This case was last updated from PACER on 12/07/2019 at 07:29:25 (UTC).

Trout Unlimited v. U.S. Environmental Protection Agency et al

Case Summary

On 10/09/2019 a Other - Administrative Procedure Act case was filed by Trout Unlimited against U S Environmental Protection Agency in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Alaska District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00268

  • Filing Date:

    10/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Administrative Procedure Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alaska District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

John W. Sedwick

Sharon L. Gleason

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Trout Unlimited

Defendants

U.S. Environmental Protection Agency

Matthew Z. Leopold

Chris Hladick

Andrew Wheeler

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Abraham J. Shanedling

Attorney at Sheppard, Mullin, Richter, & Hampton LLP

2099 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw, Suite 100

Washington, DC 20006

Paul Werner

Attorney at Sheppard, Mullin, Richter, & Hampton LLP

2099 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw, Suite 100

Washington, DC 20006

Rachelle Bishop

Attorney at Sheppard, Mullin, Richter, & Hampton LLP

2099 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw, Suite 100

Washington, DC 20006

Steven P. Hollman

Attorney at Sheppard, Mullin, Richter, & Hampton LLP

2099 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw, Suite 100

Washington, DC 20006

Austin E. Williams

Attorney at Trout Unlimited

3105 Lake Shore Drive, Suite 102B

Anchorage, AK 99517

Defendant Attorney

Richard L. Pomeroy

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office (Anch)

222 West 7Th Avenue, Rm 253 #9

Anchorage, AK 99513

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) ORDER GRANTING MOTIONS TO CONSOLIDATE: granting #12 Motion to Consolidate Cases. All further filings shall be made in Case No. 3:19-cv-00265-SLG, and the case caption for these consolidated cases is amended as set forth above. (See Order for details). Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 10/22/2019. (CME, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

#12

(#12) Consent MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Trout Unlimited.(Williams, Austin) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Response to Notice of Related Cases DKT 5 by Chris Hladick, Matthew Z. Leopold, U.S. Environmental Protection Agency, Andrew Wheeler re #5 Notice (Other) (Pomeroy, Richard) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

#9

(#9) MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Rachelle Plotkin Bishop. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2770227.) by Trout Unlimited.(Bishop, Rachelle) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

#8

(#8) MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Abraham J. Shanedling. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2770221.) by Trout Unlimited.(Shanedling, Abraham) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

#7

(#7) MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Steven P. Hollman. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2770213.) by Trout Unlimited.(Hollman, Steven) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

#6

(#6) MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Paul A. Werner. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2770202.) by Trout Unlimited.(Werner, Paul) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Related Case by Trout Unlimited (Williams, Austin) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

4 #5

U.S. Attorney

4 #4

U.S. Attorney General

4 #3

Matthew Z. Leopold

4 #2

Chris Hladick

4 #1

Andrew Wheeler

#4

(#4) Unissued summons re Defendant U.S. Environmental Protection Agency, (Attachments: #1 Andrew Wheeler, #2 Chris Hladick, #3 Matthew Z. Leopold, #4 U.S. Attorney General, #5 U.S. Attorney)(PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

#3

(#3) Civil Cover Sheet. (PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Trout Unlimited. (Williams, Austin) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

1 #6

Exhibit B (Part 4 of 4)

1 #5

Exhibit B (Part 3 of 4)

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) ORDER GRANTING MOTIONS TO CONSOLIDATE: granting #12 Motion to Consolidate Cases. All further filings shall be made in Case No. 3:19-cv-00265-SLG, and the case caption for these consolidated cases is amended as set forth above. (See Order for details). Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 10/22/2019. (CME, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) CLERK'S NOTICE re #9 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Rachelle Plotkin Bishop, at docket #9 , is authorized under D.Ak. LR 83.1(d). (CME, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) CLERK'S NOTICE re #8 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Abraham J. Shanedling, at docket #8 , is authorized under D.Ak. LR 83.1(d). (CME, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) CLERK'S NOTICE re #7 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Steven P. Hollman, at docket #7 , is authorized under D.Ak. LR 83.1(d). (CME, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) CLERK'S NOTICE re #6 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Paul A. Werner, at docket #6 , is authorized under D.Ak. LR 83.1(d). (CME, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • (#13) TMB TEXT ORDER: Chief Judge Timothy M. Burgess hereby recuses himself from the above-referenced case. By agreement of the judges, the above referenced case is hereby reassigned to the Honorable Sharon L. Gleason for all further proceedings. Please use the following case number on all future filings: 3:19-cv-00268-SLG. (RMC, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Consent MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Trout Unlimited.(Williams, Austin) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of Response to Notice of Related Cases DKT 5 by Chris Hladick, Matthew Z. Leopold, U.S. Environmental Protection Agency, Andrew Wheeler re #5 Notice (Other) (Pomeroy, Richard) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • (#10) JUDGE SEDWICK TEXT ORDER: The assigned judge hereby recuses. This case is re-assigned by random draw to Hon. Timothy M. Burgess. The case number henceforth will be 3:19-00268-TMB. (JLH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Rachelle Plotkin Bishop. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2770227.) by Trout Unlimited.(Bishop, Rachelle) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Abraham J. Shanedling. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2770221.) by Trout Unlimited.(Shanedling, Abraham) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Steven P. Hollman. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2770213.) by Trout Unlimited.(Hollman, Steven) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Paul A. Werner. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2770202.) by Trout Unlimited.(Werner, Paul) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Related Case by Trout Unlimited (Williams, Austin) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • Summons Issued as to Chris Hladick, Matthew Z. Leopold, U.S. Environmental Protection Agency, Andrew Wheeler, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Unissued summons re Defendant U.S. Environmental Protection Agency, (Attachments: #1 Andrew Wheeler, #2 Chris Hladick, #3 Matthew Z. Leopold, #4 U.S. Attorney General, #5 U.S. Attorney)(PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Civil Cover Sheet. (PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Trout Unlimited. (Williams, Austin) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 097--2769923.), filed by Trout Unlimited. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B (Part 1 of 4), #4 Exhibit B (Part 2 of 4), #5 Exhibit B (Part 3 of 4), #6 Exhibit B (Part 4 of 4))(Williams, Austin) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.