This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/29/2021 at 06:58:30 (UTC).

Troy Stacy Enterprises Inc., et al. v. The Cincinnati Insurance Company, et al.

Case Summary

On 04/19/2020 Troy Stacy Enterprises Inc filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against The Cincinnati Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Matthew W. McFarland and Karen L. Litkovitz. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00312

  • Filing Date:

    04/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Matthew W. McFarland

Referral Judge

Karen L. Litkovitz

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Troy Stacy Enterprises Inc.

Defendant

The Cincinnati Insurance Company

Amicus Curiae

McKinley Development Leasing Company, Ltd

Nikki Brady, LLC

The Hills Entertainment, LLC

Hemingway Holdings, LLC

Festivus, LLC

Eagle School of Hilliard Ohio, Inc.

Dublin Ashanik, LLC

Educare of Greene, Inc.

Valley Six, LLC

Basement Group, LLC

Carpe Diem Coffee Shop, Inc.

Brumagin, LLC

Lillypad Learning Center, LLC

Lakeside Pub, LLC

3900 Medina Road, LLC

Elliott Care, LLC

357 W. Turkeyfoot Lake, LLC

Falls Basement, LLC

32 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Mark A DiCello

Attorney at DiCello Levitt Gutzler LLC

7556 Mentor Avenue

Mentor, OH 44060

Kenneth P Abbarno

Attorney at DiCello Levitt Gutzler LLC

7556 Mentor Ave.

Mentor, OH 44060

Mark Abramowitz

Attorney at DiCello Levitt Gutzler LLC

7556 Mentor Ave.

Mentor, OH 44060

Adam J Levitt

Attorney at DiCello Levitt Gutzler LLC

Ten Northn Dearborn Streetsixth Floor

Chicago, IL 60602

Defendant Attorneys

Michael K Farrell

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

127 Public Square, Ste. 2000

Cleveland, OH 44114

Rodger L Eckelberry

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler - 2

200 Civic Center Drivesuite 1200

Columbus, OH 43215

Laurence J. Tooth

Attorney at Litchfield Cavo LLP

303 West Madison Streetsuite 300

Chicago, IL 60606

Amicus Curiae Attorneys

Charles Horne Cooper, Jr.

Attorney at Cooper & Elliott, LLC

305 West Nationwide Boulevard

Columbus, OH 43215

Collin Sheppard Wise

Attorney at Tzangas Plakas Mannos Ltd

220 Market Avenue South8Th Floor

Canton, OH 44702

Gary A Corroto

Attorney at Tzangas Plakas Mannos Ltd.

220 Market Avenue

South Canton, OH 44702

Lee E Plakas

Attorney at Plakas Mannos

200 Market Avenue Northste 300

Canton, OH 44702

Maria C Klutinoty Edwards

Attorney at Tzangas Plakas Mannos, Ltd.

220 Market Ave S.

Canton, OH 44702

Sean Alto

Attorney at Cooper & Elliott, LLC

305 West Nationwide Boulevard

Columbus, OH 43215

Other Attorneys

Randolph Harry Freking

Attorney at Freking Myers & Reul LLC

600 Vine Streetninth Floor

Cincinnati, OH 45202

Seth Ard

1301 Avenue Of The Americas32Nd Floor

New York, NY 10019

Jesse-Justin Cuevas

Attorney at Susman Godfrey L.L.P.

1900 Avenue Of The Starssuite 1400

Los Angeles, CA 90067

John Scott Black

Attorney at Daly & Black, P.C.

2211 Norfolk Streetsuite 800

Houston, TX 77098

Richard D. Daly

Attorney at Daly & Black, P.C.

2211 Norfolk Streetsuite 800

Houston, TX 77098

Marc M. Seltzer

Attorney at Susman Godfrey L.L.P.

1900 Avenue Of The Starssuite 1400

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Melissa Waden Wray

Attorney at Daly & Black, P.C.

2211 Norfolk Streetsuite 800

Houston, TX 77098

9 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#88

(#88) NOTICE OF APPEAL re #87 Clerk's Judgment, #86 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,,,, Order on Motion to Stay,,, (Filing fee has been paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8555224) by Plaintiffs Burning Brothers Brewing LLC, CDC Catering, Inc., Chicago Magic Lounge LLC, Eleisha J. Nickoles, DDS, Reeds Jewelers of Niagra Falls, Inc., Swearingen Smiles LLC, Troy Stacy Enterprises Inc.. (Freking, Randolph) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

#87

#61

60 #18

Exhibit 18 - Gateway Clippers

60 #17

Exhibit 17 - King's Palace

60 #15

Exhibit 15 - BR Restaurant

60 #6

Exhibit 6 - Manchester Bidwell

6 #3

Exhibit Ex C - ISO Circular

6 #1

Exhibit Ex A - CDC Guidance

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#1

334 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#88) NOTICE OF APPEAL re #87 Clerk's Judgment, #86 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,,,, Order on Motion to Stay,,, (Filing fee has been paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8555224) by Plaintiffs Burning Brothers Brewing LLC, CDC Catering, Inc., Chicago Magic Lounge LLC, Eleisha J. Nickoles, DDS, Reeds Jewelers of Niagra Falls, Inc., Swearingen Smiles LLC, Troy Stacy Enterprises Inc.. (Freking, Randolph) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#87) CLERK'S JUDGMENT. (kaf) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#86) ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS (Doc. #63 ) AND DENYING MOTION TO STAY (Doc. #66 ) AS MOOT: The Court GRANTS the motion to dismiss and DENIES the motion to stay as moot. The Court TERMINATES the following cases: (1) Troy Stacy Enterprises, Inc., et al. v. Cincinnati Insurance Company, et al., 1:20-cv- 312; (2) Swearingen Smiles LLC, et al v. Cincinnati Insurance Company, et al., l:20-cv-517; (3) Reeds Jewelers of Niagara Falls, Inc. v. Cincinnati Insurance Company, l:20-cv-649; (4) Burning Brothers Brewing LLC, et al. v. Cincinnati Insurance Company, l:20-cv-920. IT IS SO ORDERED.. Signed by Judge Matthew W. McFarland on 09/24/2021. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-00312-MWM-KLL, 1:20-cv-00517-MWM, 1:20-cv-00649-MWM, 1:20-cv-00920-MWM (kaf) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#85) MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Authority ( Responses due by 10/5/2021) by Defendants The Cincinnati Casualty Company, The Cincinnati Financial Corporation, The Cincinnati Indemnity Company, The Cincinnati Insurance Company, Cincinnati Insurance Company, The Cincinnati Casualty Company, The Cincinnati Indemnity Company, The Cincinnati Insurance Company, The Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Gilreath, #2 Exhibit 2 - AIKG, #3 Exhibit 3 - Ferrer & Poirot, #4 Exhibit 4 - SFDG, #5 Exhibit 5 - SJP, #6 Exhibit 6 - Manchester Bidwell, #7 Exhibit 7 - Cozzini, #8 Exhibit 8 - Cosmetic Laser, #9 Exhibit 9 - Little Ones, #10 Exhibit 10 - Legacy Sports, #11 Exhibit 11 - Park Place, #12 Exhibit 12 - Stefani, #13 Exhibit 13 - Black Rock, #14 Exhibit 14 - OTG Management, #15 Exhibit 15 - BR Restaurant, #16 Exhibit 16 - JMR, #17 Exhibit 17 - King's Palace, #18 Exhibit 18 - Gateway Clippers, #19 Exhibit 19 - Menominee, #20 Exhibit 20 - Glenn R Edwards, #21 Exhibit 21 - Scherder, #22 Exhibit 22 - Dakota) Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-00312-MWM-KLL, 1:20-cv-00517-MWM, 1:20-cv-00649-MWM, 1:20-cv-00920-MWM (Farrell, Michael) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#84) MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Authority ( Responses due by 8/23/2021) by Defendants The Cincinnati Casualty Company, The Cincinnati Financial Corporation, The Cincinnati Indemnity Company, The Cincinnati Insurance Company, Cincinnati Insurance Company, The Cincinnati Casualty Company, The Cincinnati Indemnity Company, The Cincinnati Insurance Company, The Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Farmington Village, #2 Exhibit 2 - Vandelay, #3 Exhibit 3 - Melcorp, #4 Exhibit 4 - Byberry, #5 Exhibit 5 - Berkseth-Rojas, #6 Exhibit 6 - Northwell Health, #7 Exhibit 7 - Salvatore's Italian, #8 Exhibit 8 - Benny's Famous, #9 Exhibit 9 - Circle Block, #10 Exhibit 10 - Mt Hawley, #11 Exhibit 11 - Goodwood Brewing) Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-00312-MWM-KLL, 1:20-cv-00517-MWM, 1:20-cv-00649-MWM, 1:20-cv-00920-MWM (Farrell, Michael) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#83) NOTICE by Plaintiff Reeds Jewelers of Niagra Falls, Inc. re (82 in 1:20-cv-00312-MWM-KLL) Notice (Other) Amended Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney Burton S. DeWitt Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-00312-MWM-KLL, 1:20-cv-00517-MWM, 1:20-cv-00649-MWM, 1:20-cv-00920-MWM (Merrill, William) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#82) NOTICE by Plaintiff Reeds Jewelers of Niagra Falls, Inc. Withdrawal of Attorney Burton S. DeWitt Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-00312-MWM-KLL, 1:20-cv-00649-MWM (Merrill, William) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#81) NOTICE by Plaintiffs Burning Brothers Brewing LLC, CDC Catering, Inc., Chicago Magic Lounge LLC, Eleisha J. Nickoles, DDS, Reeds Jewelers of Niagra Falls, Inc., Swearingen Smiles LLC, Troy Stacy Enterprises Inc., Reeds Jewelers of Niagara Falls, Inc. Notice of Supplemental Authority in Further Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1) Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-00312-MWM-KLL, 1:20-cv-00517-MWM, 1:20-cv-00649-MWM, 1:20-cv-00920-MWM (Abbarno, Kenneth) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#80) MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Authority ( Responses due by 7/28/2021) by Defendants The Cincinnati Casualty Company, The Cincinnati Financial Corporation, The Cincinnati Indemnity Company, The Cincinnati Insurance Company, Cincinnati Insurance Company, The Cincinnati Casualty Company, The Cincinnati Indemnity Company, The Cincinnati Insurance Company, The Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Oral Surgeons, #2 Exhibit 2 - Riverside Dental, #3 Exhibit 3 - Boscov's, #4 Exhibit 4 - Lehigh Valley, #5 Exhibit 5 - LDWB, #6 Exhibit 6 - Mignonette, #7 Exhibit 7 - Till Metro, #8 Exhibit 8 - Capri Holdings) Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-00312-MWM-KLL, 1:20-cv-00517-MWM, 1:20-cv-00649-MWM, 1:20-cv-00920-MWM (Farrell, Michael) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#79) MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Authority ( Responses due by 7/20/2021) by Defendants The Cincinnati Casualty Company, The Cincinnati Financial Corporation, The Cincinnati Indemnity Company, The Cincinnati Insurance Company, Cincinnati Insurance Company, The Cincinnati Casualty Company, The Cincinnati Indemnity Company, The Cincinnati Insurance Company, The Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - System Optics, #2 Exhibit 2 - Chelsea Ventures, #3 Exhibit 3 - Dino Drop, #4 Exhibit 4 - Ryan P Estes, #5 Exhibit 5 - Brown Jug, #6 Exhibit 6 - MMMMM DP, #7 Exhibit 7 - Image Dental, #8 Exhibit 8 - Green Beginnings, #9 Exhibit 9 - Broadway 104, #10 Exhibit 10 - Buffalo Xerographix, #11 Exhibit 11 - Office Solution, #12 Exhibit 12 - SA Hospitality, #13 Exhibit 13 - Deer Mountain, #14 Exhibit 14 - Hartford Fire, #15 Exhibit 15 - Spring House, #16 Exhibit 16 - 44 Hummelstown, #17 Exhibit 17 - Crunch Logistics, #18 Exhibit 18 - Star Buick, #19 Exhibit 19 - Spector Garden, #20 Exhibit 20 - Coleman E Adler, #21 Exhibit 21 - Spottswood, #22 Exhibit 22 - LexFit, #23 Exhibit 23 - Gio Pizzeria, #24 Exhibit 24 - Monday Restaurants, #25 Exhibit 25 - Charles E Padgett, #26 Exhibit 26 - HT Seattle, #27 Exhibit 27 - Nguyen, #28 Exhibit 28 - Accents of Sterling) Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-00312-MWM-KLL, 1:20-cv-00517-MWM, 1:20-cv-00649-MWM, 1:20-cv-00920-MWM (Farrell, Michael) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
76 More Docket Entries
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) BRIEF re #7 MOTION to Certify Questions to the Ohio Supreme Court by Defendant The Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Farrell, Michael) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Certify Questions to the Ohio Supreme Court by Defendant The Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Farrell, Michael) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) BRIEF re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant The Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A - CDC Guidance, #2 Exhibit Ex B - Social Life Magazine, Inc. v. Sentinel Insurance Company Ltd. Hearing Transcript, #3 Exhibit Ex C - ISO Circular) (Farrell, Michael) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant The Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Farrell, Michael) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to The Cincinnati Insurance Company on 4/24/2020, answer due 6/23/2020. (Abbarno, Kenneth) Modified docket text on 5/27/2020 (eh). (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Troy Stacy Enterprises Inc.. (Abbarno, Kenneth) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTATION ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Adam Levitt as CO-COUNSEL is this matter only. In the event Pro Hac Vice counsel has not yet received a login and password from the Clerk of Courts, they should promptly comply with the Courts Electronic Filing Policies and Procedures Manual which can be found at the Courts website, www.ohsd.uscourts.gov. So Ordered. Signed by Judge Matthew W. McFarland on 4/24/2020. (ss) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-7431228) of Adam J. Levitt by Plaintiff Troy Stacy Enterprises Inc.. (Abbarno, Kenneth) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketIf this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (eh) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7429091), filed by Troy Stacy Enterprises Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Policy) (Abbarno, Kenneth) (Entered: 04/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Basement Group, LLC is a litigant