This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/02/2020 at 10:06:22 (UTC).

Triplenet Pricing LLC et al Skullcandy, Inc.

Case Summary

On 01/02/2020 Triplenet Pricing LLC Skullcandy, Inc was filed as an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Utah District. The Judges overseeing this case are Dustin B. Pead and Howard C. Nielson, Jr. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00002

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Dustin B. Pead

Howard C. Nielson, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Triplenet Pricing LLC

Defendant

Skullcandy

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Edward S. Antar

Attorney at ANTAR LAW FIRM, PLLC

26 Court St, Ste 1200

Brooklyn, NY 11242

Solomon E. Antar

Attorney at ANTAR LAW FIRM PLLC

26 Court St Ste 1200

Brooklyn, NY 11242

Robert T. Spjute

Attorney at SHUMWAY VAN LLC

8 East Broadway Ste 550

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Defendant Attorneys

Monica S. Call

Attorney at STOEL RIVES

201 S Main St Ste 1100

Salt Lake City, UT 84111-4904

William D. Kloss, Jr.

Attorney at VORYS SATER SEYMOUR AND PEASE LLP

52 E Gay St, Po Box 1008

Columbus, OH 43216-1008

 

Court Documents

#36

#32

#30

29 #5

Exhibit E - 3-13-18 Letter

29 #4

Exhibit D - 3-6-18 Letter

29 #1

Exhibit A - 1-24-18 Letter

25 #2

Text of Proposed Order

25 #1

Exhibit A - Application for Admission PHV

#25

#6

#5

4 #1

complaint

#4

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

1 #2

Proposed Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

51 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Terminated per #36 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (las) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Triplenet Pricing LLC (Spjute, Robert) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • Docket(#35) All Consent/Reassignment Forms have now been received. After review of all forms, Case Reassigned to District Judge per request of one or more party(s). Case randomly assigned to Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr. Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead no longer assigned to the case. (nl) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • Docket(#34) RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiff Triplenet Pricing LLC. (nl) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • Docket(#33) RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendant Skullcandy. (nl) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) ORDER granting #25 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of William D. Kloss, Jr. for Skullcandy. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 1/22/2020. (nl) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) CLERK'S NOTICE OF POSSIBLE ERROR re #25 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of William D. Kloss, Jr. , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3464919. Description of possible error: Electronic case filing registration form was not attached. The entry must be adjusted, Counsel to file errata to Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice and attach the electronic case filing registration and link back to motion filed at docket #25 . (nl) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Defendant Skullcandy, Plaintiff Triplenet Pricing LLC. Form due by 2/5/2020. (nl) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION of William D. Kloss, Jr. in Support re #28 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Skullcandy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 1-24-18 Letter, #2 Exhibit B - 2-2-18 Letter, #3 Exhibit C - 2-13-18 Letter, #4 Exhibit D - 3-6-18 Letter, #5 Exhibit E - 3-13-18 Letter)(Call, Monica) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Skullcandy. (Call, Monica) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER denying #6 . Plaintiff chose to sue these defendants separately, and Judge Donnelly, as the judge with the low-numbered case, has not determined that the cases are related. The Court will defer to Judge Donnelly should she determine that the cases are related. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 10/30/2019. (Weisberg, Peggy) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 1/2/2020.] (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) First MOTION to Adjourn Conference , First MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Triplenet Pricing LLC. (Antar, Solomon) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 1/2/2020.] (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Status Conference is set for 11/12/2019 at 12:00 PM in Chambers 704S. SEE ATTACHED MANDATORY REQUIREMENTS FOR THE CONFERENCE. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 10/1/2019. (Weisberg, Peggy) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 1/2/2020.] (Entered: 10/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Notice of Report on the filing of an action regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Attachments: #1 complaint) (Rocco, Christine) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 1/2/2020.] (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to Skullcandy, Inc.. (Davis, Kimberly) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 1/2/2020.] (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 1/2/2020.] (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • Case Assigned to Judge Brian M. Cogan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 1/2/2020.] (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • CIVIL CASE FILING FEE: $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11893782 (Antar, Solomon) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 1/2/2020.] (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • The has been opened in the Eastern District of New York. PLEASE NOTE: You must pay the case filing fee within seven (7) days. Select the event (Civil Case Filing Fee) and pay online. (Davis, Kimberly) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 1/2/2020.] (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Skullcandy, Inc., filed by Triplenet Pricing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Davis, Kimberly) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 1/2/2020.] (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Triplenet Pricing Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Skullcandy is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert T. Spjute