This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/30/2021 at 09:17:58 (UTC).

Trujillo v. Kroebal et al

Case Summary

On 07/01/2021 Trujillo filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Kroebal. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Mexico District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kirtan Khalsa and Kenneth J. Gonzales. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00609

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Kirtan Khalsa

Presiding Judge

Kenneth J. Gonzales

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Quentin M. Trujillo

Albuquerque, NM 87151

Defendants

Brandon LNU

Jimmy LNU

Loretto Garcia

Thad Baros

Michael Kroebal

David Martin Gutierrez

Leslie Roberts

Lucy LNU

Joshua Herrera

Jay Salais

John Montano

BCSO/APD

Mark Koder Larranaga

 

Court Documents

#45

#44

#43

#42

#41

#40

#39

#38

#37

#7

#20

#6

#5

4 #1

Part II

4 #4

Main Document

#3

#2

#1

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) Letter to the Court by Mr. Trujillo (yc) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) Letter to the Court by Mr. Trujillo (yc) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) Letter to the Court by Mr. Trujillo (yc) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) Letter to the Court by Mr. Trujillo (yc) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) Letter by Quentin Marc Trujillo (jjs) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) Letter by Quentin Marc Trujillo (jjs) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) Letter by Quentin Marc Trujillo (jjs) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) AMENDED COMPLAINT adding Jay Salais, John Montano, Mark Koder Larranogo and BCSO/APD,, filed by Quentin M. Trujillo. (yc) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) Letter by Mr. Trujillo (yc) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) Letter by Mr. Trujillo (yc) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Letter by Quentin M. Trujillo (jjs) Modified FILE DATE on 7/27/2021 (yc). (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Letter by Quentin M. Trujillo (jjs) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Letter by Quentin M. Trujillo (jjs) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Letter by Quentin M Trujillo (bc) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER TO CURE DEFICIENCIES by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. Within 30 days, Plaintiff shall cure the deficiencies in his initial filing by: (1) paying the filing fee or submitting an Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs; and, (2) filing a prisoner civil rights complaint or other civil complaint in proper form. The Clerk is directed to mail to Plaintiff, together with a copy of this Order, (1) two copies of an Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs, with instructions, and (2) a form Complaint for Violation of Civil Rights (Prisoner Complaint), with instructions. (kmt) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Letter by Quentin Marc Trujillo (Attachments: #1 pages 60-91) (bc) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTES AND REASONINGS OF PROBABLE CAUSE AND DIRECT CIRCUMSTANTIAL EVIDENCE by Quentin M. Trujillo (bc) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Letter by Quentin Marc Trujillo (bc) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketUnited States District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales and United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa assigned. (jg) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Quentin M. Trujillo. (jg) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less