This case was last updated from PACER on 07/12/2020 at 15:22:24 (UTC).

Truitt v. Abbott Laboratories et al

Case Summary

On 07/02/2019 Truitt filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Abbott Laboratories. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Michael R. Barrett. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00526

  • Filing Date:

    07/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael R. Barrett

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Joanne L. Truitt

Defendants

The Procter & Gamble Distributing LLC

Abbott Laboratories

Novartis Pharmaceutical Corporation

Takeda Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.

Novartis Vaccines and Diagnostics, Inc.

AstraZeneca LP

Novartis Consumer Health, Inc.

The Procter & Gamble Company

Merck Sharp & Dohme Corporation

Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP

Novartis Institutes for Biomedical Research, Inc.

Novartis Corporation

GlaxoSmithKline Consumer Healthcare Holdings (US) LLC

The Procter & Gamble Manufacturing Company

Takeda Development Center Americas Inc.

Takeda Pharmaceuticals Company Limited

Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc.

Merck & Co., Inc.

Merck & Co., Inc. doing business as Merck, Sharp & Dohme Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John D. Holschuh, III

Attorney at Santen & Hughes

600 Vine Street, Suite 2700

Cincinnati, OH 45202

John David Holschuh, Jr

Attorney at Santen & Hughes - 1

600 Vine Street, Suite 2700

Cincinnati, OH 45202

Defendant Attorneys

Tariq M Naeem

950 Main Avenue, Suite 1100

Cleveland, OH 44113-7213

Gregory D Brunton

Attorney at Gordon & Rees LLP

41 South High Street, Suite 2495

Columbus, OH 43215

Lydia Reback

Attorney at Ice Miller LLP

250 West St., Suite 700

Columbus, OH 43215

Kristina S. Dahmann

Attorney at Ice Miller LLP

250 West Street

Columbus, OH 43215

Daniel M Anderson

Attorney at Ice Miller LLP

250 West Street

Columbus, OH 43215

Douglas J Feichtner

Attorney at Dinsmore & Shohl - 1

1900 Chemed Center, 255 E 5Th Street

Cincinnati, OH 45202

Frank Chester Woodside, III

Attorney at Dinsmore & Shohl - 1

1900 Chemed Center, 255 E 5Th Street

Cincinnati, OH 45202

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) ANSWER to #4 Complaint,, with Jury Demand filed by GlaxoSmithKline Consumer Healthcare Holdings (US) LLC, Novartis Consumer Health, Inc.. (Woodside, Frank) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

10 #1

Exhibit A - Notice of Potential Tag Along

#10

(#10) MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Transfer to MDL by Defendants AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Merck & Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Potential Tag Along) (Reback, Lydia) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

#9

(#9) ANSWER to #4 Complaint,, with Jury Demand filed by Abbott Laboratories. (Brunton, Gregory) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to #4 Complaint,, with Jury Demand filed by Takeda Development Center Americas Inc., Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceuticals Company Limited, Takeda Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (Brunton, Gregory) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

7 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#7

(#7) MOTION for extension of time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's complaint by Defendants AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Merck & Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Reback, Lydia) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Lydia Reback for Defendants AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Merck & Co., Inc. (Reback, Lydia) (Entered: 07/05/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel M Anderson for Defendants AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Merck & Co., Inc. (Anderson, Daniel) (Entered: 07/05/2019)

#4

(#4) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Abbott Laboratories, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, GlaxoSmithKline Consumer Healthcare Holdings (US) LLC, Merck & Co., Inc., Novartis Consumer Health, Inc., Novartis Corporation, Novartis Institutes for Biomedical Research, Inc., Novartis Pharmaceutical Corporation, Novartis Vaccines and Diagnostics, Inc., Takeda Development Center Americas Inc., Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceuticals Company Limited, Takeda Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Procter & Gamble Company, The Procter & Gamble Distributing LLC, The Procter & Gamble Manufacturing Company, filed by Joanne L. Truitt in the Hamilton County Common Pleas Court case A1902655. (bjc) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

#9

(#12) ORDER transferring case to District of New Jersey. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 7/10/2019. (ss) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca PLC, AstraZeneca PLC identifying Corporate Parent AstraZeneca PLC for AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP.. (Reback, Lydia) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Merck Sharp & Dohme Corporation, Merck & Co., Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Merck & Co., Inc. for Merck Sharp & Dohme Corporation.. (Reback, Lydia) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

1 #5

Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit C - Tolling Agreement

1 #2

Exhibit B - MDL Order

1 #1

Exhibit A - state court record

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2019
  • DocketCase transferred from Ohio Southern has been opened in District of New Jersey [LIVE] as case 2:19-cv-15008, filed 07/10/2019. (sct) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • Case transferred to District of New Jersey.Case file and docket sheet sent Electronically. (ss) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER transferring case to District of New Jersey. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 7/10/2019. (ss) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ANSWER to #4 Complaint,, with Jury Demand filed by GlaxoSmithKline Consumer Healthcare Holdings (US) LLC, Novartis Consumer Health, Inc.. (Woodside, Frank) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Transfer to MDL by Defendants AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Merck & Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Potential Tag Along) (Reback, Lydia) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ANSWER to #4 Complaint,, with Jury Demand filed by Abbott Laboratories. (Brunton, Gregory) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ANSWER to #4 Complaint,, with Jury Demand filed by Takeda Development Center Americas Inc., Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceuticals Company Limited, Takeda Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (Brunton, Gregory) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION for extension of time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's complaint by Defendants AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Merck & Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Reback, Lydia) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Lydia Reback for Defendants AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Merck & Co., Inc. (Reback, Lydia) (Entered: 07/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel M Anderson for Defendants AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Merck & Co., Inc. (Anderson, Daniel) (Entered: 07/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Abbott Laboratories, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, GlaxoSmithKline Consumer Healthcare Holdings (US) LLC, Merck & Co., Inc., Novartis Consumer Health, Inc., Novartis Corporation, Novartis Institutes for Biomedical Research, Inc., Novartis Pharmaceutical Corporation, Novartis Vaccines and Diagnostics, Inc., Takeda Development Center Americas Inc., Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceuticals Company Limited, Takeda Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Procter & Gamble Company, The Procter & Gamble Distributing LLC, The Procter & Gamble Manufacturing Company, filed by Joanne L. Truitt in the Hamilton County Common Pleas Court case A1902655. (bjc) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca PLC, AstraZeneca PLC identifying Corporate Parent AstraZeneca PLC for AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP.. (Reback, Lydia) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Merck Sharp & Dohme Corporation, Merck & Co., Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Merck & Co., Inc. for Merck Sharp & Dohme Corporation.. (Reback, Lydia) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hamilton County Court of Common Pleas, case number A 1902655 ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6994055), filed by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corporation, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - state court record, #2 Exhibit B - MDL Order, #3 Exhibit C - Tolling Agreement, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet) (Reback, Lydia) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NOVARTIS CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where NOVARTIS CONSUMER HEALTH, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where NOVARTIS VACCINES AND DIAGNOSTICS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where GLAXOSMITHKLINE CONSUMER HEALTHCARE HOLDINGS (US) LLC is a litigant