This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/15/2019 at 07:44:08 (UTC).

Trusell v. Walker et al

Case Summary

On 02/14/2019 Trusell filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Walker. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Ivan D. Davis and T. S. Ellis, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00183

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    Virginia Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Ivan D. Davis

Presiding Judge

T. S. Ellis, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Anthony Trusell

Aleberta, VA 23821

Defendants

Dr. Lapid

Ms. Walker

Crystal Willett

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service of Summons mailed pursuant to Order dated 3/28/2019. (rban, ) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

#7

(#7) ORDERED that plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis #2 be and is GRANTED and plaintiff's complaint is deemed filed as of this date; that plaintiff's failure to leave 20% of his monthly deposits in his inmate account in accordance with the Consent Form constitutes cause for dismissal of this civil action; that defendants file an answer or other responsive pleading to the complaint in accordance with the attached notice of lawsuit and request for waiver of summons; that, within 21 days of any defendant filing a responsive pleading, plaintiff file any opposition; that plaintiff serve a copy of every document he files in this proceeding upon all parties by mailing the document to each party's counsel; that plaintiff's failure to notify the Court immediately upon being transferred, released, or otherwise relocated, may result in the dismissal of this complaint; that if service on any defendant through this Order is unsuccessful and that defendants are not otherwise served within 90 days of this order being entered, that defendant will be dismissed from the instant action without prejudice; that plaintiff's correctional institution send the Clerk no initial filing fee, and thereafter submit 20% of plaintiff's preceding month's income any time his monthly account balance is at least $10. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 3/28/2019. (rban, copies mailed as directed) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

#6

(#6) Consent to Collection of Fees by Anthony Trusell. (dvanm, ) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

(#4) ORDER conditionally granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 3/8/2019. (see Order for details) (dvanm, ) (Entered: 03/11/2019)

#3

(#3) Acknowledgment of Receipt. (dvanm, ) (Entered: 03/01/2019)

#2

RESTRICTED

1 #2

Envelope

1 #1

Data Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Dr. Lapid, Ms. Walker, Crystal Willett, filed by Anthony Trusell. (Attachments: #1 Data Sheet, #2 Envelope)(dvanm, ) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service of Summons mailed pursuant to Order dated 3/28/2019. (rban, ) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDERED that plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis #2 be and is GRANTED and plaintiff's complaint is deemed filed as of this date; that plaintiff's failure to leave 20% of his monthly deposits in his inmate account in accordance with the Consent Form constitutes cause for dismissal of this civil action; that defendants file an answer or other responsive pleading to the complaint in accordance with the attached notice of lawsuit and request for waiver of summons; that, within 21 days of any defendant filing a responsive pleading, plaintiff file any opposition; that plaintiff serve a copy of every document he files in this proceeding upon all parties by mailing the document to each party's counsel; that plaintiff's failure to notify the Court immediately upon being transferred, released, or otherwise relocated, may result in the dismissal of this complaint; that if service on any defendant through this Order is unsuccessful and that defendants are not otherwise served within 90 days of this order being entered, that defendant will be dismissed from the instant action without prejudice; that plaintiff's correctional institution send the Clerk no initial filing fee, and thereafter submit 20% of plaintiff's preceding month's income any time his monthly account balance is at least $10. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 3/28/2019. (rban, copies mailed as directed) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Consent to Collection of Fees by Anthony Trusell. (dvanm, ) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement received from Meherrin River Regional Jail. (dvanm, ) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER conditionally granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 3/8/2019. (see Order for details) (dvanm, ) (Entered: 03/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Acknowledgment of Receipt. (dvanm, ) (Entered: 03/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Anthony Trusell. (dvanm, ) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Dr. Lapid, Ms. Walker, Crystal Willett, filed by Anthony Trusell. (Attachments: #1 Data Sheet, #2 Envelope)(dvanm, ) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ms. Walker is a litigant