This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/30/2023 at 04:50:34 (UTC).

Tron Holdings LLC v. AT&T Services, Inc., et al.

Case Summary

On 10/07/2022 Tron Holdings LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against AT T Services, Inc ,. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Lee Yeakel. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:22-CV-01054

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lee Yeakel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tron Holdings LLC

Defendants

AT&T Services, Inc.

DIRECTV, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Isaac Rabicoff

Defendant Attorney

Matthew S. Yungwirth

 

Court Documents

#28

(#28) Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (bot1) (Entered: 02/22/2023)

#27

(#27) ORDER CLOSING CASE. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lad) (Entered: 02/21/2023)

26 #1

Proposed Order

26 #26

Main Document

25 #1

Proposed Order

25 #25

Main Document

13 #2

Exhibit 2

13 #1

Exhibit 1

13 #13

Main Document

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to AT&T, Inc.. (sm3) (Entered: 10/11/2022)

#5

(#5) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 10/07/2022)

#4

(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Tron Holdings LLC. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 10/07/2022)

#3

(#3) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Tron Holdings LLC. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 10/07/2022)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Isaac Rabicoff on behalf of Tron Holdings LLC (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 10/07/2022)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

1 #1

Main Document

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (bot1) (Entered: 02/22/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) ORDER CLOSING CASE. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lad) (Entered: 02/21/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Tron Holdings LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 02/20/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #13 Amended Complaint by Tron Holdings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 02/15/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ORDER GRANTING #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Matthew S. Yungwirth for AT&T Services, Inc.. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (sm3) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ORDER GRANTING #17 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (sm3) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Tron Holdings LLC as to DIRECTV, LLC. Waiver sent on 12/23/2022, answer due 2/21/2023. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Tron Holdings LLC as to AT&T Services, Inc.. Waiver sent on 12/23/2022, answer due 2/21/2023. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Summons Issued as to AT&T Services, Inc., DIRECTV, LLC. (lad) (Entered: 12/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Tron Holdings LLC. (DIRECTV, LLC) (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 12/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER GRANTING #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint . AT&T, Inc. answer due 12/16/2022. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (bw) (Entered: 10/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by AT&T, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Govett, Brett) (Entered: 10/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brett Christopher Govett on behalf of AT&T, Inc.. Attorney Brett Christopher Govett added to party AT&T, Inc.(pty:dft) (Govett, Brett) (Entered: 10/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to AT&T, Inc.. (sm3) (Entered: 10/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. Assigned due to related cases. (sm3) (Entered: 10/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 10/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Tron Holdings LLC. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 10/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Tron Holdings LLC. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 10/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Isaac Rabicoff on behalf of Tron Holdings LLC (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 10/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXWDC-16612846), filed by Tron Holdings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 10/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less