This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/10/2022 at 09:19:37 (UTC).

Trump et al v. Meta Platforms, Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 11/22/2021 Trump filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Meta Platforms, Inc . This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jacqueline Scott Corley and Jeffrey S. White. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-09044

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Jacqueline Scott Corley

Jeffrey S. White

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

President Donald J. Trump

Elizabeth Albert

Bobby Michael

Kiyan Michael

Jennifer Horton

Andres Cabos

Magalys Rios

Maria Rodriguez-Fresneda

Defendants

Facebook Inc.

Mark Zuckerberg

Interested Parties

Christopher Sevier

John Gunter Jr.

Pastor Rich Penkoski

Cris Ericson

Chester, VT 05143

United States of America

Kevin W. Cassaday

David Andrew Christenson

Miramar Beach, FL 32550

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Matthew Lee Baldwin

Attorney at Vargas Gonzalez Hevia Baldwin, LLP

815 Ponce De Leon Blvd.Third Floor

Coral Gables, FL 33134

Andrei Dan Popovici

Attorney at Law Office of Andrei D. Popovici, P.C.

2121 North California Blvd. #290

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

John Q. Kelly

Attorney at Ivey, Barnum & O'Mara

170 Mason Street

Greenwich, CT 06830

Michael J. Jones

Attorney at Ivey, Barnum & O'Mara

170 Mason Street

Greenwich, CT 06830

Richard Polk Lawson

Attorney at Gardner Brewer Martinez Monfort

400 N. Ashley Dr.Ste. 1100

Tampa, FL 33602

Frank C. Dudenhefer, Jr.

Attorney at The Dudenhefer Law Firm L.L.C

2721 Saint Charles Ave., Suite 2A

New Orleans, LA 70130

John P. Coale

2901 Fessenden St. Nw

Washington, DC 20008

Roland A. Paul

Attorney at Ivey Barnum & O'Mara

170 Mason Street

Greenwich, CT 06830

Ryan Tougias

Attorney at Ivey, Barnum & O'Mara

170 Mason Street

Greenwich, CT 06830

Frank C. Dudenhefer

2721 S.T Charles Ave., 2A

New Orleans, LA 70130

Defendant Attorneys

Craig Primis

Attorney at Kirlland & Ellis, LLP

1301 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20004

Ronald K. Anguas, Jr.

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP

1301 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20004

Katherine Epstein

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP

1301 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20004

James Xi

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP

1301 Pennsylvania Avenue Nwste 1128

Washington, DC 20004

Ashley Elizabeth Littlefield

Attorney at Kirkland and Ellis LLP

555 California St.Suite 2700

San Francisco, CA 94104

Kenneth Winn Allen

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis-DC

655 Fifteenth Street, N.W.Suite 1200

Washington, DC 20005

Maria Josefa Beguiristain

Attorney at White & Case

200 S Biscayne Boulevardsuite 4900

Miami, FL 33131-2352

William Dylan Fay

Attorney at White & Case LLP

200 S. Biscayne Blvd.Suite 4900

Miami, FL 33131

Interested Party Attorneys

Greg Degeyter

9898 Bissonnet Streetsuite 626

Houston, TX 77036

Joshua Kolsky

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

1100 L Street Nw

Washington, DC 20005

7 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#154

(#154) ORDER GRANTING #153 STIPULATION Staying Alternative Dispute Resolution And Rule 16 Deadlines Pending Motion To Dismiss Order. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/3/22. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2022) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

153 #1

Proposed Order

153 #153

Main Document

152 #1

Appendix Copy of Reply Brief ISO Motion to Consolidate to be filed in Trump et a

152 #152

Main Document

150 #2

Proposed Order

150 #1

Exhibit A

150 #150

Main Document

149 #149

Main Document

#117

(#117) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Elizabeth Albert, Andres Cabos, Jennifer Horton, Bobby Michael, Kiyan Michael, Magalys Rios, Maria Rodriguez-Fresneda, Donald J. Trump.. (Popovici, Andrei) (Filed on 11/29/2021) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

116 #116

Main Document

115 #1

Supplement Certificate of Good Standing

115 #115

Main Document

#114

(#114) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrei Dan Popovici on behalf of Plaintiffs. (Popovici, Andrei) (Filed on 11/22/2021) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

#113

(#113) CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs and Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by December 6, 2021. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2021) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

#112

(#112) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/17/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/24/2022 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2021) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

111 #1

*Restricted*

111 #111

Main Document Public Docket Sheet

79 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#154) ORDER GRANTING #153 STIPULATION Staying Alternative Dispute Resolution And Rule 16 Deadlines Pending Motion To Dismiss Order. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/3/22. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2022) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#153) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulated Request For An Order Staying Alternative Dispute Resolution And Rule 16 Deadlines Pending Motion To Dismiss Order filed by Facebook Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Anguas, Ronald) (Filed on 12/27/2021) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#152) NOTICE by Donald J. Trump of Filing of Reply Brief ISO Motion to Consolidate in Trump et al. v. Youtube et al., 4:21-cv-08009-JSW (Attachments: #1 Appendix Copy of Reply Brief ISO Motion to Consolidate to be filed in Trump et al. v. Youtube et al., Case No. 4:21-cv-08009-JSW)(Popovici, Andrei) (Filed on 12/21/2021) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#151) ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting #150 Stipulation to Amend Case Caption. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2021) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#150) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulated Motion to Amend Case Caption filed by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Anguas, Ronald) (Filed on 12/17/2021) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#149) NOTICE by Facebook Inc., Mark Zuckerberg of Filing of Opposition to Motion for Consolidation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Littlefield, Ashley) (Filed on 12/15/2021) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#148) ORDER SETTING DEADLINE FOR THE UNITED STATES MEMORANDUM IN DEFENSE OF 47 U.S.C. 230(C) re #109 NOTICE of Intervention, and Motion to Set Deadline for United States' Memorandum in Defense of 47 U.S.C. 230(C). Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 12/15/21. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2021) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines as to #78 Motion for Preliminary Injunction: Responses due by 1/14/2022. Replies due by 2/7/2022. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2021) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#147) ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED #146 STIPULATION SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND PAGE LIMITS FOR MOTION TO DISMISS AND MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION BRIEFING. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 12/15/21. Motions to Dismiss due by 1/14/2022. Responses due by 2/7/2022. Replies due by 2/28/2022; Opposition to #78 Motion for Preliminary Injunction due 1/14/2022; Reply due 2/7/2022(jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2021) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#146) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulated Request For An Order Setting Briefing Schedule And Page Limits For Motion To Dismiss And Motion For Preliminary Injunction Briefing filed by Facebook Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Littlefield, Ashley) (Filed on 12/14/2021) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 11/29/2021
  • Docket(#119) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2021) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#118) NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Andrei Dan Popovici Withdrawal of Matthew Lee Baldwin (Popovici, Andrei) (Filed on 11/29/2021) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#117) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Elizabeth Albert, Andres Cabos, Jennifer Horton, Bobby Michael, Kiyan Michael, Magalys Rios, Maria Rodriguez-Fresneda, Donald J. Trump.. (Popovici, Andrei) (Filed on 11/29/2021) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#116) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-16664076.) filed by Elizabeth Albert. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Dudenhefer, Frank) (Filed on 11/28/2021) (Entered: 11/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#115) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-16653823.) filed by Elizabeth Albert, Andres Cabos, Jennifer Horton, Bobby Michael, Kiyan Michael, Magalys Rios, Maria Rodriguez-Fresneda, Donald J. Trump. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing)(Lawson, Richard) (Filed on 11/23/2021) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#114) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrei Dan Popovici on behalf of Plaintiffs. (Popovici, Andrei) (Filed on 11/22/2021) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#113) CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs and Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by December 6, 2021. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2021) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#112) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/17/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/24/2022 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2021) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#111) Case transferred in from District of Florida Southern; Case Number 1:21-cv-22440. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • Docket(#110) Clerks Notice to Filer re #109 Motion to Set Deadline for United States' Memorandum. Wrong Event Selected - Document is a Motion; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. A motion event must always be selected when filing a motion. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document. (jas) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Facebook is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joshua M. Kolsky