This case was last updated from PACER on 07/14/2020 at 11:21:27 (UTC).

Trust & Verify Data Protection LLC v. Signifyd Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/15/2020 Trust Verify Data Protection LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Signifyd Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judge overseeing this case is Kristen L. Mix. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01392

  • Filing Date:

    05/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Colorado District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kristen L. Mix

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Trust & Verify Data Protection LLC

Defendant

Signifyd Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Isaac Philip Rabicoff

Attorney at Rabicoff Law LLC

73 West Monroe Street

Chicago, IL 60603

 

Court Documents

11 #1

Proposed Order (PDF Only)

#11

(#11) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Plaintiff Trust & Verify Data Protection LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

#10

(#10) MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 6/12/20 GRANTING #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. Signifyd Inc. answer to Complaint due 7/13/2020.(nmarb, ) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

#9

(#9) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Plaintiff Trust & Verify Data Protection LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

8 #2

Attachment 2

8 #1

Attachment 1

#8

(#8) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 5/26/20 Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 9/2/2020. Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 9/9/2020 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2) (nmarb, ) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

5 #1

Magistrate Judge Consent Form

#5

(#5) SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (trvo, ) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Isaac Philip Rabicoff on behalf of Trust & Verify Data Protection LLC (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

#2

(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Patent Infringement against Signifyd Inc. (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7297309)Attorney Isaac Philip Rabicoff added to party Trust & Verify Data Protection LLC(pty:pla), filed by Trust & Verify Data Protection LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons)(Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Plaintiff Trust & Verify Data Protection LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 6/12/20 GRANTING #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. Signifyd Inc. answer to Complaint due 7/13/2020.(nmarb, ) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Plaintiff Trust & Verify Data Protection LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 5/26/20 Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 9/2/2020. Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 9/9/2020 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2) (nmarb, ) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • Docket(#7) MINUTE ORDER. Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c)(4), the deadline to file the Consent/Non-Consent to United States Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form [#5-1] is August 26, 2020. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 5/26/2020. Text Only Entry (klmlc2, ) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Report re Patent/Trademark: Report on the filing of an action emailed (NEF) to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (trvo, ) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (trvo, ) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • Docket(#4) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (trvo, ) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Isaac Philip Rabicoff on behalf of Trust & Verify Data Protection LLC (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Patent Infringement against Signifyd Inc. (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7297309)Attorney Isaac Philip Rabicoff added to party Trust & Verify Data Protection LLC(pty:pla), filed by Trust & Verify Data Protection LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons)(Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less