This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/10/2020 at 07:35:29 (UTC).

Trowbridge et al v. LIBERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 09/11/2020 Trowbridge filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against LIBERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is C. DARNELL JONES, II. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-04463

  • Filing Date:

    09/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

C. DARNELL JONES, II

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Jeffrey Trowbridge

Amanda Kreiser

Defendant

LIBERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ANTHONY JOSEPH DIULIO

Defendant Attorneys

PAMELA A. CARLOS

JAMES P. SHAY

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) Report Of Damages in Excess of $150,000.00 by Amanda Kreiser, Jeffrey Trowbridge. (DIULIO, ANTHONY) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to Complaint together with Affirmative Defenses by LIBERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION.(CARLOS, PAMELA) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

#4

(#4) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Amanda Kreiser, Jeffrey Trowbridge. (DIULIO, ANTHONY) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by PAMELA A. CARLOS on behalf of LIBERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION (CARLOS, PAMELA) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

#2

(#2) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by LIBERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION.(SHAY, JAMES) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by LIBERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION , Philadelphia County Court of Common Pleas, case number 200700767, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14559091), filed by LIBERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION.(SHAY, JAMES) Modified on 9/14/2020 (tjd). (Entered: 09/11/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArbitration Certification that case exceeds the sum of $150,000.00 exclusive of interest and costs or relief other than monetary damages is sought **(REFILED USING CORRECT EVENT, SEE DOCUMENT #7 FOR ORIGINAL FILING AND PDF)** (tjd) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Report Of Damages in Excess of $150,000.00 by Amanda Kreiser, Jeffrey Trowbridge. (DIULIO, ANTHONY) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • Docket(#6) Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of PHILADELPHIA County. (kp, ) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to Complaint together with Affirmative Defenses by LIBERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION.(CARLOS, PAMELA) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Amanda Kreiser, Jeffrey Trowbridge. (DIULIO, ANTHONY) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by PAMELA A. CARLOS on behalf of LIBERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION (CARLOS, PAMELA) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by LIBERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION.(SHAY, JAMES) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by LIBERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION , Philadelphia County Court of Common Pleas, case number 200700767, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14559091), filed by LIBERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION.(SHAY, JAMES) Modified on 9/14/2020 (tjd). (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less