This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/13/2022 at 09:29:34 (UTC).

TRIPP v. COLEMAN et al

Case Summary

On 06/14/2022 TRIPP filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against COLEMAN. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Richard L. Young and Mario Garcia. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-01200

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard L. Young

Referral Judge

Mario Garcia

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TERRY WILLIAM TRIPP, SR.

Pendleton, IN 46064

Defendants

COLEMAN

A. TRIVETT

EADS

RUTAN

JUSTIN OCONNOR

SEVEREZ

C. ROLLAND

JACKSON

ROACH

HOOKER

BRANDON BOWEN

TRICIA PRETORIOUS

STRANGE

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff TERRY WILLIAM TRIPP, SR. (JSR) (Entered: 06/14/2022)

#3

(#3) MOTION For Formal Order to Facility Housing Plaintiff to Provide Necessary Documentation to Accompany Forma Pauperis, filed by Plaintiff TERRY WILLIAM TRIPP, SR. (JSR) (Entered: 06/14/2022)

#4

(#4) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (JSR) (Entered: 06/14/2022)

#5

(#5) ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF'S CUSTODIAN TO FORWARD CERTIFIED COPY OF PLAINTIFF'S SIX-MONTH TRUST ACCOUNT STATEMENT. The Court has no reason to doubt the veracity of the statements in the plaintiff's motion. The Court further finds that providing the plaintiff with additional time to continue to request a copy of his trust account statement would be fruitless. Therefore, his motion, dkt. #3 , is granted. Accordingly, the Court hereby ORDERS the Warden of Correctional Industrial Facility or the Warden's designee to provide the Court with a certified copy of the plaintiff's trust account statement for the six-month period preceding the filing of this action on June 14, 2022, and to do so no later than June 30, 2022. Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mario Garcia on 6/15/2022. (NAD) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE to Pro se Litigant - The following information is provided to pro se litigants to inform them about rules and procedures governing how they communicate with the Court. Copy to plaintiff by U.S. Mail. (MEH) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

#8

(#8) EXHIBIT re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by TERRY WILLIAM TRIPP, SR. (AAS) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

#9

(#9) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis to the extent that the plaintiff is assessed an initial partial filing fee of Seven Dollars and Eighty-Three Cents ($7.83). The plaintiff shall have through August 5, 2022, in which to pay this sum to the clerk of the district court. SEE ORDER. Copy sent to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 7/8/2022. (JRB) (Main Document 9 replaced on 7/8/2022) (JRB). Modified on 7/8/2022 (JRB). (Entered: 07/08/2022)

#11

(#11) Order Directing Further Proceedings - On July 8, 2022, the Court ordered the plaintiff to pay an initial partial filing fee of Seven Dollars and Eighty- Three Cents ($7.83) by August 5, 2022. That deadline has passed and the plaintiff has failed to do so or otherwise respond. Therefore, the plaintiff shall have through September 12, 2022, to pay the initial partial filing fee or explain why doing so is not possible. The failure to do so by this date will result in the dismissal of this action without further warning. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1) (requiring court to assess and collect an initial partial filing fee). Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 08/12/2022.(AAS) (Entered: 08/12/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Order Directing Further Proceedings - On July 8, 2022, the Court ordered the plaintiff to pay an initial partial filing fee of Seven Dollars and Eighty- Three Cents ($7.83) by August 5, 2022. That deadline has passed and the plaintiff has failed to do so or otherwise respond. Therefore, the plaintiff shall have through September 12, 2022, to pay the initial partial filing fee or explain why doing so is not possible. The failure to do so by this date will result in the dismissal of this action without further warning. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1) (requiring court to assess and collect an initial partial filing fee). Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 08/12/2022.(AAS) (Entered: 08/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CONSENT to Jurisdiction to US Magistrate Judge by TERRY WILLIAM TRIPP, SR. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(JRB) (Entered: 07/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis to the extent that the plaintiff is assessed an initial partial filing fee of Seven Dollars and Eighty-Three Cents ($7.83). The plaintiff shall have through August 5, 2022, in which to pay this sum to the clerk of the district court. SEE ORDER. Copy sent to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 7/8/2022. (JRB) (Main Document 9 replaced on 7/8/2022) (JRB). Modified on 7/8/2022 (JRB). (Entered: 07/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) EXHIBIT re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by TERRY WILLIAM TRIPP, SR. (AAS) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RESPONSE to #5 Order, filed by Plaintiff TERRY WILLIAM TRIPP, SR. (Attachments: #1 Inmate Trust Account, #2 Envelope)(TPS) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE to Pro se Litigant - The following information is provided to pro se litigants to inform them about rules and procedures governing how they communicate with the Court. Copy to plaintiff by U.S. Mail. (MEH) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF'S CUSTODIAN TO FORWARD CERTIFIED COPY OF PLAINTIFF'S SIX-MONTH TRUST ACCOUNT STATEMENT. The Court has no reason to doubt the veracity of the statements in the plaintiff's motion. The Court further finds that providing the plaintiff with additional time to continue to request a copy of his trust account statement would be fruitless. Therefore, his motion, dkt. #3 , is granted. Accordingly, the Court hereby ORDERS the Warden of Correctional Industrial Facility or the Warden's designee to provide the Court with a certified copy of the plaintiff's trust account statement for the six-month period preceding the filing of this action on June 14, 2022, and to do so no later than June 30, 2022. Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mario Garcia on 6/15/2022. (NAD) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (JSR) (Entered: 06/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION For Formal Order to Facility Housing Plaintiff to Provide Necessary Documentation to Accompany Forma Pauperis, filed by Plaintiff TERRY WILLIAM TRIPP, SR. (JSR) (Entered: 06/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff TERRY WILLIAM TRIPP, SR. (JSR) (Entered: 06/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against BRANDON BOWEN, COLEMAN, EADS, HOOKER, JACKSON, JUSTIN OCONNOR, TRICIA PRETORIOUS, ROACH, C. ROLLAND, RUTAN, SEVEREZ, STRANGE, A. TRIVETT, filed by TERRY WILLIAM TRIPP, SR. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(JSR) (Entered: 06/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Eads is a litigant

Latest cases where Hooker is a litigant

Latest cases where Roach is a litigant

Latest cases where COLEMAN is a litigant