This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/23/2021 at 07:55:13 (UTC).

Triumph IP LLC v. Tait North America, Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/24/2021 Triumph IP LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Tait North America, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Charles Eskridge. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-02779

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Charles Eskridge

 

Party Details

Counter Defendant and Plaintiff

Triumph IP LLC

Counter Claimant and Defendant

Tait North America, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Counter Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

David R Bennett

Attorney at Direction IP Law

Po Box 14184

Chicago, IL 60617-0184

Papool S Chaudhari

Attorney at PRA Law

2800 Bartons Bluff Lane #1902

Austin, TX 78746

Counter Claimant and Defendant Attorneys

Neil J McNabnay

Attorney at Fish Richardson PC

1717 Main Stsuite 5000

Dallas, TX 75201

Lance Eric Wyatt, Jr.

Attorney at Fish & Richardson P.C.

1717 Main St.Ste. 5000

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

#16

#15

#14

#13

#12

11 #1

Proposed Order

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

5 #1

Complaint

#5

#4

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Tait North America, Inc., filed.(Wyatt, Lance) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against Triumph IP LLC by Tait North America, Inc., filed.(Wyatt, Lance) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Lance Wyatt on behalf of Tait North America, Inc., filed. (Wyatt, Lance) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Neil J. McNabnay on behalf of Tait North America, Inc., filed. (McNabnay, Neil) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER granting #11 MOTION for Continuance of the Initial Pretrial Conference. ( Initial Conference reset for 12/3/2021 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8B before Judge Charles Eskridge)(Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(jengonzalez, 4) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION for Continuance of the Initial Pretrial Conference by Triumph IP LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/13/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bennett, David) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Tait North America, Inc. served on 9/13/2021, answer due 10/4/2021, filed.(Chaudhari, Papool) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Triumph IP LLC, filed.(Bennett, David) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 10/14/2021 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8B before Judge Charles Eskridge. (Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(jengonzalezadi, 4) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #6 Motion for David R. Bennett to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(jengonzalez, 4) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for David R. Bennett to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Triumph IP LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/16/2021. (Bennett, David) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) US Patent and Trademark Office Notified. AO 120, filed. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (jdavadi, 4) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Tait North America, Inc.. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(jdav, 4) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Tait North America, Inc., filed.(Chaudhari, Papool) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Triumph IP LLC, filed.(Chaudhari, Papool) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Tait North America, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-26943770) filed by Triumph IP LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)(Chaudhari, Papool) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Triumph IP LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lance Eric Wyatt, Jr

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Neil J McNabnay