This case was last updated from PACER on 03/13/2021 at 11:45:53 (UTC).

TRUIST BANK v. FULLCO REALITY SERVICES INC et al

Case Summary

On 01/12/2021 TRUIST BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against FULLCO REALITY SERVICES INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Middle District. The Judge overseeing this case is TILMAN E SELF, III. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00005

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

TILMAN E SELF, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Truist Bank f/k/a Branch Banking and Trust Company, a North Carolina state chartered bank

171 17Th Street, Nw, Suite 1100

Atlanta, GA 30363

TRUIST BANK

BRANCH BANKING AND TRUST COMPANY

Defendants

James Fullerton

Columbus Family Entertainment Inc

Jessica Fullerton

Fullco Realty Services, Inc.

FULLCO REALITY SERVICES INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

PAUL G DURDALLER

Attorney at Burr & Forman LLP

171 17Th Street, Nw, Suite 1100

Atlanta, GA 30363

BRIAN JOEL LEVY

Attorney at Burr & Forman LLP

171 17Th Street, Suite 1100

Atlanta, GA 30363

 

Court Documents

#12

#10

#9

#8

#6

#5

#4

#2

1 #9

Summons Columbus Family Entertainment Inc.

1 #8

Summons - James Fullerton

1 #7

Summons - Jessica Fullerton

1 #6

Summons - Fullco Realty Services, Inc.

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit D - Jessica Fullerton Guaranty

1 #3

Exhibit C - James Fullerton Guaranty

1 #2

Exhibit B - Columbus Family Entertainment Guaranty

1 #1

Exhibit A - Note

#1

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREMARK: In light of #12 Notice of Dismissal, this case has been closed (tlf). (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by TRUIST BANK as to All Defendants (LEVY, BRIAN) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #5 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint (IFP),, Acknowledgment filed by TRUIST BANK. (LEVY, BRIAN) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by TRUIST BANK re #2 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint (IFP),, (LEVY, BRIAN) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by TRUIST BANK re #1 Complaint (IFP),, #6 Summons Issued (LEVY, BRIAN) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by TRUIST BANK re #1 Complaint (IFP),, #4 Summons Issued (LEVY, BRIAN) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketCase REASSIGNED to US DISTRICT JUDGE TILMAN E. SELF III (tlf). (Entered: 01/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketUS DISTRICT JUDGE TILMAN E SELF, III added. US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND no longer assigned to case. (esl) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Jurisdictional Statement by TRUIST BANK (LEVY, BRIAN) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons issued as to JESSICA FULLERTON (tlf). (Entered: 01/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons issued as to JAMES FULLERTON (tlf). (Entered: 01/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons issued as to FULLCO REALITY SERVICES INC. (tlf). (Entered: 01/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by TRUIST BANK identifying Corporate Parent TRUIST FINANCIAL CORPORATION for TRUIST BANK. (LEVY, BRIAN) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons issued as to COLUMBUS FAMILY ENTERTAINMENT INC. (tlf). (Entered: 01/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Deficiency; Related document: #1 Complaint; Parties were added using punctuation AND/OR title capitalization. The case opening guide states ***REMINDER*** all parties must be added using ALL CAPS (ie LISA SMITH or DELTA AIRLINES). Do not use ANY punctuation when adding new parties. For instructions on adding parties, please refer to the Style Guide located on the website for the Middle District of Georgia. No need to re-file (tlf). (Entered: 01/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Truist Bank f/k/a Branch Banking and Trust Company, a North Carolina state chartered bank (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Note, #2 Exhibit B - Columbus Family Entertainment Guaranty, #3 Exhibit C - James Fullerton Guaranty, #4 Exhibit D - Jessica Fullerton Guaranty, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons - Fullco Realty Services, Inc., #7 Summons - Jessica Fullerton, #8 Summons - James Fullerton, #9 Summons Columbus Family Entertainment Inc.)(LEVY, BRIAN) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Truist Bank f/k/a Suntrust Bank d/b/a Lighstream is a litigant

Latest cases where Truist Bank is a litigant

Latest cases where Branch Banking and Trust Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Paul G. Durdaller