This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/11/2023 at 07:31:25 (UTC).

Trivedi v. General Electric Company et al

Case Summary

On 01/10/2023 Trivedi filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against General Electric Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District Court. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-10067

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Pro Se Party Madhuri Trivedi

Defendants

General Electric Company

Larry Culp

GE Board of Directors

Michael Swinford

Carl Conrath

John Dineen

David Mehring

Nicole Boyles

Adam Holton

Michael Truman

Ayesha Khan

Jeffrey Immelt

Timothy Kottak

David Elario

Robert Swieringa

Susan Hockfield

Diane Smith

Dipti Patel

Nathan Davis

11 More Parties Available

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against William Barbiaux, Nicole Boyles, Carl Conrath, Larry Culp, Nathan Davis, John Dineen, David Elario, Foley & Mansfield Law Firm, Fragomen, Del Rey, Bersen & Loewy, LLP, GE Board of Directors, General Electric Company, Michael Harsh, Susan Hockfield, Adam Holton, Jeffrey Immelt, Ayesha Khan, Daniel Koh, Timothy Kottak, David Mehring, OSHA, Dipti Patel, Reema Podddar, Jenny Schrager, Diane Smith, Gregory Stratton, Robert Swieringa, Michael Swinford, Michael Truman. Document filed by Madhuri Trivedi. (Attachments: #1 Errata pages).(rdz) (Entered: 12/16/2022)

1 #1

Errata pages

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET..(rdz) (Entered: 12/16/2022)

#3

(#3) WAIVER OF THE SERVICE OF SUMMONS. Document filed by Madhuri Trivedi..(rdz) (Entered: 12/16/2022)

#4

(#4) PRO SE CONSENT TO RECEIVE ELECTRONIC SERVICE. The following party: Madhuri Trivedi consents to receive electronic service via the ECF system. Document filed by Madhuri Trivedi.(sc) (Entered: 12/19/2022)

#5

(#5) MOTION FOR A CONFERENCE CALL, MOTION FOR HEARING WITH JUDGE. Document filed by Madhuri Trivedi.(sc) (Entered: 12/20/2022)

#6

(#6) TRANSFER ORDER: The Clerk of Court is directed to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the District of Massachusetts. Whether Plaintiff should be permitted to proceed further without prepayment of fees is a determination to be made by the transferee court. A summons shall not issue from this Court. This order closes this case. Plaintiff is warned that further duplicative or frivolous litigation in this court will result in an order barring Plaintiff from filing new actions in this court without prior permission. See 28 U.S.C. 1651. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. Cf. Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962) (holding that an appellant demonstrates good faith when he seeks review of a nonfrivolous issue). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 12/19/22) (rdz) Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing. (Entered: 12/21/2022)

#7

(#7) LETTER addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from M. Trivedi, re: "MOTION TO ASSIGN THIS CASE EITHER RANDOMLY TO ANOTHER JUDGE OR TO JUDGE JESSE FURMAN, JUDGE KATHERINE/ MOTION TO RECONSIDER TRANSFER/ MOTION TO HAVE CONFERENCE CALL( I FILED ONE MOTION ALREADY YESTERDAY)." Document filed by Madhuri Trivedi.(sc) (Entered: 12/21/2022)

#8

(#8) ORDER: Plaintiff's pending motions (ECF Nos. 5, 7) are denied. Plaintiff is advised not to contact chambers. Plaintiff may call the court's Pro Se Intake Unit at (212) 805-0175, should she need procedural advice or have any procedural questions about her case. Plaintiff remains warned that further duplicative or frivolous litigation in this court will result in an order barring Plaintiff from filing new actions in this court without prior permission. See 28 U.S.C. 1651. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. Cf. Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962) (holding that an appellant demonstrates good faith when he seeks review of a nonfrivolous issue). SO ORDERED.denying #5 Motion re: #5 MOTION FOR A CONFERENCE CALL. MOTION for Hearing. ; denying #5 Motion for Hearing. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 12/21/22) (rdz) (Entered: 12/22/2022)

#9

(#9) LETTER addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from M. Trivedi, re: "MOTION TO RECUSE JUDGE LAURA SWAIN (AND ASSIGN THIS CASE RANDOMLY INSTEAD OF JUDGE SWAIN ASSIGNING IT TO HERSELF SUA SPONTE. IT IS NOT LEGAL)." - Your transfer is illegal and is Obstruction of Justice etc. Document filed by Madhuri Trivedi.(sc) (Entered: 12/22/2022)

#10

(#10) LETTER from M. Trivedi, re: "Letter to Clerk of the Court, Ruby J. Krajick" - As an administrative staff, please get involved and read my docket filings etc. Please ask Judge Swain to refrain from getting involved sua sponte in my case ever again. She nor her law clerk are reading my filings. Please arrange a conference call etc. Document filed by Madhuri Trivedi.(sc) (Entered: 12/22/2022)

#11

(#11) Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:22-cv-10630. (Entered: 01/10/2023)

11 #1

*Restricted*

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:22-cv-10630. (Entered: 01/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) LETTER from M. Trivedi, re: "Letter to Clerk of the Court, Ruby J. Krajick" - As an administrative staff, please get involved and read my docket filings etc. Please ask Judge Swain to refrain from getting involved sua sponte in my case ever again. She nor her law clerk are reading my filings. Please arrange a conference call etc. Document filed by Madhuri Trivedi.(sc) (Entered: 12/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) LETTER addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from M. Trivedi, re: "MOTION TO RECUSE JUDGE LAURA SWAIN (AND ASSIGN THIS CASE RANDOMLY INSTEAD OF JUDGE SWAIN ASSIGNING IT TO HERSELF SUA SPONTE. IT IS NOT LEGAL)." - Your transfer is illegal and is Obstruction of Justice etc. Document filed by Madhuri Trivedi.(sc) (Entered: 12/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER: Plaintiff's pending motions (ECF Nos. 5, 7) are denied. Plaintiff is advised not to contact chambers. Plaintiff may call the court's Pro Se Intake Unit at (212) 805-0175, should she need procedural advice or have any procedural questions about her case. Plaintiff remains warned that further duplicative or frivolous litigation in this court will result in an order barring Plaintiff from filing new actions in this court without prior permission. See 28 U.S.C. 1651. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. Cf. Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962) (holding that an appellant demonstrates good faith when he seeks review of a nonfrivolous issue). SO ORDERED.denying #5 Motion re: #5 MOTION FOR A CONFERENCE CALL. MOTION for Hearing. ; denying #5 Motion for Hearing. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 12/21/22) (rdz) (Entered: 12/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) LETTER addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from M. Trivedi, re: "MOTION TO ASSIGN THIS CASE EITHER RANDOMLY TO ANOTHER JUDGE OR TO JUDGE JESSE FURMAN, JUDGE KATHERINE/ MOTION TO RECONSIDER TRANSFER/ MOTION TO HAVE CONFERENCE CALL( I FILED ONE MOTION ALREADY YESTERDAY)." Document filed by Madhuri Trivedi.(sc) (Entered: 12/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketCASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of District of Massachusetts.(rdz) (Entered: 12/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) TRANSFER ORDER: The Clerk of Court is directed to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the District of Massachusetts. Whether Plaintiff should be permitted to proceed further without prepayment of fees is a determination to be made by the transferee court. A summons shall not issue from this Court. This order closes this case. Plaintiff is warned that further duplicative or frivolous litigation in this court will result in an order barring Plaintiff from filing new actions in this court without prior permission. See 28 U.S.C. 1651. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. Cf. Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962) (holding that an appellant demonstrates good faith when he seeks review of a nonfrivolous issue). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 12/19/22) (rdz) Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing. (Entered: 12/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION FOR A CONFERENCE CALL, MOTION FOR HEARING WITH JUDGE. Document filed by Madhuri Trivedi.(sc) (Entered: 12/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (sac) (Entered: 12/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) PRO SE CONSENT TO RECEIVE ELECTRONIC SERVICE. The following party: Madhuri Trivedi consents to receive electronic service via the ECF system. Document filed by Madhuri Trivedi.(sc) (Entered: 12/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) WAIVER OF THE SERVICE OF SUMMONS. Document filed by Madhuri Trivedi..(rdz) (Entered: 12/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET..(rdz) (Entered: 12/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (rdz) (Entered: 12/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against William Barbiaux, Nicole Boyles, Carl Conrath, Larry Culp, Nathan Davis, John Dineen, David Elario, Foley & Mansfield Law Firm, Fragomen, Del Rey, Bersen & Loewy, LLP, GE Board of Directors, General Electric Company, Michael Harsh, Susan Hockfield, Adam Holton, Jeffrey Immelt, Ayesha Khan, Daniel Koh, Timothy Kottak, David Mehring, OSHA, Dipti Patel, Reema Podddar, Jenny Schrager, Diane Smith, Gregory Stratton, Robert Swieringa, Michael Swinford, Michael Truman. Document filed by Madhuri Trivedi. (Attachments: #1 Errata pages).(rdz) (Entered: 12/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less