This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/24/2021 at 08:53:01 (UTC).

Triumph IP LLC v. Vocera Communications, Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/25/2021 Triumph IP LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Vocera Communications, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Maryellen Noreika. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01213

  • Filing Date:

    08/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Maryellen Noreika

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Triumph IP LLC

Defendant and Counter Claimant

Vocera Communications, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Jimmy C. Chong

Attorney at The Chong Law Firm, P.A.

2961 Centerville Road, Suite 350

Wilmington, DE 19808

David R. Bennett

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Lance E. Wyatt

Neil J. McNabnay

Rodeen Talebi

Jeremy Douglas Anderson

Attorney at Fish & Richardson, P.C.

222 Delaware Avenue, 17Th Floorp.O. Box 1114

Wilmington, DE 19899-1114

 

Court Documents

#11

#10

#9

#8

7 #1

Affidavit

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Related Cases

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2021
  • Docket(#12) ORAL ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall confer regarding proposed dates in the scheduling order and shall submit a proposed, coordinated order, including a proposal for the length and timing of trial, to the Court no later than thirty (30) days from the date of this Order. The parties are to use the Court's form scheduling order, which is posted at http://www.ded.uscourts.gov (see Chambers, Judge Noreika, Forms). If there are disputes or issues that the Court needs to address in the proposed scheduling order, the parties shall direct the Court to the paragraph numbers in which those appear in a cover letter to the Court. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 10/8/2021. (dlw) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ANSWER to #8 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Triumph IP LLC.(Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorneys Lance E. Wyatt, Rodeen Talebi and Neil J. McNabnay for Vocera Communications, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (twk) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED re #10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Neil J. McNabnay, Lance Wyatt and Rodeen Talebi filed by Vocera Communications, Inc. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 9/20/2021. (dlw) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Neil J. McNabnay, Lance Wyatt and Rodeen Talebi - filed by Vocera Communications, Inc.. (Anderson, Jeremy) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Vocera Communications, Inc.. (Anderson, Jeremy) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand, Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against Triumph IP LLC by Vocera Communications, Inc. (Anderson, Jeremy) Modified on 9/20/2021 (dlw). (Entered: 09/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorney David R. Bennett for Triumph IP LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (srs) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED re #7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David R. Bennett filed by Triumph IP LLC. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 9/2/2021. (dlw) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David R. Bennett - filed by Triumph IP LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-01211-MN, 1:21-cv-01212-MN, 1:21-cv-01213-MN (rjb) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Triumph IP LLC. Vocera Communications, Inc. served on 8/30/2021, answer due 9/20/2021. (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (twk) (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Triumph IP LLC. (twk) (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 7,177,291; 7,523,479. (twk) (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (twk) (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Vocera Communications, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3685826.) - filed by Triumph IP LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Related Cases, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(twk) (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Triumph IP LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jeremy Douglas Anderson