This case was last updated from PACER on 02/04/2020 at 08:24:47 (UTC).

Tristani et al v. Optionsellers.com, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 Tristani filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Optionsellers com, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jeremy D. Kernodle. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:19-CV-00585

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jeremy D. Kernodle

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Radford Tarry

Anthony Tristani

Mark Marshall

Defendants

Optionsellers.com, Inc.

James Cordier

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Anthony Leonard Vitullo

Attorney at Fee Smith Sharp & Vitullo, LLP - Dallas

Three Galleria Tower, 13155 Noel Rd, Suite 1000

Dallas, TX 75240

James Meadows Goff

Attorney at Fee Smith Sharp & Vitullo, LLP - Dallas

Three Galleria Tower, 13135 Noel Rd., Suite 1000

Dallas, TX 75240

Defendant Attorneys

Constantine Z Pamphilis

Attorney at Kasowitz Benson Torres - Houston

1415 Louisiana, Suite 2100

Houston, TX 77002

Andrew R. Kurland

Attorney at Kasowitz Benson Torres LLP - NY

1633 Broadway

New York, NY 10019

Jed I. Bergman

Attorney at Kasowitz Benson Torres LLP - NY

1633 Broadway

New York, NY 10019

 

Court Documents

11 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#11

(#11) RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer filed by Mark Marshall, Radford Tarry, Anthony Tristani. (Goff, James) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/28/2020: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (gsg, ). (Entered: 01/27/2020)

#10

(#10) ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #6 MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer. Responses due by 1/27/2020. Signed by District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle on 1/17/2020. (gsg) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

#9

(#9) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer by Mark Marshall, Radford Tarry, Anthony Tristani. (Vitullo, Anthony) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Andrew R. Kurland on behalf of James Cordier, Optionsellers.com, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7603062. (Kurland, Andrew) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Jed I. Bergman on behalf of James Cordier, Optionsellers.com, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7603067. (Bergman, Jed) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

6 #4

Text of Proposed Order

6 #3

Exhibit C: Tarry Account Agreement

6 #2

Exhibit B: Marshall Trust Account Agreement

6 #1

Exhibit A: Tristani Account Agreement

#6

(#6) MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer by James Cordier, Optionsellers.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Tristani Account Agreement, #2 Exhibit B: Marshall Trust Account Agreement, #3 Exhibit C: Tarry Account Agreement, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Pamphilis, Constantine) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

#5

(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by James Cordier, Optionsellers.com, Inc. (Pamphilis, Constantine) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

#4

(#4) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re James Cordier, Optionsellers.com, Inc..( Pamphilis, Constantine) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT. (mll, ) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT against James Cordier, Optionsellers.com, Inc., filed by Anthony Tristani, Mark Marshall, Radford Tarry. (Filed in state court as "Plaintiffs' Original Petition") (mll, ) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Optionsellers.com, Inc., James Cordier from 369th Judicial District Court of Cherokee County, Texas, case number 2019-110546. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7560667), filed by Optionsellers.com, Inc., James Cordier. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pamphilis, Constantine) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer filed by Mark Marshall, Radford Tarry, Anthony Tristani. (Goff, James) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/28/2020: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (gsg, ). (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #6 MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer. Responses due by 1/27/2020. Signed by District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle on 1/17/2020. (gsg) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer by Mark Marshall, Radford Tarry, Anthony Tristani. (Vitullo, Anthony) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Andrew R. Kurland on behalf of James Cordier, Optionsellers.com, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7603062. (Kurland, Andrew) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Jed I. Bergman on behalf of James Cordier, Optionsellers.com, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7603067. (Bergman, Jed) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer by James Cordier, Optionsellers.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Tristani Account Agreement, #2 Exhibit B: Marshall Trust Account Agreement, #3 Exhibit C: Tarry Account Agreement, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Pamphilis, Constantine) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by James Cordier, Optionsellers.com, Inc. (Pamphilis, Constantine) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDefendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint #4 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Optionsellers.com, Inc. to 1/3/2020; James Cordier to 1/3/2020. 39 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, ) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re James Cordier, Optionsellers.com, Inc..( Pamphilis, Constantine) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (mll, ) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT. (mll, ) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketDistrict Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle added. (mll, ) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by Mark Marshall, Radford Tarry, Anthony Tristani. (mll, ) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT against James Cordier, Optionsellers.com, Inc., filed by Anthony Tristani, Mark Marshall, Radford Tarry. (Filed in state court as "Plaintiffs' Original Petition") (mll, ) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Optionsellers.com, Inc., James Cordier from 369th Judicial District Court of Cherokee County, Texas, case number 2019-110546. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7560667), filed by Optionsellers.com, Inc., James Cordier. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pamphilis, Constantine) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less