Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 07/12/2020 at 14:32:17 (UTC).

Trio Companies, LLC et al v. Miller Haviland Ketter PC, PA et al

Case Summary

On 06/13/2019 Trio Companies, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Miller Haviland Ketter PC, PA. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Greg Kays. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00463

  • Filing Date:

    06/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Missouri Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Greg Kays

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Eric Schaumburg

Trio Companies, LLC

Trio Companies, LLC doing business as Eventrio

Defendants

Douglas Miller

Miller Haviland Ketter PC, PA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Cordero A Delgadillo

2 North Central Ave, Suite 1800

Phoenix, AZ 85004

Defendant Attorneys

Marc Kimble Erickson

Attorney at Wagstaff & Cartmell LLP

4740 Grand Avenue, Suite 300

Kansas City, MO 64112

Thomas P. Cartmell

Attorney at Wagstaff & Cartmell

4740 Grand Avenue, Suite 300

Kansas City, MO 64112

Melody Dickson

Attorney at Wagstaff & Cartmell

4740 Grand Avenue, Suite 300

Kansas City, MO 64112

 

Court Documents

11 #3

Exhibit 3

11 #2

Exhibit 2

11 #1

Exhibit 1

#11

(#11) DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Erickson, Marc) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

#10

(#10) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Marc Kimble Erickson on behalf of Defendants Douglas Miller, Miller Haviland Ketter PC, PA.(Erickson, Marc) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

#9

(#9) SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 1/17/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 2/14/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 5/11/2020 02:00 PM via telephone conference initiated by Plaintiff's counsel. Jury Trial set for 6/8/2020 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8D, Kansas City (DGK) before District Judge Greg Kays. Signed on 8/6/19 by District Judge Greg Kays. (Strodtman, Tracy) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

#8

(#8) ORDER for Plaintiff's counsel to show cause in writing by 8/19/19 why he has not yet completed attorney registration or a petition for admission pro hac vice. Signed on 8/5/19 by District Judge Greg Kays. (Law clerk) (Entered: 08/05/2019)

#7

(#7) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Douglas Miller, Miller Haviland Ketter PC, PA re Defendants' 1st RFPD and 1st RFA to Trio Companies, LLC and Eric Schaumburg filed by Marc Kimble Erickson on behalf of Defendants Douglas Miller, Miller Haviland Ketter PC, PA.(Erickson, Marc) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

6 #2

Exhibit

6 #1

Exhibit

#6

(#6) REPORT of Rule 26(f) planning meeting. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Erickson, Marc) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

#5

(#5) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) filed by Marc Kimble Erickson on behalf of Defendant Miller Haviland Ketter PC, PA.(Erickson, Marc) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

#4

(#4) RULE 16 NOTICE. Rule 26 conference due by 7/29/2019. Proposed scheduling order due by 8/12/2019. Signed on 6/28/19 by District Judge Greg Kays. (Strodtman, Tracy) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

3 #1

MAP General Order

#3

(#3) AMENDED NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP re-assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

2 #1

MAP General Order

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to Program Director. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Houston, Kiambu) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

1 #5

Exhibit 5

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/08/2019
  • Docket(#12) ORDER. Because the parties are unable to agree on a mediator, the Court hereby designates Tom Bender to mediate this case. Signed on 8/8/19 by District Judge Greg Kays. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Law clerk) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your post-mediation status report is due within 10 calendar days after the mediation. See MAP FAQs on Court's website for specifics and submit report(s) to: map@mow.uscourts.gov. (ADI, MAP) (Entered: 08/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Erickson, Marc) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Marc Kimble Erickson on behalf of Defendants Douglas Miller, Miller Haviland Ketter PC, PA.(Erickson, Marc) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 1/17/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 2/14/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 5/11/2020 02:00 PM via telephone conference initiated by Plaintiff's counsel. Jury Trial set for 6/8/2020 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8D, Kansas City (DGK) before District Judge Greg Kays. Signed on 8/6/19 by District Judge Greg Kays. (Strodtman, Tracy) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER for Plaintiff's counsel to show cause in writing by 8/19/19 why he has not yet completed attorney registration or a petition for admission pro hac vice. Signed on 8/5/19 by District Judge Greg Kays. (Law clerk) (Entered: 08/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Douglas Miller, Miller Haviland Ketter PC, PA re Defendants' 1st RFPD and 1st RFA to Trio Companies, LLC and Eric Schaumburg filed by Marc Kimble Erickson on behalf of Defendants Douglas Miller, Miller Haviland Ketter PC, PA.(Erickson, Marc) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) REPORT of Rule 26(f) planning meeting. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Erickson, Marc) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) filed by Marc Kimble Erickson on behalf of Defendant Miller Haviland Ketter PC, PA.(Erickson, Marc) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) RULE 16 NOTICE. Rule 26 conference due by 7/29/2019. Proposed scheduling order due by 8/12/2019. Signed on 6/28/19 by District Judge Greg Kays. (Strodtman, Tracy) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) AMENDED NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP re-assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to Program Director. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Houston, Kiambu) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Jackson County, Missouri County, case number 1816-cv-15286, filed by Marc Kimble Erickson on behalf of Douglas Miller, Miller Haviland Ketter PC, PA. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-6356990. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Civil Cover Sheet)(Erickson, Marc) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less