This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/20/2021 at 09:30:23 (UTC).

Trudgeon et al v. Biomet Orthopedics, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 10/21/2021 Trudgeon filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Biomet Orthopedics, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judges overseeing this case are Lewis T. Babcock and N. Reid Neureiter. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-02841

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Lewis T. Babcock

N. Reid Neureiter

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Gary A. Trudgeon

Linda S. Trudgeon

Defendants

Biomet Orthopedics, LLC

Biomet, Inc.

Biomet Manufacturing Corp.

Biomet US Reconstruction, LLC

Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Beth Ann Klein

Attorney at Klein Frank, P.C.

2505 Walnut Streetsuite 100

Boulder, CO 80302-5701

Alex C. Davis

Attorney at Jones Ward PLC

1205 East Washington Streetthe Pointe

Louisville, KY 40206

Defendant Attorneys

Hannah Caroline Carter

Attorney at Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP-Denver

1144 Fifteenth Streetsuite 3400

Denver, CO 80202

Heather C. Perkins

Attorney at Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP-Denver

1144 Fifteenth Streetsuite 3400

Denver, CO 80202

Mary Elizabeth Hershewe

Attorney at Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP-Denver

1144 Fifteenth Streetsuite 3400

Denver, CO 80202

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

#4

(#4) MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 10/22/2021. This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. All future pleadings should be designated as 21-cv-02841-NRN. (trvo, ) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

#5

(#5) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF CONSENT/NON-CONSENT FORM by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 22 October 2021. Consent Form due by 12/22/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due 12/29/2021. Scheduling Conference set for 1/5/2022 11:00 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. The Scheduling Conference will be conducted via telephone. The parties are directed to call the conference line as a participant at (888) 398-2342, Access Code 5755390# at the scheduled time. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Mary Elizabeth Hershewe on behalf of Biomet Manufacturing Corp., Biomet Orthopedics, LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC, Biomet, Inc.Attorney Mary Elizabeth Hershewe added to party Biomet Manufacturing Corp.(pty:dft), Attorney Mary Elizabeth Hershewe added to party Biomet Orthopedics, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Mary Elizabeth Hershewe added to party Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Mary Elizabeth Hershewe added to party Biomet, Inc.(pty:dft) (Hershewe, Mary) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Hannah Caroline Carter on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Hannah Caroline Carter added to party Biomet Manufacturing Corp.(pty:dft), Attorney Hannah Caroline Carter added to party Biomet Orthopedics, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Hannah Caroline Carter added to party Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Hannah Caroline Carter added to party Biomet, Inc.(pty:dft) (Carter, Hannah) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Heather C. Perkins on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Heather C. Perkins added to party Biomet Manufacturing Corp.(pty:dft), Attorney Heather C. Perkins added to party Biomet Orthopedics, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Heather C. Perkins added to party Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Heather C. Perkins added to party Biomet, Inc.(pty:dft) (Perkins, Heather) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Alex C. Davis on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Alex C. Davis added to party Gary A. Trudgeon(pty:pla), Attorney Alex C. Davis added to party Linda S. Trudgeon(pty:pla) (Davis, Alex) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Alex C. Davis on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Alex C. Davis added to party Gary A. Trudgeon(pty:pla), Attorney Alex C. Davis added to party Linda S. Trudgeon(pty:pla) (Davis, Alex) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Heather C. Perkins on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Heather C. Perkins added to party Biomet Manufacturing Corp.(pty:dft), Attorney Heather C. Perkins added to party Biomet Orthopedics, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Heather C. Perkins added to party Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Heather C. Perkins added to party Biomet, Inc.(pty:dft) (Perkins, Heather) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Hannah Caroline Carter on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Hannah Caroline Carter added to party Biomet Manufacturing Corp.(pty:dft), Attorney Hannah Caroline Carter added to party Biomet Orthopedics, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Hannah Caroline Carter added to party Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Hannah Caroline Carter added to party Biomet, Inc.(pty:dft) (Carter, Hannah) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Mary Elizabeth Hershewe on behalf of Biomet Manufacturing Corp., Biomet Orthopedics, LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC, Biomet, Inc.Attorney Mary Elizabeth Hershewe added to party Biomet Manufacturing Corp.(pty:dft), Attorney Mary Elizabeth Hershewe added to party Biomet Orthopedics, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Mary Elizabeth Hershewe added to party Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Mary Elizabeth Hershewe added to party Biomet, Inc.(pty:dft) (Hershewe, Mary) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF CONSENT/NON-CONSENT FORM by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 22 October 2021. Consent Form due by 12/22/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due 12/29/2021. Scheduling Conference set for 1/5/2022 11:00 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. The Scheduling Conference will be conducted via telephone. The parties are directed to call the conference line as a participant at (888) 398-2342, Access Code 5755390# at the scheduled time. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 10/22/2021. This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. All future pleadings should be designated as 21-cv-02841-NRN. (trvo, ) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). No summons issued. (jtorr, ) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • Docket(#2) Case assigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock and drawn to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, ) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number ACODC-8137104)Attorney Beth Ann Klein added to party Gary A Trudgeon(pty:pla), Attorney Beth Ann Klein added to party Linda S Trudgeon(pty:pla), filed by Gary A Trudgeon, Linda S Trudgeon. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Klein, Beth) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BIOMET MANUFACTURING LLC is a litigant