This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/20/2022 at 12:41:22 (UTC).

True Names Limited et al v. GoDaddy Incorporated et al

Case Summary

On September 5, 2022, True Names Ltd. d/b/a Ethereum Name Service and Virgil Griffith (collectively, “Plaintiffs”), represented by Andrew G Pruitt, Jacob Canter, Jeffrey Poston, Justin D. Kingsolver, Katie Lee and Warrington S Parker, III of Crowell & Moring LLP filed a contract lawsuit against GoDaddy, Inc., GoDaddy.com LLC (collectively, “GoDaddy”), Dynadot LLC and Manifold Finance, Inc. (collectively, “Defendants”), seeking injunctive relief and damages for alleged breach of contract by Defendants. This case was filed in the U.S. District Court for the District of Arizona, with Judge John J. Tuchi presiding. 

In the complaint, the plaintiffs stated, “This case arises from GoDaddy’s breach of its agreement to respect, acknowledge, and protect the duly registered and extremely valuable eth.link domain name. The eth.link domain, which facilitates hundreds of thousands of cryptocurrency transactions by thousands of users, is registered with GoDaddy until July 26, 2023. But GoDaddy unilaterally and willfully announced to eth.link owners that the eth.link domain’s registration with GoDaddy had expired and that absent any further action by the current registrant, the eth.link domain would revert to the registry, that is be available to others, on September 5, 2022.”

The plaintiffs further stated, “While taking this step was wrong, worse, GoDaddy did not even abide by its own notice. Rather than wait until September 5, 2022, GoDaddy purportedly sold the domain name eth.link to Dynadot LLC on September 3, 2022, without notice to Plaintiffs. In so doing, GoDaddy has deprived Plaintiff True Names Ltd. of its livelihood. The sale will disable a valuable cryptocurrency network and recklessly risk making it available to scores of malicious actors. And the domain name is now purportedly and wrongfully held by Manifold Finance, Inc.”

The plaintiffs alleged, “GoDaddy, with whom Plaintiffs registered the eth.link domain name, issued a statement on August 25, 2022, that the eth.link domain name had ‘expired’ and ‘was expected to return to the registry,’ on September 5, 2022, meaning that it would be generally available for purchase by third parties, ‘absent a renewal by the current registrant.’ GoDaddy issued this statement despite the fact that the evidence reflects that the domain name does not expire until July 26, 2023. Also, GoDaddy’s Domain Name Registration Agreement provides that Plaintiffs have the right to renew the registration, but Defendants have frustrated that attempt by refusing to respond to multiple requests by representatives of the current registrant to renew.”

The plaintiffs then alleged, “Because of GoDaddy’s refusal to even entertain outreach on behalf of True Names, Ltd. and the current registrant, attempts to contact GoDaddy since its August 25, 2022, statement have been unavailing.”

The plaintiffs also alleged, “Even worse, it appears that GoDaddy has taken actions inconsistent with its own public statements. Notwithstanding its announcement that the domain would be returned to the registry on September 5, 2022, on September 3, 2022, Manifold Finance, Inc. publicly announced that it won the registration rights to eth.link in an auction run by Dynadot LLC, an online auction holder. In order for this to be true, at some date before September 5, 2022, GoDaddy would have had to impermissibly transferred the domain over to Dynadot.”

Plaintiffs presented four claims for relief, including the alleged breach of contract, breach of the covenant of good faith and fair dealing, intentional interference with prospective economic advantage and unfair competition.

In their prayer for relief, the plaintiffs requested a judgment for injunctive relief. The plaintiffs also requested an award for costs, reasonable attorney’s fees and damages along with pre- and post-judgement interest incurred by the plaintiffs.

This is a summary of a legal complaint. All statements, claims, and allegations listed herein reflect the position of the plaintiff only and do not represent the position of UniCourt. Additionally, this case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the current status of this case. To view the latest case updates and court documents, please sign up for a UniCourt account.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-01494

  • Filing Date:

    09/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John J Tuchi

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

True Names LTD a Singapore corporation doing business as Ethereum Name Service

Virgil Griffith

Defendants

GoDaddy Incorporated

GoDaddy.com LLC

Dynadot LLC

Manifold Finance Incorporated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Andrew G Pruitt

Attorney at Crowell & Moring LLP - Washington, DC

1001 Pennsylvania Ave. Nw, Ste. 1100

Washington, DC 20004

Jacob Canter

Attorney at Crowell & Moring LLP - San Francisco, CA

3 Embarcadero Ctr., Ste. 2600

San Francsico, CA 94111

Jeffrey Poston

Attorney at Crowell & Moring LLP - Washington, DC

1001 Pennsylvania Ave. Nw, Ste. 1100

Washington, DC 20004

Justin D Kingsolver

Attorney at Crowell & Moring LLP - Washington, DC

1001 Pennsylvania Ave. Nw, Ste. 1100

Washington, DC 20004

Katie Lee

Attorney at Crowell & Moring LLP - San Francisco, CA

3 Embarcadero Ctr., Ste. 2600

San Francsico, CA 94111

Warrington S Parker, III

Attorney at Crowell & Moring LLP - San Francisco, CA

3 Embarcadero Ctr., Ste. 2600

San Francsico, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

22 #11

Exhibit K

22 #9

Exhibit I

22 #6

Exhibit F

22 #5

Exhibit E

22 #4

Exhibit D

22 #2

Exhibit B

22 #1

Exhibit A

22 #22

Main Document

#19

(#19) ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED granting in part and denying in part the Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause for Preliminary Injunction (Doc. #2 ). The Court will grant Plaintiffs the requested preliminary injunctive relief but will not enter the requested Order to Show Cause. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, to the extent ownership interest in the Domain has been sold or transferred away from Plaintiffs as the registrants, Defendants shall immediately transfer ownership in the Domain back to Plaintiffs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, attendant to this injunctive relief, Plaintiffs must post a bond in the amount of $10,000 under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 65(c) by September 13, 2022. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall serve this Order on Defendants as soon as practicable, and in any event by September 13, 2022. (See document for full details). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 9/9/2022. (LAD) (Entered: 09/09/2022)

1 #11

Exhibit J

1 #10

Exhibit I

1 #9

Exhibit H

1 #8

Exhibit G

1 #5

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

57 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketRemark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Katie Lee on behalf of Plaintiffs Virgil Griffith, True Names Limited. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) (Entered: 09/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) DECLARATION of Jacob Canter re: #19 Order on Motion for TRO,,,, Order on Motion for Order to Show Cause,,, . filed by Virgil Griffith, True Names Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K)(Kingsolver, Justin) (Entered: 09/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Surety BOND in the amount of $10,000.00 posted by Virgil Griffith, True Names Limited. Bond Number: 800145157. (LAD) (Entered: 09/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that motions to dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) and motions to strike pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f) are discouraged if the defect that would be the subject of the motion can be cured by filing an amended pleading. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this Order on Defendants. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 9/12/2022. (JAMA) (Entered: 09/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED granting in part and denying in part the Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause for Preliminary Injunction (Doc. #2 ). The Court will grant Plaintiffs the requested preliminary injunctive relief but will not enter the requested Order to Show Cause. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, to the extent ownership interest in the Domain has been sold or transferred away from Plaintiffs as the registrants, Defendants shall immediately transfer ownership in the Domain back to Plaintiffs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, attendant to this injunctive relief, Plaintiffs must post a bond in the amount of $10,000 under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 65(c) by September 13, 2022. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall serve this Order on Defendants as soon as practicable, and in any event by September 13, 2022. (See document for full details). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 9/9/2022. (LAD) (Entered: 09/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • Docket(#18) MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge John J Tuchi: Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction Hearing held on 9/9/2022. Argument held. Order to issue. APPEARANCES: Jacob Canter, Justin Kingslover, Warrington Parker, III and Alexander Urbelis for Plaintiff. Defendants failed to appear. (Court Reporter Candy Potter.) Hearing held 1:16 PM to 2:16 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (JAMA) (Entered: 09/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketRemark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Andrew Gary Pruitt on behalf of Plaintiffs Virgil Griffith, True Names Limited. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) (Entered: 09/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE re: of Supplemental Authority by Virgil Griffith, True Names Limited re: #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Order to Show Cause . (Kingsolver, Justin) (Entered: 09/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketRemark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Jacob S Canter on behalf of Plaintiffs Virgil Griffith, True Names Limited. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) (Entered: 09/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) DECLARATION of Jacob Canter re: #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Order to Show Cause by Plaintiffs Virgil Griffith, True Names Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Kingsolver, Justin) (Entered: 09/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) *DECLARATION of Jacob Canter re: #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Order to Show Cause by Plaintiffs Virgil Griffith, True Names LTD. (Kingsolver, Justin) *Document not in compliance with Local Rule, attorney noticed on 9/7/2022 (LAD). (Entered: 09/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Order to Show Cause -Proposed Order by Plaintiffs Virgil Griffith, True Names LTD. (Kingsolver, Justin) (Entered: 09/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Summons Issued as to Dynadot LLC, GoDaddy Incorporated, GoDaddy.com LLC, Manifold Finance Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(JAM). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 09/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-21065202. This case has been assigned to the Honorable John J Tuchi. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-22-1494-PHX-JJT. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (JAM) (Entered: 09/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Submitted by Virgil Griffith, True Names LTD. (Kingsolver, Justin) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(JAM) (Entered: 09/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Virgil Griffith, True Names LTD. (Kingsolver, Justin) (JAM) (Entered: 09/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DECLARATION of Alex Urbelis in Support of #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Order to Show Cause by Plaintiffs Virgil Griffith, True Names LTD. (Kingsolver, Justin) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K)(JAM) (Entered: 09/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DECLARATION of Khori Whittaker in Support of #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Order to Show Cause by Plaintiffs Virgil Griffith, True Names LTD. (Kingsolver, Justin) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(JAM) (Entered: 09/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) EX PARTE MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION for Order to Show Cause for Preliminary Injunction by Virgil Griffith, True Names LTD. (Kingsolver, Justin) (JAM) (Entered: 09/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT (TRO Requested). Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number AAZDC-21065202 filed by True Names LTD, Virgil Griffith. (Kingsolver, Justin) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K)(JAM) (Entered: 09/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Godaddy, Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Katie Lee

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Justin Kingsolver

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Warrington S. Parker, III