This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/27/2022 at 07:11:48 (UTC).

TRONOSKI v. IMPERIAL HEALTHCARE GROUP, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 12/29/2021 TRONOSKI filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against IMPERIAL HEALTHCARE GROUP, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is CYNTHIA M. RUFE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-05646

  • Filing Date:

    12/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CYNTHIA M. RUFE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROSALIE TRONOSKI

Defendants

IMPERIAL HEALTHCARE GROUP, LLC

SILVER STREAM NURSING AND REHABILITATION SNF, LLC doing business as SILVER STREAM NURSING AND REHABILITATION CENTER

GARDEN SPRING SNF, LLC doing business as GARDEN SPRING NURSING AND REHABILITATION CENTER

CHAIM "CHARLIE&q STEG

CHAIM CHARLIE STEG

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ARI RISSON KARPF

Attorney at KARPF, KARPF & CERUTTI, P.C.

3331 Street Road

Two Greenwood Square, SU 128

ADAM C. LEASE

Attorney at KARPF KARPF & CERUTTI PC

3331 Street Road, Two Greenwood Sq Suite 128

Bensalem, PA 19020

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against GARDEN SPRING SNF, LLC, IMPERIAL HEALTHCARE GROUP, LLC, SILVER STREAM NURSING AND REHABILITATION SNF, LLC, CHAIM "CHARLIE&q STEG ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-15633030.), filed by ROSALIE TRONOSKI.(KARPF, ARI) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by ADAM C. LEASE on behalf of ROSALIE TRONOSKI (LEASE, ADAM) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

#3

(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ROSALIE TRONOSKI. GARDEN SPRING SNF, LLC waiver sent on 1/14/2022, answer due 3/15/2022; IMPERIAL HEALTHCARE GROUP, LLC waiver sent on 1/14/2022, answer due 3/15/2022; SILVER STREAM NURSING AND REHABILITATION SNF, LLC waiver sent on 1/14/2022, answer due 3/15/2022; CHAIM CHARLIE STEG waiver sent on 1/14/2022, answer due 3/15/2022. (KARPF, ARI) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ROSALIE TRONOSKI. GARDEN SPRING SNF, LLC waiver sent on 1/14/2022, answer due 3/15/2022; IMPERIAL HEALTHCARE GROUP, LLC waiver sent on 1/14/2022, answer due 3/15/2022; SILVER STREAM NURSING AND REHABILITATION SNF, LLC waiver sent on 1/14/2022, answer due 3/15/2022; CHAIM CHARLIE STEG waiver sent on 1/14/2022, answer due 3/15/2022. (KARPF, ARI) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by ADAM C. LEASE on behalf of ROSALIE TRONOSKI (LEASE, ADAM) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketSummons Issued as to GARDEN SPRING SNF, LLC, IMPERIAL HEALTHCARE GROUP, LLC, SILVER STREAM NURSING AND REHABILITATION SNF, LLC and CHAIM CHARLIE STEG. Emailed to counsel on 1/3/22 (mbh, ) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by ROSALIE TRONOSKI. (JL ) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against GARDEN SPRING SNF, LLC, IMPERIAL HEALTHCARE GROUP, LLC, SILVER STREAM NURSING AND REHABILITATION SNF, LLC, CHAIM "CHARLIE&q STEG ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-15633030.), filed by ROSALIE TRONOSKI.(KARPF, ARI) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where IMPERIAL HEALTHCARE GROUP, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ADAM C. LEASE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ARI R. KARPF