This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/06/2022 at 08:05:32 (UTC).

Tron Holdings LLC v. Expedia, Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/07/2022 Tron Holdings LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Expedia, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Lee Yeakel. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:22-CV-01057

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lee Yeakel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tron Holdings LLC

Defendant

Expedia, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Isaac Rabicoff

Defendant Attorneys

Jeanne M. Gills

Jill M. Hale

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (bot1) (Entered: 11/01/2022)

#13

(#13) ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lad) (Entered: 10/31/2022)

12 #1

Proposed Order

12 #12

Main Document

#11

(#11) ORDER GRANTING #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jeanne M. Gills for Expedia, Inc.. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (sm3) (Entered: 10/26/2022)

#10

(#10) ORDER re #8 Stipulation filed by Expedia, Inc., Expedia, Inc. answer due 12/5/2022.. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (sm3) (Entered: 10/26/2022)

9 #1

Proposed Order Proposed Order

9 #9

Main Document

8 #1

Proposed Order Order on Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to Complain

8 #8

Main Document

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jill M. Hale on behalf of Expedia, Inc.. Attorney Jill M. Hale added to party Expedia, Inc.(pty:dft) (Hale, Jill) (Entered: 10/21/2022)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Expedia, Inc.. (sm3) (Entered: 10/11/2022)

#5

(#5) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 10/07/2022)

#4

(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Tron Holdings LLC. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 10/07/2022)

#3

(#3) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Tron Holdings LLC. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 10/07/2022)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Isaac Rabicoff on behalf of Tron Holdings LLC (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 10/07/2022)

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit 1

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (bot1) (Entered: 11/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lad) (Entered: 10/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Tron Holdings LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 10/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER GRANTING #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jeanne M. Gills for Expedia, Inc.. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (sm3) (Entered: 10/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER re #8 Stipulation filed by Expedia, Inc., Expedia, Inc. answer due 12/5/2022.. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (sm3) (Entered: 10/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jill M. Hale Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jill M. Hale on behalf of Jeanne M. Gills ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-16671327) by on behalf of Expedia, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Hale, Jill) (Entered: 10/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STIPULATION For Extension of Time for Expedia, Inc. to Respond to Complaint by Expedia, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order on Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint)(Hale, Jill) (Entered: 10/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jill M. Hale on behalf of Expedia, Inc.. Attorney Jill M. Hale added to party Expedia, Inc.(pty:dft) (Hale, Jill) (Entered: 10/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Expedia, Inc.. (sm3) (Entered: 10/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. Assigned due to related cases. (sm3) (Entered: 10/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 10/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Tron Holdings LLC. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 10/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Tron Holdings LLC. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 10/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Isaac Rabicoff on behalf of Tron Holdings LLC (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 10/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXWDC-16613699), filed by Tron Holdings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 10/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less