This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/23/2022 at 06:41:09 (UTC).

Tripaldi v. Citibank, National Association et al

Case Summary

On 01/21/2022 Tripaldi filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Citibank, National Association. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Aileen M. Cannon and Shaniek M. Maynard. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-14034

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Aileen M. Cannon

Referral Judge

Shaniek M. Maynard

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Paul Tripaldi

Defendants

Citibank, National Association

Experian Information Solutions, Inc.

Equifax Information Services, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Trescot Joseph Gear

Attorney at Gear Law, LLC

3104 N. Armenia Avenue, Suite 2

Tampa, FL 33607

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summons

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Citibank, National Association, Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (kpe) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

#4

(#4) ORDER Requiring Combined Responses. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 1/25/2022. See attached document for full details. (pes) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

5 #5

Main Document

5 #1

Summons Returned Executed

#6

(#6) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, by Paul Tripaldi. (Gear, Trescot) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

#7

(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Paul Tripaldi. Equifax Information Services, LLC waiver sent on 1/28/2022, response/answer due 3/29/2022. (Gear, Trescot) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Settlement as to Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC by Paul Tripaldi (Gear, Trescot) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Settlement as to Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. by Paul Tripaldi (Gear, Trescot) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

#11

(#11) ORDER Requiring Response to Complaint. Show Cause Response due by 3/28/2022. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 3/21/2022. See attached document for full details. (kpe) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

#12

(#12) ORDER REQUIRING STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL AS TO DEFENDANTS EQUIFAX AND EXPERIAN; The parties shall file a Stipulation for Dismissal as to Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC on or before May 7, 2022, and a Stipulation for Dismissal as to Defendant Experian Information Services, LLC on or before May 17, 2022. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 3/21/2022. See attached document for full details. (yar) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER REQUIRING STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL AS TO DEFENDANTS EQUIFAX AND EXPERIAN; The parties shall file a Stipulation for Dismissal as to Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC on or before May 7, 2022, and a Stipulation for Dismissal as to Defendant Experian Information Services, LLC on or before May 17, 2022. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 3/21/2022. See attached document for full details. (yar) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER Requiring Response to Complaint. Show Cause Response due by 3/28/2022. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 3/21/2022. See attached document for full details. (kpe) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Settlement as to Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. by Paul Tripaldi (Gear, Trescot) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Settlement as to Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC by Paul Tripaldi (Gear, Trescot) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) PAPERLESS ORDER granting Plaintiff's #6 First Motion for Extension of Time for Experian Information Solutions, Inc. to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant Experian shall respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before March 18, 2022 Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 2/23/2022. (ad) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Paul Tripaldi. Equifax Information Services, LLC waiver sent on 1/28/2022, response/answer due 3/29/2022. (Gear, Trescot) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, by Paul Tripaldi. (Gear, Trescot) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Paul Tripaldi. Citibank, National Association served on 2/4/2022, response/answer due 2/25/2022; Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served on 2/1/2022, response/answer due 2/22/2022. (Attachments: #1 Summons Returned Executed)(Gear, Trescot) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER Requiring Combined Responses. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 1/25/2022. See attached document for full details. (pes) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Citibank, National Association, Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (kpe) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Aileen M. Cannon and Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (kpe) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Citibank, National Association, Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15338038, filed by Paul Tripaldi. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Gear, Trescot) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Experian Information Solutions, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where CitiBank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases where Equifax Information Services LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Trescot Joseph Gear