheet, #2 Transcript Requests)(Agati, Kathryn) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) MOTION for Extension of Time until 30 days for delivering the case files by Andrew D. Grant. (Agati, Kathryn) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. *Andrew D. Grant* *P.O. Box 27-1678* *West Hartford, CT 06127*. (Agati, Kathryn) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) Retraction: Regarding Summons in a Civil Action Delivered to the Court on June 6, 2019 by Andrew D. Grant (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Agati, Kathryn) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) EXHIBIT A by Andrew D. Grant re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Murphy, Tatihana) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) First MOTION to Remand to State Court by U.S. Bank Trust, N.A..Responses due by 5/31/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Motion to Remand)(Dziedzic, William) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by William R. Dziedzic on behalf of U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. (Dziedzic, William) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL COMPLAINT against U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., filed by Andrew D. Grant. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Murphy, Tatihana) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • (#6) NOTICE TO COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO THE BAR OF THE US DISTRICT COURT OF CONNECTICUT Re: Local Rule 83.1 Admission of Attorneys. The above captioned case has been received and filed in our court. Please see our Local Rule 83.1 regarding Admission of Attorneys that is available on our website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. You will not be added to the case, nor will we accept further filings until you have complied with Local Rule 83.1. If you have any questions about this procedure, please contact the Clerk's Office. Signed by Clerk on 05/6/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 05/06/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana) (Entered: 05/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 05/06/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana) (Entered: 05/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 7/5/2019. Discovery due by 11/5/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 12/10/2019. Signed by Clerk on 05/06/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana) (Entered: 05/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Andrew D. Grant. (Attachments: #1 attachment)(Murphy, Tatihana) (Entered: 05/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Andrew D. Grant from State of Connecticut Superior Court, J.D. of New Britain, case number HHBCV186041375., filed by Andrew D. Grant. (Attachments: #1 State Complaint, #2 Supplement)(Murphy, Tatihana) (Entered: 05/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.