This case was last updated from PACER on 06/12/2020 at 13:28:32 (UTC).

Triosim Coporation v. Drake

Case Summary

On 04/13/2020 Triosim Coporation filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Drake. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kristine G. Baker and Lee P. Rudofsky. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00395

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arkansas Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Kristine G. Baker

Lee P. Rudofsky

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Triosim Coporation

Defendant

A Dale Drake

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Patrick H. Morris

Attorney at Adams and Reese LLP

6075 Poplar Avenue, Suite 700

Memphis, TN 38119

Henry C. Shelton, III

Attorney at Adams and Reese LLP

6075 Poplar Avenue, Suite 700

Memphis, TN 38119

Defendant Attorneys

James W. Hyden

Attorney at Hyden, Miron & Foster, PLLC

901 North University Avenue

Little Rock, AR 72207

Jimmie Samuel Patterson

Attorney at Hyden, Miron & Foster, PLLC

901 North University Avenue

Little Rock, AR 72207

Guy W. Murphy, Jr.

Attorney at Hyden, Miron & Foster, PLLC

557 Locust Avenue

Conway, AR 72034

 

Court Documents

29 #1

Injunction Bond

#29

(#29) NOTICE by Triosim Coporation re #26 Order on Motion for TRO, Notice of Filing (Attachments: #1 Injunction Bond)(Shelton, Henry) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

#28

(#28) AMENDED INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Report due by 7/1/2020 and Jury Trial reset for 4/19/2021 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock, Arkansas Courtroom #2A before Judge Lee P. Rudofsky. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 6/2/2020. (hml) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

#27

(#27) NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #26 Order. CORRECTION: The original document was attached in error due to a clerical mistake by the Clerk's office (wrong image file). The correct document was added to docket entry #26 and is attached hereto for service on the parties. (jak) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

26 #1

Main Document - Correct

#26

(#26) ORDER granting in part and denying in part #5 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 05/29/2020. (ajt) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/1/2020: #1 Main Document - Correct) (jak). (Entered: 05/29/2020)

7 #1

Main Document - Correct (submitted 5/7/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Guy W. Murphy, Jr on behalf of All Defendants (Murphy, Guy) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/7/2020: #1 Main Document - Correct (submitted 5/7/2020)) (jak). (Entered: 05/06/2020)

#6

(#6) MEMORANDUM re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Triosim Coporation. Memorandum in Support of Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Shelton, Henry) (Entered: 05/06/2020)

5 #2

Document Complaint

5 #1

Exhibit Declaration

#5

(#20) REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction Defendant's Sur-Reply Regarding Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Supplemental Affidavit of A. Dale Drake)(Murphy, Guy) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

#4

(#4) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Verified Complaint for Injunctive Relief and Damages , filed by Triosim Coporation. A Dale Drake served on 4/16/2020. (Shelton, Henry) (Entered: 04/17/2020)

#3

(#3) ORDER granting #2 motion for admission pro hac vice of attorney Patrick H. Morris. Mr. Morris shall appear as counsel for plaintiff Triosim Corporation. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 4/17/2020. (jbh) (Entered: 04/17/2020)

2 #1

Affidavit Declaration of Patrick H. Morris

#2

(#3) ORDER granting #2 motion for admission pro hac vice of attorney Patrick H. Morris. Mr. Morris shall appear as counsel for plaintiff Triosim Corporation. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 4/17/2020. (jbh) (Entered: 04/17/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by A Dale Drake.(Murphy, Guy) (Entered: 05/06/2020)

42 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) NOTICE by Triosim Coporation re #26 Order on Motion for TRO, Notice of Filing (Attachments: #1 Injunction Bond)(Shelton, Henry) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) AMENDED INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Report due by 7/1/2020 and Jury Trial reset for 4/19/2021 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock, Arkansas Courtroom #2A before Judge Lee P. Rudofsky. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 6/2/2020. (hml) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #26 Order. CORRECTION: The original document was attached in error due to a clerical mistake by the Clerk's office (wrong image file). The correct document was added to docket entry #26 and is attached hereto for service on the parties. (jak) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) ORDER granting in part and denying in part #5 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 05/29/2020. (ajt) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/1/2020: #1 Main Document - Correct) (jak). (Entered: 05/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) RESPONSE re #24 Memorandum Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Memorandum Proposing Preliminary Injunction Clauses by A Dale Drake (Murphy, Guy) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) MEMORANDUM re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Triosim Coporation. Plaintiff's Memorandum Proposing Preliminary Injunction Clauses (Shelton, Henry) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction held on 5/21/2020, before Judge Lee P. Rudofsky. Court Reporter Margaret M. Kruse. Transcript may be viewed only at the public terminals in the Clerk's office. Copies of transcript are only available through the Official Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. DEADLINES: Notice of Intent to Request Redaction due 5/29/2020. Redaction Request due 6/12/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/22/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/20/2020. (cmn) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) NOTICE by Triosim Coporation Notice of Filing (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Warren Flenniken)(Shelton, Henry) (Entered: 05/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) CLERK'S MINUTES for proceedings held before Judge Lee P. Rudofsky: Motion Hearing held on 5/21/2020 re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Triosim Coporation. Court heard argument from the parties and took the matter under advisement. Court to issue order under separate entry. (Plaintiff: Henry Shelton; Defendant: Guy Murphy, Jr., Jim Patterson, and via telephone James Hyden; Court Reporter Margie Kruse.) (hml) (Entered: 05/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction Defendant's Sur-Reply Regarding Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Supplemental Affidavit of A. Dale Drake)(Murphy, Guy) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by James W. Hyden on behalf of All Defendants (Hyden, James) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/7/2020: #1 Main Document - Correct (submitted 5/7/2020)) (jak). (Entered: 05/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Jimmie Samuel Patterson on behalf of All Defendants (Patterson, Jimmie) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/7/2020: #1 Main Document - Correct (Submitted 5/7/2020)) (jak). (Entered: 05/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by A Dale Drake.(Murphy, Guy) (Entered: 05/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Guy W. Murphy, Jr on behalf of All Defendants (Murphy, Guy) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/7/2020: #1 Main Document - Correct (submitted 5/7/2020)) (jak). (Entered: 05/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MEMORANDUM re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Triosim Coporation. Memorandum in Support of Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Shelton, Henry) (Entered: 05/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Triosim Coporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration, #2 Document Complaint)(Shelton, Henry) (Entered: 05/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Verified Complaint for Injunctive Relief and Damages , filed by Triosim Coporation. A Dale Drake served on 4/16/2020. (Shelton, Henry) (Entered: 04/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER granting #2 motion for admission pro hac vice of attorney Patrick H. Morris. Mr. Morris shall appear as counsel for plaintiff Triosim Corporation. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 4/17/2020. (jbh) (Entered: 04/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Patrick H. Morris. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-3682922. Filed by Triosim Coporation (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Patrick H. Morris)(Shelton, Henry) (Entered: 04/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF AND DAMAGES against A Dale Drake filed by Triosim Coporation. Fee $400 received. Receipt Number LIT076844. Summons issued and returned to counsel for service. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bmd) (Entered: 04/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less